Julia Hubbard et al v. Trammell S. Crow, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Julia Hubbard and Kayla Goedinghaus
Defendant: Trammell S Crow, Jr., Dr. Benjamin Todd Eller, Richard Hubbard, Dr. Melissa Miller, Dr. Joseph Bolin, Dr. Scott Woods, Dr. Mrugeshkumar Shah, Michael Cain, Coe Juracek, Philip Ecob, H.J. Cole, Texas Ranger Cody Mitchell, Kurt Knewitz, Paul Pendergrass, Ralph Rogers, Robert Pruitt, Scott Brunson, Case Grover, Richard Butler, Mark Molina, Michael Hynes, Jr., Shawn Mayer, Jade Mayer, RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Integrity Based Marketing, LLC, Storm Fitness Nutrition, LLC, Ultra Combat Nutrition, LLC, EcoLoft Homes LLC, Elevated Wellness Partners LLC, Doe Individuals 1 to 20, Doe Companies 21 to 30, Doe Individuals and Doe Companies
Case Number: 2:2022cv07957
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
2 Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Filing 133 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Western District of Texas, 5:23-cv-00580 filed 5/5/2023. (rolm)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOT [26, #50 , #55 , #72 , #76 , #83 , #93 , #102 , #105 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: court TRANSFERS the action to theWestern District of Texas, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), and RECOMMENDS theaction be assigned to the San Antonio Division pursuant to the parties request.The court DENIES Responding Defendants request for a ruling on the Motionsto Dismiss filed by Crow, (Dkt. 26), Pruitt (Dkt. 50), Woods (Dkt. 55), Grover (Dkt. 72), Mitchell (Dkt. 76), RCI (Dkt. 83), Eller (Dkt. 93), Miller (Dkt. 102), and Juracek (Dkt. 105). These Motions are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Defendants may file renewed Motions to Dismiss within thirty (30) days of the acknowledgement of receipt of this action by the Western District of Texas, unless that court orders otherwise. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.). (Case electronically sent to USDC Western District of Texas on 5/5/2023. (lc)
April 28, 2023 Filing 131 MINUTES OF Show Cause Hearing held before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED #87 . The court invites the parties to argue. Following discussions with counsel, the matter stands submitted and written order to issue. Court Reporter: Terri Hourigan. (lc)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING TIME FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The Order to Show Cause hearing is advanced from 1:30 p.m. to 11:00 a.m. on April 28, 2023 in courtroom 6B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court sets its March 6, 2023 Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #87 ) for an in-person hearing on April 28, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6B.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On the court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on April 28, 2023 is hereby VACATED with the hearing to be reset after the court rules on the Order to Show Cause and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TRAMMELL S. CROW, JR. (DKT. #26 ), ROBERT PRUITT (DKT. #50 ), SCOTT WOODS (DKT. #55 ), CASEY GROVER, CASE GROVER (DKT. #72 ), CODY MITCHELL (DKT. #76 ), RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDING, INC. (DKT. #83 ), BENJAMIN TODD ELLER (DKT. #93 ), MELISSA MILLER (DKT. #102 ), AND COE JURACEK (DKT. #105 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that these Motions to Dismiss currently scheduled for hearing on April 28, 2023, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, these motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated as the the motions only. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. DiClemente to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Coe Juracek and designating Alex Bergians as local counsel #124 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc)
April 18, 2023 Filing 125 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. DiClemente to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Coe Juracek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35140482) #117 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 124 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. DiClemente to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Coe Juracek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 4/14/2023, Receipt No. 35140482) filed by Defendant Coe Juracek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, District of Columbia Bar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, New York Bar, #3 Proposed Order Granting Application) (Bergjans, Matthew)
April 17, 2023 Filing 123 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. DiClemente to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Coe Juracek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35140482) #117 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FORALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT KURT KNEWITZ #114 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Plaintiffs shall have a 60- day extension on the time to effectuate service on Knewitz pursuant to Rule 4(e)(1), from the date of this Order, up to and including June 13, 2023. The court DENIESPlaintiffs' request for alternate service without prejudice. (lc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 121 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Benjamin Todd Eller's Reply (Motion related) #119 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer case has incorrect initials for Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha as "FAR" instead of "FLA". This is the second filing with incorrect initials (first one is docket no. 108). Other error(s) with document(s): Refer to Notice of Reassignment of 12/2/2022, docket no. 23... In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Report #118 by plaintiff. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 14, 2023 Filing 119 REPLY Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #93 filed by Defendant Benjamin Todd Eller. (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
April 14, 2023 Filing 118 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schmidt, Matthew)
April 14, 2023 Filing 117 (STRICKEN PER 4/18/2023 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE DOCKET NO. 125). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. DiClemente to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Coe Juracek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35140482) filed by Defendant Coe Juracek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, District of Columbia Bar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, New York Bar, #3 Proposed Order) (Bergjans, Matthew) Modified on 4/18/2023 (lc).
