Shanan Guinn v. The Walt Disney Company
Plaintiff: Shanan Guinn
Defendant: THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation and The Walt Disney Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv07770
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer S Baldocchi counsel for Defendant The Walt Disney Company. Adding Jennifer S. Baldocchi as counsel of record for THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jennifer S. Baldocchi. (Baldocchi, Jennifer)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
December 1, 2022 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Walt Disney Company identifying The Walt Disney Company as Corporate Parent. (Falk, Caitlin)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Walt Disney Company, identifying The Walt Disney Company. (Falk, Caitlin)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #16 filed by Defendant The Walt Disney Company.(Attorney Caitlin Heather Falk added to party The Walt Disney Company(pty:dft))(Falk, Caitlin)
November 14, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn, upon Defendant The Walt Disney Company served on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent for The Walt Disney Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Additional documents served (as reflected in Proof of Service): Certificate of Interested Parties (ECF 10); Application of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (ECF 14); Proof of Service (ECF 15); Notice of Assignment (ECF 3); Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ECF 4); Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge (ECF 5); Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer (ECF 9); Proof of Service of Case-Initiating Documents (ECF 18); Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (ECF 19). (Horne, Vicki)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K Horne APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn, designating Chaka Okadigbo as local counsel. (jp)
November 2, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #16 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/26/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34220464) #14 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #10 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #15 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #9 served on 11/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18-1(Proof of Service))(Okadigbo, Chaka)
November 2, 2022 Filing 17 COMPLAINT [FILED AS NOTICE OF ERRATA] filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Okadigbo, Chaka). Modified on 11/7/2022 (jp).
November 2, 2022 Filing 16 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 10/25/2022, receipt number ACACDC-34212029), filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Okadigbo, Chaka)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn, upon Defendant The Walt Disney Company served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Okadigbo, Chaka)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/26/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34220464) filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Okadigbo, Chaka)
October 31, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34220464) #11 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken. (jp)
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34220464) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 10/26/22, Dkt. 3. (lt)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 10/31/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #13 ] - First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Shanan Guinn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34220464) filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Okadigbo, Chaka). Modified on 10/31/2022 (jp).
October 26, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn, (Okadigbo, Chaka)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Vicki K. Horne. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Walt Disney Company. (lh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shanan Guinn. (Okadigbo, Chaka)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34212029 - Fee: $402, filed by Shanan Guinn Shanan Guinn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Chaka C Okadigbo added to party Shanan Guinn(pty:pla))(Okadigbo, Chaka)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanan Guinn v. The Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanan Guinn
Represented By: Chaka C Okadigbo
Represented By: Chaka C. Okadigbo
Represented By: Vicki Kuftic Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Jennifer S Baldocchi
Represented By: Caitlin Heather Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?