Trek Bicycle Corporation et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Trek Bicycle Corporation and Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Ocean Network Express North America, Inc., Ocean Network Express PTE LTD, Flexport International LLC and Does one through ten
Case Number: 2:2022cv07367
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
November 30, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flexport International LLC, (Cicala, Conte)
November 30, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Flexport International LLC.(Attorney Conte C Cicala added to party Flexport International LLC(pty:dft))(Cicala, Conte)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ocean Network Express North America, Inc., Ocean Network Express PTE LTD, (Swain, Michael)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Ocean Network Express North America, Inc., Ocean Network Express PTE LTD.(Attorney Michael L Swain added to party Ocean Network Express North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L Swain added to party Ocean Network Express PTE LTD(pty:dft))(Swain, Michael)
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 Union Pacific Railroad Company's Notice of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statement NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, identifying Union Pacific Corporation. (Johnson, Nancy)
November 15, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Union Pacific Railroad Company answer now due 12/14/2022, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, #13 filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Attorney Nancy Jean Johnson added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft))(Johnson, Nancy)
November 3, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, upon Defendant Flexport International LLC served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nichole Wheeler - Person In Charge Of Office in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 26, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, upon Defendant Ocean Network Express PTE LTD served on 10/25/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - John Montijo, Process Specialist - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 26, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, upon Defendant Ocean Network Express North America, Inc. served on 10/25/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - John Montijo, Process Specialist - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 26, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, upon Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 10/25/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - John Montijo, Process Specialist - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Flexport International LLC, Ocean Network Express North America, Inc., Ocean Network Express PTE LTD, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (yl)
October 12, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Kirsch, Tyler)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
October 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
October 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, Trek Bicycle Corporation identifying Roth Distributing Co., Inc. and Intrepid Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, Trek Bicycle Corporation, identifying W.K. Webster (Overseas) Ltd. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431, Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Kirsch, Joshua)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34125779 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Trek Bicycle Corporation(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trek Bicycle Corporation et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trek Bicycle Corporation
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Represented By: Tyler John Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B0507CG2001431
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Represented By: Tyler John Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Nancy Jean Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express North America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express PTE LTD
Represented By: Michael L Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexport International LLC
Represented By: Conte C Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does one through ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?