April 14, 2023 Filing 116 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #105 filed by Defendant Coe Juracek. (Doolittle, Diane)
April 14, 2023 Filing 115 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #102 filed by Defendant Melissa Miller. (Pruett, David)
April 10, 2023 Filing 114 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Schmidt, Matthew)
April 7, 2023 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #105 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Matthew)
April 7, 2023 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #102 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Matthew)
April 7, 2023 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #93 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT PRUITT TO DISMISS (DKT. #50 ), MOTION OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL SCOTT WOODS TO DISMISS (DKT. #55 ), MOTION OF TRAMMELL S. CROW, JR.'S TO DISMISS (DKT. #26 ), MOTION OF DEFENDANT CODY MITCHELL TO DISMISS (DKT. #76 ), MOTION OF DEFENDANT CASEY GROVER AND CASE GROVER TO DISMISS (DKT. #72 ), AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, INC. TO DISMISS 9DKT. #83 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court on its own motion, continues the Motions to Dismiss from March 31, 2023, and April 7, 2023 to April 28, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 6B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 24, 2023 Filing 109 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.to Order to Show Cause, #87 , on behalf of all Defendants who have appeared (Hawxhurst, Gerald)
March 24, 2023 Filing 108 STATEMENT Separate Statement of Facts filed by Defendant Benjamin Todd Eller (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declarationn of Indira J. Cameron-Banks, #2 Declaration Declaration of Benjamin Todd Eller, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
March 24, 2023 Filing 107 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbardto Order to Show Cause, #87 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 24, 2023 Filing 106 REPLY DEFENDANT RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Marvisi, Justin)
March 23, 2023 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Coe Juracek. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Doolittle, Diane)
March 22, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Melissa Miller, (Pruett, David)
March 21, 2023 Filing 103 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: ATTACHMENT OF SUPPLEMENT ONLY TO THE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [102-3] by Melissa Mille. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 Notice of interested party was submitted as an attachment, instead of being filed under its own specific event: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 20, 2023 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendant Melissa Miller. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Supplement) (Pruett, David)
March 17, 2023 Filing 101 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #76 filed by Defendant Cody Mitchell. (Simpson, Alec)
March 17, 2023 Filing 100 REPLY DEFENDANT CASEY GROVERS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #72 filed by Defendant Case Grover. (Marvisi, Justin)
March 17, 2023 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #83 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 17, 2023 Filing 98 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Benjamin Todd Eller, (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
March 16, 2023 Filing 97 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #93 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (lc)
March 15, 2023 Filing 96 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Benjamin Todd Eller's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #93 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 15, 2023 Filing 95 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Richard Butler, Michael Cain, H.J. Cole, EcoLoft Homes LLC, Philip Ecob, Elevated Wellness Partners LLC, Integrity Based Marketing, LLC, Kurt Knewitz, Jade Mayer, Shawn Mayer, Mark Molina, Paul Pendergrass, Ralph Rogers, Mrugeshkumar Shah, Storm Fitness Nutrition, LLC, Ultra Combat Nutrition, LLC. (lc)
March 15, 2023 Filing 94 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 15, 2023 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant Benjamin Todd Eller. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cameron-Banks, Indira)
March 14, 2023 Filing 92 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #91 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Filer ERRONEOUSLY ATTACHED the pdf of the 64 PAGE COMPLAINT with active electronic headers intact thus making making current electronic headers illegible. Please ONLY ATTACH a Clean PDF of the FULL CAPTION PAGE of the Complaint for the attachment 1" when resubmitting the summons request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
March 13, 2023 Filing 91 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit List of Defendants to be Served)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 90 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #26 filed by Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. (Hawxhurst, Gerald)
