A.H. et al v. Ahmad S. Khalifa et al
Plaintiff: A. H. and Sandra Guzman
Defendant: M.D. Ahmad Khalifa, M.D. Borzouyeh Poursharif, M.D. Farnaaz Kia, Dignity Health Erroneously Sued As Califronia Hospital Medical Center doing business as California Hospital Medical Center, Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center doing business as Eisners Health Los Angeles Womens Center and Does 1 to 100
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv07148
Filed: October 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 33 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Remand Order re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 , Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form, #25 #29 filed by Movant United States of America. (Chapman, Ryan)
November 23, 2022 Filing 32 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Opposition Deadline to Defendants' Ex Parte Application (ECF No. 29) #30 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
November 22, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Remand Order re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 , Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form, #25 #29 filed by Movant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Ryan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Remand Order re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 , Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form, #25 filed by Defendants Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, Ahmad Khalifa, Borzouyeh Poursharif. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob S. Rosenberg, #2 Declaration of Matthew S. Freedus, #3 Proposed Order) (Tyler, Brendan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-56061 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #26 as to Defendants Eisner Pediatric and Family Medical Center, Ahmad Khalifa, Borzouyeh Poursharif. (jp)
November 9, 2022 Filing 27 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #26 . (Freedus, Matthew)
November 9, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, Ahmad Khalifa, Borzouyeh Poursharif. Appeal of Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34296723.) (Freedus, Matthew)
November 8, 2022 Filing 25 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 21STCV05325. (jp)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: GRANTING United States' Motion to Remand (Dkt. #12 .) The case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
November 3, 2022 Filing 23 Notice OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO REMAND filed by Movant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chapman, Ryan)
October 31, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles #12 filed by Movant United States of America. (Chapman, Ryan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Brendan M Tyler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, designating Jacob S Rosenberg as local counsel. (jp)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S Freedus APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, designating Jacob S Rosenberg as local counsel. (jp)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Continuing November 14, 2022 Scheduling Conference #18 . The Scheduling Conference is continued to 1/9/2023 at 11:00 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 26, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue scheduling conference from November 14, 2022 to January 13, 2023 filed by defendant Dignity Health. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Continuing November 14, 2022 Scheduling Conference)(Corson, Paul)
October 26, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles #12 filed by Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center. (Rosenberg, Jacob)
October 26, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brendan M. Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34218327) filed by Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rosenberg, Jacob)
October 26, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Freedus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34218263) filed by Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing) (Rosenberg, Jacob)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Time for Filing Opposition to Remand to 10/27/2022 Pursuant to Stipulation #13 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles #12 filed by Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jacob)
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Movant United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Chapman, Ryan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Participation filed by Movant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Chapman, Ryan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan Casey Chapman counsel for Movant United States of America. Adding Ryan C. Chapman as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Movant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Ryan Casey Chapman added to party United States of America(pty:mov))(Chapman, Ryan)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-06528 DMG(FFMx) (rn)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
October 1, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Farnaaz Kia. [FILED IN STATE COURT 04/30/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
October 1, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Dignity Health, Does, Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, Ahmad Khalifa, Farnaaz Kia, Los Angeles Womens Center, Borzouyeh Poursharif.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff A H, Sandra Guzman. [FILED IN STATE COURT 02/09/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
October 1, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Dignity Health, Does, Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, Ahmad Khalifa, Farnaaz Kia, Borzouyeh Poursharif, filed by Plaintiffs A H, Sandra Guzman[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
October 1, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to FIRST AMENDED Complaint filed by Defendant Dignity Health.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/01/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
October 1, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Dignity Health, Does, Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, Ahmad Khalifa, Farnaaz Kia, Borzouyeh Poursharif, filed by Plaintiff A H, Sandra Guzman. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
October 1, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Dignity Health.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
October 1, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center. (Rosenberg, Jacob)
October 1, 2022 Filing 2 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center, (Rosenberg, Jacob)
October 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV05325 Receipt No: ACACDC-34084371 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jacob S Rosenberg added to party Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center(pty:bkmov))(Rosenberg, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.H. et al v. Ahmad S. Khalifa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: Carl A McMahan
Represented By: Eduardo J Ascencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Guzman
Represented By: Carl A McMahan
Represented By: Eduardo J Ascencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Ahmad Khalifa
Represented By: Brendan Tyler
Represented By: Matthew S. Freedus
Represented By: Jacob S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Brendan M. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Borzouyeh Poursharif
Represented By: Brendan Tyler
Represented By: Matthew S. Freedus
Represented By: Jacob S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Brendan M. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Farnaaz Kia
Represented By: Michael John Trotter
Represented By: Nora Jean Hite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health Erroneously Sued As Califronia Hospital Medical Center doing business as California Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Paul Meier Corson
Represented By: Robert B Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisner Pediatric & Family Medical Center doing business as Eisners Health Los Angeles Womens Center
Represented By: Jacob S Rosenberg
Represented By: Brendan Tyler
Represented By: Matthew S. Freedus
Represented By: Jacob S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Brendan M. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan Casey Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?