G and L 436 Bedford, LLC v. Christopher Vonschlobohm et al
Plaintiff: G and L 436 Bedford LLC
Defendant: Christopher Vonschlobohm, Susan Evans, Chris Vonschlobohm, Christopher Von Schlobohm, Chris Von Schlobohm, Susan Spell, Susan Evans-Spell, Susan Spell-Evans, Susan C. Spell, S. Cheryl Spell, Susan S. Schlobohm, Susan Vonschlobohm, Susan E. Vonschlobohm, Susan S.E. Vonschlobohm, Susan S. Vonschlobohm, Susan Cheryl Spell Evans, Susan C. Spell Evans, Winston Spell, Winchrist Prime LLC and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv06034
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 12 JOINDER TO DEF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REMAND re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #7 filed by Defendant Winchrist Prime LLC. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda)
October 17, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Christopher Vonschlobohm, re Response #13 served on 10/17/2022. (iv)
October 17, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR REMAND re: Motion #7 filed by Defendant Christopher Vonschlobohm. (iv)
September 28, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Ryan Rothacker in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #7 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Supplemental Declaration)(Lerner, Leonard)
September 23, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael I. Weiss in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ryan Rothacker in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Lerner, Leonard)
September 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Memorandum of Point and Authorities #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents- Memorandum in Support of Motion. Filer selected incorrect event. Clerk has terminated the event created by the Memorandum. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 Additional Proof of Service re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford LLC re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #7 (Lerner, Leonard)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 [PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO REMAND filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/31/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael I. Weiss in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ryan Rothacker in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Attorney Leonard D Lerner added to party G and L 436 Bedford LLC(pty:pla)) (Lerner, Leonard) Modified on 9/23/2022 (iv).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
August 24, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Susan Evans, Winston Spell, Christopher Vonschlobohm, Winchrist Prime LLC., filed by plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/11/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, West District, Santa Monica, case number 22SMCV00672 Receipt No: ACACDC-33872106 - Fee: $402, filed by respondent Winchrist Prime, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ronda Baldwin-Kennedy added to party Winchrist Prime, LLC(pty:crresp))(Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G and L 436 Bedford, LLC v. Christopher Vonschlobohm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Von Schlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Von Schlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Evans-Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Spell-Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cheryl Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Schlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan E. Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S.E. Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cheryl Spell Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Spell Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchrist Prime LLC
Represented By: Ronda Baldwin-Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G and L 436 Bedford LLC
Represented By: Leonard D Lerner
Represented By: Michael Ira Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?