March 10, 2023 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #76 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #72 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Matthew)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE THAT PARTIES SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING BY MARCH 24, 2023 WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO US DISTRICT COURT IN TEXAS PURSUANT TO 2 USC 1404(a). THE PARTIES MAY FILE ONE BRIEF PER SIDE, WHICH SHALL NOT EXCEED 15 PAGES PER BRIEF by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT PRUITT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DKT. #50 ), MOTION OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL SCOTT WOODS TO DISMISS (DKT. #55 ), AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT TRAMMELL S. CROW, JR. TO DISMISS (DKT. #26 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court on its own motion, continues the motions from March 10, 2023, and March 24, 2023 respectively, to March 31, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 27, 2023 Filing 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #72 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CASEY GROVERS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [DKT. 72])(Marvisi, Justin)
February 27, 2023 Filing 84 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #72 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. OTHER: The Filer shall lodge a Proposed Order. (lc)
February 27, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT SHERMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [DKT. 83 ]) (Marvisi, Justin)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER TO DOCUMENT 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #76 #78 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. OTHER: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. PDF document was NOT a motion, but ONLY the proposed order to pending Motion No. 76. It is noted the Filer filed a Notice of Lodging at CM/ECF No. 81. It is noted the Filer filed a Notice of Interested Parties at CM/ECF No. 80. (lc)
February 27, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #76 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order to Pending Motion No. 76)(Simpson, Alec)
February 27, 2023 Filing 80 DEFENDANTS RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, INC. AND CASEY GROVERS CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (L.R. 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Attorney RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., identifying DEFENDANTS RCI HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, INC. AND CASEY GROVER. (Marvisi, Justin)
February 27, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER TO DOCUMENT 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #76 #78 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: SEE BELOW UNDER OTHER. PDF document was NOT a motion, but ONLY the proposed order to pending motion no. 76. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as a Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 24, 2023 Filing 78 (STRICKEN PER 2/27/2023 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE DOCKET NO. 82). NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER TO DOCUMENT 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #76 filed by Defendant Cody Mitchell. (Simpson, Alec) Modified on 2/27/2023 (lc).
February 24, 2023 Filing 77 Notice and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cody Mitchell, (Simpson, Alec)
February 24, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Cody Mitchell. Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cody Mitchell, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Alec Raymond Simpson, I added to party Cody Mitchell(pty:dft)) (Simpson, Alec)
February 24, 2023 Filing 75 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #50 filed by Defendant Robert Pruitt. (Cook, Philip)
February 24, 2023 Filing 74 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to Michael Scott Wood's First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #50 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #55 filed by Defendant Scott Woods. (Rubaum, David)
February 23, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #72 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
February 23, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Casey Grover Case Grover. Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT CASEY GROVER IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS) (Marvisi, Justin)
February 22, 2023 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #50 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #55 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Schmidt, Matthew)
February 16, 2023 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Diane M. Doolittle counsel for Defendant Coe Juracek. Adding Diane Doolittle as counsel of record for Coe Juracek for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Coe Juracek. (Attorney Diane M. Doolittle added to party Coe Juracek(pty:dft))(Doolittle, Diane)
February 16, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Coe Juracek, (Bergjans, Matthew)
February 16, 2023 Filing 68 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Coe Juracek answer now due 3/23/2023, filed by Defendant Coe Juracek.(Attorney Matthew Alexander Bergjans added to party Coe Juracek(pty:dft))(Bergjans, Matthew)
