Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc., Navigator Forwarding Co., Ltd and Does One through Ten
Case Number: 2:2022cv08073
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On December 14, 2022, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution #14 . On December 21, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Response #15 and informed the Court that the matter recently settled. Plaintiff expects that the exchange of consideration will be completed in less than 45 days and that Plaintiff will file a dismissal of the action pursuant to FRCP 41 within that period. In light of the Plaintiff's response, the Court hereby continues the deadline to February 21, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New Yorkto Order to Show Cause, #14 (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than December 21, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, upon Defendant Navigator Forwarding Co., Ltd served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon American Alternative Insurance Corporation - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, upon Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service - Trudy Desbiens - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, upon Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service - Trudy Desbiens - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc., Navigator Forwarding Co., Ltd. (ghap)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying American Financial Group; Great American Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Kirsch, Joshua)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, identifying Paramount Export Co.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34273740 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Great American Insurance Company of New York(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigator Forwarding Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?