Josephine Banks et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Banks, Jamie Banks, Nuevoe Strain, Crisela Banks, Leeann <p;;emodp, William J. Banks and Leeann Mollenido
Defendant: 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Armstrong International Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC, as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Steel, as successor in interest to Mundet Cork, FMC Corporation as successor in interest to Peerless Pump Co., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Green Tweed & Co., Honeywell International Inc., fka AlliedSignal Inc., successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Soco West Inc., f/k/a Brenntag West, Inc. f/k/a Soco-Lynch Corporation, individually and as successor in Inerest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing Company, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Viacom CBS, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Morse TEC LLC, Honeywell International Inc., Soco West Inc., Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Crown Cork and Steel, FMC Corporation, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Green Tweed and Co., AlliedSignal Inc., Brenntag West, Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation, Atwood and Morrill Co., Inc. and Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv06892
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc., (Calfo, Paul)
November 17, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC, identifying ENTRAX LLC (Holding Company). (Calfo, Paul)
November 17, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Morse TEC LLC, identifying ENSTAR HOLDINGS (US) LLC. (Calfo, Paul)
November 15, 2022 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Steele, Demian)
November 15, 2022 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARIES filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. identifying The Carlyle Group, Miles Marine, Inc., Vigor Industrial, LLC, and Vigor Shipyard, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Steele, Demian)
November 15, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Demian David Steele on behalf of Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (Attorney Demian David Steele added to party Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.(pty:dft))(Steele, Demian)
November 9, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Morse Tec LLC, fka Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (FILED IN STAE COURT ON 9/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIT A TO NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT #46 ). (jp)
November 9, 2022 Filing 48 Notice of filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by defendant Honeywell International Inc.. (Calfo, Paul)
November 9, 2022 Filing 47 Notice of filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC. (Calfo, Paul)
November 9, 2022 Filing 46 Notice of filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by defendant Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC. (Calfo, Paul)
November 7, 2022 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #44 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #43 , Answer to Complaint #41 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #42 served on 11/7/2022. (Kum, Robert)
November 7, 2022 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Kum counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Adding Robert Kum as counsel of record for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attorney Robert Kum added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft))(Kum, Robert)
November 7, 2022 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Sean Patterson counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Adding Sean Patterson as counsel of record for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attorney Christopher Sean Patterson added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft))(Patterson, Christopher)
November 7, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation, (Cho, Bridget)
November 7, 2022 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Attorney Bridget Cho added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft))(Cho, Bridget)
October 24, 2022 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Angelo Calfo counsel for Defendants Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC, Honeywell International Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC. Adding Paul A. Calfo as counsel of record for DEFENDANTS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION; METALCLAD INSULATION LLC; and MORSE TEC LLC, f/k/a BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DEFENDANTS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION; METALCLAD INSULATION LLC; and MORSE TEC LLC, f/k/a BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION. (Attorney Paul Angelo Calfo added to party Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Angelo Calfo added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Angelo Calfo added to party Metalclad Insulation, LLC(pty:dft))(Calfo, Paul)
October 24, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Frederic W Norris counsel for Defendants Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC, Honeywell International Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC. Adding Frederic W. Norris as counsel of record for DEFENDANTS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION; METALCLAD INSULATION LLC; and MORSE TEC LLC, f/k/a BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DEFENDANTS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION; METALCLAD INSULATION LLC; and MORSE TEC LLC, f/k/a BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION. (Attorney Frederic W Norris added to party Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frederic W Norris added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Frederic W Norris added to party Metalclad Insulation, LLC(pty:dft))(Norris, Frederic)
October 21, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward Martinovich counsel for Defendant IMO Industries Inc.. Adding Bobbie R. Bailey as counsel of record for Imo Industries, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Imo Industries, Inc. (Martinovich, Edward)
October 21, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc., identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and IMO Holdings, Inc. (Martinovich, Edward)
October 21, 2022 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc..(Attorney Edward Martinovich added to party IMO Industries Inc.(pty:dft))(Martinovich, Edward)
October 5, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint; JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIT A TO NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER #33 ). (jp)
October 5, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint; JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIT A TO NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER #34 )..(jp)
October 5, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint; JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIT A TO NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER #35 ).(jp)