February 15, 2023 Filing 67 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #26 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Schmidt, Matthew)
February 15, 2023 Filing 66 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #50 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Schmidt, Matthew)
February 14, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal not dated. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 14, 2023 Filing 64 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. answer now due 2/27/2023, filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc..(Attorney Justin Michael Marvisi added to party RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Marvisi, Justin)
February 14, 2023 Filing 63 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Case Grover answer now due 2/23/2023, filed by Defendant Case Grover.(Attorney Justin Michael Marvisi added to party Case Grover(pty:dft))(Marvisi, Justin)
February 14, 2023 Filing 62 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 20, 2023 filed by defendant Melissa Miller.(Attorney David P Pruett added to party Melissa Miller(pty:dft))(Pruett, David)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: In light of the extension of time to serve remaining Defendants (Dkt. #57 ), the court CONTINUES the scheduling conference from February 24, 2023, to April 28, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. The parties are ORDERED to file an updated Joint Report at least fourteen days before the conference.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Terrence Matthew Jones on behalf of Defendant Benjamin Todd Eller (Attorney Terrence Matthew Jones added to party Benjamin Todd Eller(pty:dft))(Jones, Terrence)
February 13, 2023 Filing 59 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Benjamin Todd Eller answer now due 3/14/2023, filed by Defendant Benjamin Todd Eller.(Attorney Indira J Cameron-Banks added to party Benjamin Todd Eller(pty:dft))(Cameron-Banks, Indira)
February 10, 2023 Filing 58 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 21 days, filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schmidt, Matthew)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS #54 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court GRANTS PlaintiffsApplication. Plaintiffs shall have a 60-day extension on the time to effectuate service on the Unserved Defendants Defendants Dr. Mrugeshkumar Shah, Michael Cain, Philip Ecob, H.J. Cole, Kurt Knewitz, Paul Pendergrass, Ralph Rogers, Richard Butler, Mark Molina, Shawn Mayer, Jade Mayer, Integrity Based Marketing, LLC, Storm Fitness Nutrition, LLC, Ultra Combat Nutrition, LLC, EcoLoft Homes LLC, and Elevated Wellness Partners LLC, from the date of this Order, up to and including April 10, 2023. (lc)
February 8, 2023 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Scott Woods, identifying Michael Scott Woods, M.D.. (Rubaum, David)
February 8, 2023 Filing 55 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #50 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Scott Woods. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration declaration of def Michael Scott Woods, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting def Michael Scott Woods Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) (Rubaum, David)
February 6, 2023 Filing 54 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Certificate of Service on Defendants Dr. Mrugeshkumar Shah, Michael Cain, Philip Ecob, H.J. Cole, Kurt Knewitz, Paul Pendergrass, Ralph Rogers, Richard Butler, Mark Molina, Shawn Mayer, Jade Mayer, Integrity Based Marketing, LLC, Storm Fitness Nutrition, LLC, Ultra Combat Nutrition, LLC, EcoLoft Homes LLC, and Elevated Wellness Partners LLC filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration) (Schmidt, Matthew)
February 2, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Certificate of Service on Defendants #49 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. Please refer to CM/ECF No. 52. (lc)
February 2, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Certificate of Service on Defendants #49 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Please review LR6-1 re 2/24/23 1:00 PM motion hearing. Nevertheless, the Hearing does NOT appear on the pdf documents. It is unclear if filing was to be formal motion or a request for extension of time with its proposed order submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 1, 2023 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Robert Pruitt, identifying Robert Pruitt. (Cook, Philip)
February 1, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Robert Pruitt. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Defendant Robert L. Pruitt III ISO Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Robert Pruitt's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) (Cook, Philip)
February 1, 2023 Filing 49 (STRICKEN PER 2/2/2023 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE ORDER DOCKET NO. 53). NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Certificate of Service on Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Proposed Order) (Schmidt, Matthew) Modified on 2/2/2023 (lc).
