Weso USA, Inc. v. T and B Master Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc, Weso USA, Inc. and Weso Laser, Inc.
Defendant: T&B Master Logistics, Inc., HMM Co. Ltd, Yusen Terminals LLC, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, T and B Master Logistics, Inc. and Yusen Terminals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv07452
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1701 Shipping/Maritime
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to T and B Master Logistics, Inc. answer now due 12/17/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #14 filed by Defendant T and B Master Logistics, Inc..(Attorney Jacob B. Bach added to party T and B Master Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bach, Jacob)
November 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Notice of Stipulation is submitted unilaterally by plaintiff's counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
November 11, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Yusen Terminals, LLC answer now due 12/16/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Yusen Terminals, LLC.(Attorney Alan Nakazawa added to party Yusen Terminals, LLC(pty:dft))(Nakazawa, Alan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to HMM Co. Ltd answer now due 12/21/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Weso USA, Inc..(Uthoff, Stephen)
November 10, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Weso USA, Inc., upon Defendant T and B Master Logistics, Inc. served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brad Ryu Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Weso USA, Inc., upon Defendant HMM Co. Ltd served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dong Chang Senior Account Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Weso USA, Inc., upon Defendant Yusen Terminals, LLC served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service - registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Uthoff, Stephen)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Yusen Terminals, LLC. (ghap)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HMM Co. Ltd. (ghap)
October 14, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant T and B Master Logistics, Inc. (ghap)
October 14, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc, identifying Weso USA, Inc. aka Weso Laser, Inc.; Kwang Wook Kim. (Uthoff, Stephen)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc. (Uthoff, Stephen)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc. (Uthoff, Stephen)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc. (Uthoff, Stephen)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc. (Uthoff, Stephen)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34142911 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc(pty:pla))(Uthoff, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weso USA, Inc. v. T and B Master Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weso USA Inc aka Weso Laser Inc
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weso USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weso Laser, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&B Master Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusen Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and B Master Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob B. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusen Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Caroline J Wilson
Represented By: Alan Nakazawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?