GS Holistic, LLC v. Tour For Less LLC et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: Tour For Less LLC doing business as Smoker's Club Smoke Shop and Ramy Mansour
Case Number: 2:2022cv08607
Filed: November 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ramy Mansour, Tour For Less LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued- Ramy Mansour)(rolm)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Remaining Summons)(Leon, Tomas)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (sh)
November 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, identifying Chris Folkerts, GS Holistic, LLC, Leon Law LLP, Tomas Carlos Leon, TOUR FOR LESS LLC d/b/a SMOKERS CLUB SMOKE SHOP and RAMY MANSOUR. (Leon, Tomas)
November 25, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
November 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
November 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34378304 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attorney Tomas Carlos Leon added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla))(Leon, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. Tour For Less LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Tomas Carlos Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tour For Less LLC doing business as Smoker's Club Smoke Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramy Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?