January 30, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #38 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #39 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #40 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #44 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Form has ERRONEOUS address of the US District Court as "312 North Spring Street" which is that of Los Angeles County Superior Court; No. 39 has " Santa Ana". Other error(s) with document(s): Filer is advised to Update form to reflect the US District Court's Address to that of the Location of the Assigned Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 29, 2023 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Scott Brunson served on 1/21/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Brunson in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Robert Pruitt served on 12/26/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Pruitt in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Richard Hubbard served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Richard Hubbard in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Britney Williams, employee of RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Michael Hynes, Jr. served on 1/7/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Hynes, Jr. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Scott Woods served on 1/3/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Woods in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Joseph Bolin served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Benjamin Todd Eller served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Benjamin Todd Eller in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Coe Juracek served on 1/28/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Coe Juracek in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Cody Mitchell served on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cody Mitchell in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 29, 2023 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus, upon Defendant Case Grover served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Case Grover in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Matthew)
January 27, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Philip Earl Cook on behalf of Defendant Robert Pruitt (Attorney Philip Earl Cook added to party Robert Pruitt(pty:dft))(Cook, Philip)
January 25, 2023 Filing 35 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant Scott Woods.(Attorney David Jonathan Rubaum added to party Scott Woods(pty:dft))(Rubaum, David)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEED DEADLINE TO RESPONSD TO DEFENDANT TRAMMEL S. CROW, JR'S MOTION TO DISMISS #29 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or before February 15, 2023. Defendant Crow's Reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or before March 10, 2023. The hearing on Defendant Crows Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to March 24, 2023 at 1:30 PM #26 . (lc)
January 18, 2023 Filing 33 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus.(Mazzella, Anastasia)
January 18, 2023 Filing 32 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #30 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc)
January 18, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less). Defendant Robert Pruitt's stipulation with 2 different and incorrect reliefs did NOT record any extension of time to File Answer to Complaint less than 30 days. These incorrect events are for other type of documents. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 17, 2023 Filing 30 (STRICKEN PER 1/18/2023 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE ORDER DOCKET NO. 32). STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File for Defendant Robert Pruitt to Respond to the Initial Complaint by not more than 30 days, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by Plaintiff Julia Hubbard.(Mazzella, Anastasia) Modified on 1/18/2023 (lc).
January 13, 2023 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 2/15/2023 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application For Leave to Extend Deadline) (Balestriere, John)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART JOINT STIPULATION AND APPLICATIONFOR LEAVE TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS ON MEMORANDA OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ANDMODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE #25 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Having considered the parties Stipulation, the court finds the parties do notestablish good cause for an extension to the standard word and page limits for briefs and DENIES the parties' request for an extension. The court expects the parties to comply with the greater of the 7,000-word limit established under Local Rule 11-6.1 or the 25-page limit established by the Initial Standing Order (Dkt. 24) for moving and opposition briefs, as well as the 15-page limit for Defendant Crows reply brief. The court GRANTS in part the Stipulation and SETS the following briefing schedule on Defendant Crow's Motion to Dismiss:1. Defendant Crows deadline to file the Motion to Dismiss January 9, 2023;2. Plaintiffs deadline to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss January 27, 2023; 3. Defendant Crows deadline to file a reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss February 10, 2023; and 4. Hearing on the Motion to Dismiss February 24, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. #26 . (lc)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hawxhurst, Gerald)
January 5, 2023 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to EXTEND PAGE LIMITS ON MEMORANDA OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawxhurst, Gerald)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
December 2, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-07957 FLA(MAAx). (rn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Balestriere, John)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney London England APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Trammell S. Crow, Jr., designating Gerald E. Hawxhurst as local counsel. (lt)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth C. Stone APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Trammell S. Crow, Jr., designating Gerald E. Hawxhurst as local counsel. (lt)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: GRANTING #9 Non-Resident Attorney John G. Balestriere APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Julia Hubbard and Kayla Goedinghaus, designating Anastasia Mazzella as local counsel. (lt)
