Thomas David Sides v. Hossini et al
Plaintiff: Thomas David Sides
Defendant: Dr. Hossini, Dr. Gullini and Dr. Alan Delman
Case Number: 2:2022cv08334
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Thomas David Sides. (es)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DEFERRING RULING ON IFP REQUEST by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend. On or before 1/6/2023, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies identified in this Order, if he wishes to proceed with this action. Failure to timely file an amended complaint that remedies the deficiencies identified in this Order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. In addition, the Court DEFERS ruling on Plaintiff's IFP request #2 until Plaintiff has filed a satisfactory amended pleading. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of the Court's form for a Civil Rights Complaint filed by a prisoner. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Thomas David Sides. (ghap)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Alan Delman(Orthopidic Doctor, official capacity), Alan Delman(individual), Gullini(MD at FCI-Terminal Island, official capcity), Gullini(individual), Hossini(individual), Hossini(Clincal Director, official capacity) pursuant to Bivens v. Six Unknown Agents. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish., filed by plaintiff Thomas David Sides. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas David Sides v. Hossini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas David Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hossini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gullini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alan Delman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?