Sonya Valenzuela v. Michael Kors (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonya Valenzuela
Defendant: Michael Kors (USA), Inc. and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv05902
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On January 3, 2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No. 20). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for February 22, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by February 15, 2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Ferrell, Scott)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey W. Castello APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Kors (USA), Inc., designating Rebecca J. Wahlquist as local counsel. (lom)
December 2, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey W. Castello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34412739) filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #13 TO JANUARY 25, 2023 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Having reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation seeking to continue the hearing date for Michael Kors Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 13], and for good cause shown, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The hearing on Michael Kors Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 13] is continued from Wednesday, December 7, 2022 at 01:30 PM to Wednesday, January 25, 2023, at 01:30 PM; 2. Michael Kors Reply Briefing in support of its Motion shall be filed no later than January 4, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Becca J. Wahlquist in support of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Wahlquist, Rebecca)
November 16, 2022 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #13 filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
October 5, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wahlquist, Rebecca)
October 5, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Defendant's Response to the Amended Complaint will be due October 5, 2022. (iv)
September 21, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/05/2022 re Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wahlquist, Rebecca)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela(Ferrell, Scott)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Michael Kors (USA), Inc. answer now due 9/22/2022, filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc..(Wahlquist, Rebecca)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
August 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on August 19, 2022. (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc. identifying Capri Holdings Limited as Corporate Parent. (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV23635 Receipt No: ACACDC-33842860 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Michael Kors (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Rebecca J. Wahlquist added to party Michael Kors (USA), Inc.(pty:dft))(Wahlquist, Rebecca)
August 19, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/22/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonya Valenzuela v. Michael Kors (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Valenzuela
Represented By: David W Reid
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Represented By: Victoria C Knowles
Represented By: David W. Reid
Represented By: Victoria C. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kors (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca J. Wahlquist
Represented By: Geoffrey W. Castello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?