Fred G. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Fred G.
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross, Directors Guild of America, Inc. and Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2022cv05710
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SET EARLIER TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES #42 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The pretrial and trial dates anddeadlines are ADVANCED as follows: The Last Date to Hear Motions: May 12, 2023; Opening Trial Briefs: May 19, 2023; Opening Trial Briefs: June 2, 2023; Bench Trial : June 13, 2023 at 8:30 AM. (lc)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slaught, Kathleen)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, AND OTHER REQUIREMENTSIN ERISA ACTIONS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Bench Trial set for 6/27/2023 08:30 AM ; Lodge Administrative Record & Plan Documents 11/18/2022; File and Exchange Opening Trial Briefs 5/26/2023; File and Exchange Responsive Trial Briefs (not to exceed 15 pages) 6/9/2023 (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/21/2022. (tf)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the September 30, 2022, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Plaintiff Fred G... (Lilienstein, David)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Slaught, Kathleen)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan.(Slaught, Kathleen)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:22-cv-01259-RS, from U.S. District Court California Northern District (San Francisco). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-05710 FLA (GJSx). (lh)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/10/2022. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/28/2022 is continued to 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byDirectors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Cahill Slaught in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of of Kathleen Cahill Slaught in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of of Kathleen Cahill Slaught in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of of Kathleen Cahill Slaught in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE: MOTION TO DISMISS [#14] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON JUNE 23, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 5/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 5/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue ) filed byDirectors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. (Theurer, Nolan) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Initial Case Management Conference previously set for June 9, 2022 is continued to July 28, 2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by July 21, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022) Modified on 4/28/2022 (cl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing previously set for May 19, 2022 is continued to June 23, 2022 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue ) filed byFred G.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Lilienstein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan ; Corporate Disclosure (Theurer, Nolan) (Filed on 4/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent WellPoint California Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Anthem Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 4/11/2022) Modified on 4/12/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAnthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 4/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/22/2022. Replies due by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Read In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company, Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. Filed byFred G.. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 3/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Directors Guild of America, Inc. by Fred G. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 3/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company. (Kozaczuk, Peter) (Filed on 3/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2022. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 03/09/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company.. (Kozaczuk, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2022 02:00 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16944601.). Filed byFred G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 2/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fred G. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred G.
Represented By: David M Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Peter Jacob Kozaczuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Guild of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan
Represented By: Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Represented By: Nolan Richard Theurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?