Sonya Valenzuela v. The Kroger Co. et al
Plaintiff: Sonya Valenzuela
Defendant: The Kroger Co., and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive, DOES 1 through 25, inclusive and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv06382
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 43 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Second) filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Second Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Exhibit 2 to Second Notice of Supplemental Authority, #3 Exhibit 3 to Second Notice of Supplemental Authority, #4 Exhibit 4 to Second Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Ferrell, Scott)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #37 set for hearing on October 27, 2023, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2023 Filing 41 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ferrell, Scott)
October 13, 2023 Filing 40 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #37 Defendant's Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
October 13, 2023 Filing 39 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #37 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
October 6, 2023 Filing 38 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #37 filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to RJN, #3 Exhibit 2 to RJN, #4 Exhibit 3 to RJN, #5 Exhibit 4 to RJN, #6 Response to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
July 31, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Harper in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) (Harper, Jacob)
July 10, 2023 Filing 36 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela(Ferrell, Scott)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Kroger Co.'s motion to dismiss #14 is GRANTED, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint, or notify the Court and Defendant Kroger that she does not intend to amend, by 7/14/2023. Defendant's response shall be filed within 21 days after the filing of the amended complaint. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 2, 2023 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Eighth Notice of Supplemental Authority Relate to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
April 11, 2023 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Seventh Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
April 3, 2023 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Sixth Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
March 20, 2023 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Fifth Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
March 16, 2023 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Fourth Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
March 16, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.to Notice of Decision by other Court #27 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Harper, Jacob)
March 8, 2023 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Third Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
March 8, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Decision: Javier v. Assurance IQ, LLC, No. 20-cv-02860-CRB, 2023 WL 114225 (N.D. Cal. Jan. 5, 2023) (Breyer, J.) filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Ferrell, Scott)
March 7, 2023 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
February 9, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuelato Response #24 to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Supplemental Authority Re: Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Ferrell, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.to Notice (Other) #22 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Harper, Jacob)
February 9, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
February 7, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferrell, Scott)
December 27, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuelato Supplement(Motion related), #19 , Supplement(Motion related), #18 (Ferrell, Scott)
December 27, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Supplement(Motion related), #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
December 23, 2022 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority [Dtk 18] filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
December 23, 2022 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #14 presently scheduled for hearing on December 16, 2022, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 2, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
November 23, 2022 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #14 filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harper, Jacob)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court, having considered the parties Stipulation, and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that Defendant respond to the complaint no later than November 11, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11-11-2022 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Harper, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Harper, Jacob)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #10 , by Judge Dolly M. Gee. On October 6, 2022, Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela and Defendant the Kroger Co. filed a joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint. The parties stipulated to extend by 14 days the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs complaint, from October 14, 2022, to October 28, 2022. The Court, having considered the parties Stipulation, and finding good cause therefor, hereby APPROVES the Stipulation and ORDERS that Defendant respond to the complaint no later than October 28, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Kroger Co. answer now due 10/28/2022, filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Harper in Support of Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Harper, Jacob)
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Kroger Co. answer now due 10/14/2022, filed by Defendant The Kroger Co..(Harper, Jacob)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
September 7, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/3/2022, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Pendency of Other Action filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant's Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Kroger Co., (Harper, Jacob)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Harper, Jacob)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV25119 Receipt No: ACACDC-33940367 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Jacob Michael Harper added to party The Kroger Co.(pty:dft))(Harper, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonya Valenzuela v. The Kroger Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Valenzuela
Represented By: David W. Reid
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Represented By: Victoria C. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Jacob Michael Harper
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Sancho Accorsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?