Taquan Gullett v. United States Probation and Pretrial Services et al
Plaintiff: Taquan Gullett and Taquan Rashe Gullett-El
Defendant: United States Probation and Pretrial Services, Natasha Alexander-Mingo, Arlene Carty, Victoria Beltran, Yvette Trepichio and Christina A. Snyder
Case Number: 2:2022cv05395
Filed: August 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Taquan Rashe Gullett-El (hr)
September 27, 2022 Filing 19 JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS: 55-Day Past Due Notice, Invoice, and Statement of Account filed by Plaintiff Taquan Rashe Gullett-El. (hr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 18 JUDICIAL NOTICE of Adjudicative Facts: 45-Day Past Due Notice, Invoice, and Statement of Account, filed by Plaintiff Taquan Rashe Gullett-El. (hr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 17 JUDICIAL NOTICE of Adjudicative Facts: Affidavit of Assertory Oath, Repudiation and Revocation of Citizenship - Certificate of State National Status, filed by Plaintiff Taquan Rashe Gullett-El. (hr)
September 2, 2022 Filing 16 JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (et)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Taquan Gullett filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (et)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-05395 JAK(JDE). (rn)
August 9, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #5 filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett, (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Natasha Alexander-Mingo, Victoria Beltran, Arlene Carty, Christina A. Snyder, Yvette Trepichio, United States Probation and Pretrial Services amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett(hr)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:14-cr-00725 CAS. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cr-05395 CAS(JDE). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (car)
August 3, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, filed by Plaintiff Taquan Gullett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taquan Gullett v. United States Probation and Pretrial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taquan Gullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taquan Rashe Gullett-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation and Pretrial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Alexander-Mingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Trepichio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?