Newpoint Financial Corp. v. Bermuda Monetary Authority et al
Plaintiff: Newpoint Financial Corp.
Defendant: Bermuda Monetary Authority, Gerald Gakundi, Susan Davis-Crockwell and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv08659
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Bermuda Monetary Authority, Susan Davis-Crockwell, Gerald Gakundi. (lc)
December 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorect Event as "MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT". Pdf is the resubmitted Summons Request. The correct event is: SUMMONS REQUEST. Other error(s) with document(s): Please avoid use of "miscellaneous" events when correct events are available. To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. Summons Request is a clerk's process. Although filer failed to use correct event as previously advised. For this time ONLY, clerk will assist filer and the summons will be issued by separate entry. Please use correct events in future filings Therefore filer does not need to respond to this notice. (lc)
December 20, 2022 Filing 15 Summons filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp. Amended Summons re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Kutepova, Jane)
December 20, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #13 . The following error(s) was found: Wrong Event: Category: cmp Event: MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case. CORRECT EVENT: Summons Request. 1) Please Remove ERRONEOUS "AMENDED" on title. 2) Filer "created a "misc complaint" and erroneously paid $49.00. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED SUMMONS Receipt No: BCACDC-34488256 - Fee: $49, filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp..(Kutepova, Jane)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (pk)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08659 MCS(PVCx). (rn)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08659 RSWL(PVCx). (rn)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter L Steinman counsel for Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp.. Adding Jane M. Kutepova as counsel of record for Plaintiff, NEWPOINT FINANCIAL CORP. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff NEWPOINT FINANCIAL CORP.. (Steinman, Peter)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bermuda Monetary Authority, Susan Davis-Crockwell, Gerald Gakundi. (lh)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp.. (Steinman, Peter)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp., identifying (Newpoint Financial Corp.; NFG, Sarl; Bermuda Monetary Authority; Gerald Gakundi; Susan Davis-Crockwell). (Steinman, Peter)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp.. (Steinman, Peter)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34391331 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Financial Corp.. (Attorney Peter L Steinman added to party Newpoint Financial Corp.(pty:pla))(Steinman, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newpoint Financial Corp. v. Bermuda Monetary Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newpoint Financial Corp.
Represented By: Peter L Steinman
Represented By: Jane M Kutepova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bermuda Monetary Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Gakundi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Davis-Crockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?