Nick J. Gomez v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nick Gomez
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc., Gabriella Franco and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2022cv07691
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 18 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal- Remand to Superior Court (rolm)
November 23, 2022 Filing 17 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles. (rolm)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin remanding case to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, Case number 22STCV30457 *See Order for Details.* Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rolm)
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by NICK GOMEZ Nick Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Remand Removed Action to Los Angeles Superior Court)(Sweeney, Brandon)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-07691 FMO(KSx). (rn)
October 29, 2022 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants HOME DEPOT U.S.A., Inc., a Delaware Corporation; GABRIELLA FRANCO, an Individual; and DOES 1 TO 10 All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by NICK GOMEZ Nick Gomez(Sweeney, Brandon)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et)
October 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Danielle Cruz counsel for Defendants Gabriella Franco, Home Depot USA, Inc.. Changing address and firm name to Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo, 12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300, Cerritos, California 90703. Changing e-mail to danielle.cruz@aalrr.com. Filed by Defendants Gabriella Franco, Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Attorney Danielle Cruz added to party Gabriella Franco(pty:dft))(Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Serviceof Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court and Supporting Documents filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. re: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice (Other) #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc., identifying Nick Gomez; Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.; Gabriela Franco. (Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. identifying Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV30457 Receipt No: ACACDC-34194670 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal re Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal re Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Home Depot USA, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal re Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Gabriella Franco, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal re Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal re Defendant Daniella Franco's Answer to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal re: State Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Attorney Danielle Cruz added to party Home Depot USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cruz, Danielle)
October 21, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Nick Gomez, upon Defendant Gabriella Franco served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon by substituted service by Leslie Lopez in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/29/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
October 21, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Gabriella Franco, Home Depot USA, Inc., Does 1 to 10. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Nick Gomez. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
October 21, 2022 CONFROMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Nick Gomez, upon Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. served on 9/21/2022, answer due 10/12/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Registered Agent by leaving with Trudy Desbiens, person authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/29/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
October 21, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/20/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ].(et)
October 21, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Gabriella Franco. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/20/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ].(et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nick J. Gomez v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Gomez
Represented By: Jonathan J Moon
Represented By: Brandon J Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Cruz
Represented By: Amber Marie Solano
Represented By: Casandra P Secord
Represented By: Irma Rodriguez Moisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Franco
Represented By: Danielle Cruz
Represented By: Amber Marie Solano
Represented By: Casandra P Secord
Represented By: Irma Rodriguez Moisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?