November 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney London England to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34313194) #16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth C. Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34313187) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note MJ Notice of MJ Assignment, dated 11/3/22, Dkt. 4. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
November 10, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney London England to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34313194) filed by Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Foltyn-Smith, Kyle)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth C. Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34313187) filed by Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Foltyn-Smith, Kyle)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick Bryan Nichols counsel for Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. Adding Patrick B. Nichols as counsel of record for Trammell S. Crow, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Trammell S. Crow, Jr.. (Attorney Patrick Bryan Nichols added to party Trammell S Crow, Jr.(pty:dft))(Nichols, Patrick)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr., (Foltyn-Smith, Kyle)
November 10, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kyle DeWitt Foltyn-Smith counsel for Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. Adding Kyle D. Foltyn-Smith as counsel of record for Trammell S. Crow, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Trammell S. Crow, Jr.. (Attorney Kyle DeWitt Foltyn-Smith added to party Trammell S Crow, Jr.(pty:dft))(Foltyn-Smith, Kyle)
November 10, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gerald E. Hawxhurst counsel for Defendant Trammell S Crow, Jr.. Adding Gerald E. Hawxhurst as counsel of record for Trammell S. Crow, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Trammell S. Crow, Jr.. (Attorney Gerald E. Hawxhurst added to party Trammell S Crow, Jr.(pty:dft))(Hawxhurst, Gerald)
November 10, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus. upon Trammell S Crow, Jr. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Gerald E. Hawxhurst. (Schmidt, Matthew)
November 10, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Withdraw , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John G. Balestriere to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34310549) filed by Plaintiff Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Mazzella, Anastasia)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Schmidt, Matthew)
November 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John G. Balestriere. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Joseph Bolin, Scott Brunson, Richard Butler, Michael Cain, H.J. Cole, Trammell S Crow, Jr., Doe Companies, Doe Individuals, EcoLoft Homes LLC, Philip Ecob, Elevated Wellness Partners LLC, Benjamin Todd Eller, Case Grover, Richard Hubbard, Michael Hynes, Jr., Integrity Based Marketing, LLC, Coe Juracek, Kurt Knewitz, Jade Mayer, Shawn Mayer, Melissa Miller, Cody Mitchell, Mark Molina, Paul Pendergrass, Robert Pruitt, RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Ralph Rogers, Mrugeshkumar Shah, Storm Fitness Nutrition, LLC, Ultra Combat Nutrition, LLC, Scott Woods. (sh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Schmidt, Matthew)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kayla Goedinghaus, Julia Hubbard. (Schmidt, Matthew)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34253033 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Julia Hubbard, Kayla Goedinghaus. (Attorney Matthew W Schmidt added to party Kayla Goedinghaus(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew W Schmidt added to party Julia Hubbard(pty:pla))(Schmidt, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julia Hubbard et al v. Trammell S. Crow, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Hubbard
Represented By: Matthew W Schmidt
Represented By: Anastasia Kinney Mazzella
Represented By: John G. Balestriere
Represented By: Matthew W. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Goedinghaus
Represented By: Matthew W Schmidt
Represented By: Anastasia Kinney Mazzella
Represented By: John G. Balestriere
Represented By: Matthew W. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell S Crow, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald E. Hawxhurst
Represented By: Kyle DeWitt Foltyn-Smith
Represented By: Patrick Bryan Nichols
Represented By: Kenneth C. Stone
Represented By: London England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Benjamin Todd Eller
Represented By: Terrence Matthew Jones
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Melissa Miller
Represented By: David P Pruett
Represented By: Michael John Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scott Woods
Represented By: David Jonathan Rubaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mrugeshkumar Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coe Juracek
Represented By: Diane M. Doolittle
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Bergjans
Represented By: Adam J. DiClemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Ecob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Ranger Cody Mitchell
Represented By: Alec Raymond Simpson, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Knewitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pendergrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pruitt
Represented By: Philip Earl Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Grover
Represented By: Olivia Hyejun Kim
Represented By: Delmar Shariff Thomas
Represented By: Justin Michael Marvisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Michael Marvisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Based Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storm Fitness Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra Combat Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EcoLoft Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevated Wellness Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Individuals 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Companies 21 to 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?