Anne Lorimer v. Hildegarde L. Staninger et al
Plaintiff: Anne Lorimer
Defendant: Hildegarde L. Staninger, Integrative Health Systems, LLC and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2022cv05308
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected.. Other error(s) with document(s): The correct event to be used is Civil Events -> Motions and Related Filings -> Motion -> Dismiss Case. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 23, 2022 Filing 16 Notice Notice of LR 7-3 Meet and Confer Conference re: Motion to Dismiss [ECF Doc. 9] filed by Defendants Integrative Health Systems, LLC, Hildegarde L. Staninger. (McBride, Kevin)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
August 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for final disposition re: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #10 , Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #8 (rn)
August 22, 2022 Filing 12 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Integrative Health Systems, LLC, Hildegarde L. Staninger, (McBride, Kevin)
August 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Integrative Health Systems, LLC, Hildegarde L. Staninger, (McBride, Kevin)
August 22, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (McBride, Kevin)
August 22, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Integrative Health Systems, LLC, Hildegarde L. Staninger.(Attorney Kevin Patrick McBride added to party Integrative Health Systems, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Patrick McBride added to party Hildegarde L. Staninger(pty:dft))(McBride, Kevin) Modified on 8/24/2022 (gr).
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Anne Lorimer. (Wiener, Seth)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Integrative Health Systems, LLC, Hildegarde L. Staninger. (Attachments: #1 Integrative Health Systems) (sh)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anne Lorimer, (Wiener, Seth)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anne Lorimer. (Wiener, Seth)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anne Lorimer. (Wiener, Seth)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anne Lorimer. (Wiener, Seth)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33723654 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Anne Lorimer. (Attorney Seth W. Wiener added to party Anne Lorimer(pty:pla))(Wiener, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anne Lorimer v. Hildegarde L. Staninger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Lorimer
Represented By: Seth W. Wiener
Represented By: Seth W Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildegarde L. Staninger
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrative Health Systems, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?