October 5, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC. (Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation (Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC (Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Carrier Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Carrier Corporation; Goulds Pumps LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation; Goulds Pumps LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Carrier Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
October 5, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Carrier Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Carrier Corporation; Goulds Pumps LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation; Goulds Pumps LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Carrier Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
October 5, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marisa R Chaves counsel for Defendants Carrier Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Marisa R. Chaves as counsel of record for Carrier Corporation; Goulds Pumps LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation; Goulds Pumps LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Marisa R Chaves added to party Carrier Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Marisa R Chaves added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marisa R Chaves added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Chaves, Marisa)
October 5, 2022 Filing 26 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv)
October 4, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC, identifying Warren Pumps LLC. (Powell, Glen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC.(Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Warren Pumps LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp., identifying Velan Inc.. (Powell, Glen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp..(Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Velan Valve Corp.(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation.(Powell, Glen)
September 30, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Muse, Angela)
September 30, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Answer)(Peatman, Stephanie)
September 30, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of State Court Filing of Answer and Jury Demand filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Muse, Angela)
September 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Angela Yolanda Muse on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Angela Yolanda Muse added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Muse, Angela)
September 30, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company (Peatman, Stephanie)
September 30, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephanie Ghanem Peatman on behalf of Defendant 3M Company (Attorney Stephanie Ghanem Peatman added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Peatman, Stephanie)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
September 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
September 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 7.1 AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Buck, James)
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 Notice NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Buck, James)
September 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Michael Buck on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney James Michael Buck added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Buck, James)
September 30, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant 3M Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/26/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT #19 ]. (jp)
September 30, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT #9 ). (jp)
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
September 23, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork and Steel, FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Green Tweed and Co., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Soco West Inc., Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Viacom CBS, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs William J. Banks, Josephine Banks, Leeann Mollenido, Jamie Banks, Nuevoe Strain, Crisela Banks. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/11/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.. (Powell, Glen)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, and Utica National Insurance Group, Resolute Management Inc., Fireman's Fund and Liberty Mutual. (Powell, Glen)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.. (Powell, Glen)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV26057 with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 09/23/2022, receipt number 34040619), filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2 A-C, #4 Exhibit 2 D-E, #5 Exhibit 2 F, #6 Exhibit 2 G, #7 Exhibit 2 H-I, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 3 A-C, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8) (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josephine Banks et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Banks
Represented By: Hannah B Oxley
Represented By: Frederick Schenk
Represented By: Stuart B. Lewis
Represented By: Timothy F Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Banks
Represented By: Hannah B Oxley
Represented By: Frederick Schenk
Represented By: Stuart B. Lewis
Represented By: Timothy F Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuevoe Strain
Represented By: Stuart B. Lewis
Represented By: Hannah B Oxley
Represented By: Frederick Schenk
Represented By: Timothy F Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crisela Banks
Represented By: Timothy F Pearce
Represented By: Hannah B Oxley
Represented By: Frederick Schenk
Represented By: Stuart B. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeann <p;;emodp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Banks
Represented By: Hannah B Oxley
Represented By: Stuart B. Lewis
Represented By: Timothy F Pearce
Represented By: Frederick Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeann Mollenido
Represented By: Hannah B Oxley
Represented By: Frederick Schenk
Represented By: Stuart B. Lewis
Represented By: Timothy F Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Stephanie Ghanem Peatman
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Morse Tec, LLC, as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Steel, as successor in interest to Mundet Cork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation as successor in interest to Peerless Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Angela Yolanda Muse
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tweed & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc., fka AlliedSignal Inc., successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation, LLC
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Robert Kum
Represented By: Bridget Cho
Represented By: Christopher Sean Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco West Inc., f/k/a Brenntag West, Inc. f/k/a Soco-Lynch Corporation, individually and as successor in Inerest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tweed and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal Inc.
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood and Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?