Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation et al v. Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation and Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts
Defendant: Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc., Business Alliance Insurance Company, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv05222
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiffs Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation, Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Business Alliance Insurance Company. (Zeller, Stephen)
September 21, 2022 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc. (jp)
September 20, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc. filed by plaintiffs Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation, Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Zeller in Support of Request to Enter Default as to Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc. a California corporation, #2 Exhibit 3 in Support of Declaration of Zeller) (Zeller, Stephen)
September 16, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Business Alliance Insurance Company, only filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation. (Jensen, Casey)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation, Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, upon Defendant Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc. served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Dumas, Employee -Person authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service by Mail is attached. (Zeller, Stephen)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation, Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, upon Defendant Business Alliance Insurance Company served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Willie John, Claim Representative, Person authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Proof of Service by Mail is attached. (Zeller, Stephen)
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with General Order Authorizing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation. (Zeller, Stephen)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc., Business Alliance Insurance Company. (jtil)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation, (Zeller, Stephen)
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation. (Zeller, Stephen)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts, Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation. (Zeller, Stephen)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33710897 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation, Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Stephen Scott Zeller added to party Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Scott Zeller added to party Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation(pty:pla))(Zeller, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation et al v. Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Southwest Administrative Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Scott Zeller
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees for the Carpenters Southwest Trusts
Represented By: Stephen Scott Zeller
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameri-Core Concrete Sawing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Alliance Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?