Edelson PC v. David Lira et al
Petitioner: Edelson PC
Respondent: Erika Girardi, David Lira, Keith Griffin, Erika Jayne, EJ Global, LLC, Christopher Kamon, George Hatcher, Wrongful Death Consultants, JOSEPH DINARDO and California Attorney Lending II, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv08787
Filed: December 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Hernan D Vera
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-093), Amending Order 23-078 approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court in the creation of the calendar of Judge Hernn D. Vera and Order of the Chief Judge No. 23-078 filed June 20, 2023, 2:22-cv-08787-JFW-MAAx, Edelson PC v. David Lira et al, was transferred from the calendar of Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Hernn D. Vera. An Order of self-recusal by Judge Judge Hernn D. Vera having been filed July 13, 2023, 2:22-cv-08787-JFW-MAAx was returned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (rn)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Case is returned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-08787 JFW(MAAx). (rn)
July 10, 2023 Filing 227 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Reassignment filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Tievsky, Alexander)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 23-078) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08787-HDV-MAAx. (sn)
April 17, 2023 Filing 224 Notice of filing bankruptcy filed by defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice)(Scherer, Richard)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER KAMON'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS [filed 2/13/23; Docket No. #189 ]; ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DAVID LIRA'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS UNTIL RESOLUTION OF THE PARALLEL CRIMINAL PROCEEDING [filed 2/13/23; Docket No. #194 ]; and ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY BY DEFENDANTS HATCHER AND WRONGFUL DEATH CONSULTANTS [filed 2/17/23; Docket No. #205 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Kamon's Motion to Stay Proceedings, Lira's Motion to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding, and the Hatcher Defendants' Motion to Stay are GRANTED. This action is stayed pending resolution of the three parallel criminal cases the Illinois Criminal Case, the First California Criminal Case, and the Second California Criminal Case. In light of the Courts Order staying this action, all pending motions #161 , #163 , #166 , #167 , #168 , and #171 are DENIED without prejudice to re-filing after the stay is lifted. Counsel for Edelson shall notify the Court when the three parallel criminal cases have been concluded. (iv)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS [Docket Nos. #161 , #163 , #166 , #167 , #168 , #171 , #189 , #194 , and #205 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that these matters are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for March 20, 2023 is hereby vacated and the matters are taken off calendar. The matters will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (iv)
March 8, 2023 Filing 221 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lannen, Rachel)
March 8, 2023 Filing 220 Notice OF JOINDER IN [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION ON MOTION TO STAY CASE filed by Defendants George Hatcher. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lanza, Anthony)
March 8, 2023 Filing 219 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases #205 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Motions to Stay)(Wade-Scott, J.)
March 8, 2023 Filing 218 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc. re: Notice of Lodging, #217 (Brueckner, William)
March 8, 2023 Filing 217 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases #205 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Statement of Decision)(Brueckner, William)
March 8, 2023 Filing 216 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Motion to Stay)(Park, Steven)
March 6, 2023 Filing 215 REPLY Reply to Responses to Motions to Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases #205 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Cal II's Responses to Pl's First Set of Interrogatories)(Wade-Scott, J.)
March 6, 2023 Filing 214 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. (Park, Steven)
February 27, 2023 Filing 213 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases #205 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 filed by Defendants EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Borges, Evan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 212 Proof of Service filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc. re: Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #210 , Request for Judicial Notice,, #211 (Brueckner, William)
February 27, 2023 Filing 211 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases #205 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Edelson's ILND Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Stipulation of Dismissal and Docket Entry, #3 Exhibit - Trustee's AP Complaint, #4 Exhibit - Order of Dismissal and Transcript, #5 Exhibit - U.S. Attorneys' Annual Statistical Report)(Brueckner, William)
February 27, 2023 Filing 210 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases #205 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William)
February 24, 2023 Filing 209 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Park, Steven)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT JOSEPH DINARDOS MOTION TO DISMISS [filed 1/23/23; Docket No. #161 ]; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY LENDING II, INC.'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [filed 1/23/23; Docket No. #163 ]; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS ERIKA GIRARDI AND EJ GLOBAL, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF EDELSON PC'S COMPLAINT [filed 1/23/23; Docket No. #166 ]; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT HATCHER AND WRONGFUL DEATH CONSULTANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(b)(6) & (7) [filed 1/23/23; Docket No. #167 ]; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS WRONGFUL DEATH CONSULTANTS AND GEORGE HATCHERS MOTION FOR CLAW BACK ORDER [filed 1/23/23; Docket No. #168 ]; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTKEITH GRIFFIN'S JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANTS'ARGUMENTS ISSUES, AND EVIDENCE ON MOTIONSTO DISMISS [filed 1/24/23; Docket No. #171 ]; and DENYING JOINT REQUEST TO APPEAR AT FEBRUARY 27, 2023 HEARING VIA ZOOM [filed 2/15/23; Docket No. #201 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court continues the hearings to March 20, 2023, at 1:30 pm. The Joint Request to Appear at February 27, 2023 Hearing Via Zoom is DENIED. (iv)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:22-cv-08513 GW(MRWx) (rn)
February 21, 2023 Filing 206 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Motion to Stay Case #205 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
February 17, 2023 Filing 205 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Three Related Criminal Cases filed by Defendants George Hatcher. Motion set for hearing on 3/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Lanza, Anthony)
February 15, 2023 Filing 204 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Defendants EG and EJG's Motion to Dismiss)(Borges, Evan)
February 15, 2023 Filing 203 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 #171 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #161 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)(Wade-Scott, J.)
February 15, 2023 Filing 202 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Motion for "Claw Back" Order)(Wade-Scott, J.)
February 15, 2023 Filing 201 Joint REQUEST to appear at February 27, 2023 hearing via Zoom filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scherer, Richard)
February 15, 2023 Filing 200 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION ON DEFENDANTS WRONGFUL DEATH CONSULTANTS AND GEORGE HATCHERS MOTION TO DISMISS)(Smith, Brodie)
February 15, 2023 Filing 199 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION ON MOTION FOR CLAW BACK ORDER)(Lanza, Anthony)
February 15, 2023 Filing 198 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #161 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Statement of Decision)(Scherer, Richard)
February 15, 2023 Filing 197 STATEMENT of Decision NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Decision Granting California Attorney Lending II, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6))(Brueckner, William)
February 13, 2023 Filing 196 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #189 filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Indictment in U.S. v. Girardi, et al., USDC, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1_23-cr-00054, #2 Exhibit Minute Entry in Edelson v. Girardi, et al., USDC, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1_20cv07115, #3 Exhibit Waiver of Indictment in U.S. v. Kamon, USDC, C.D. California, Case No. 2_23-cr-00024, #4 Exhibit Notice of Related Case filed in U.S. v. Girardi, et al., USDC, C.D. California, Case No. 2_23-cr-00047, #5 Exhibit Federal Bureau of Prisons Visiting Regulations, #6 Exhibit Federal Bureau of Prisons Legal Activities, Inmate)(Park, Steven)
February 13, 2023 Filing 195 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #194 filed by Defendant David Lira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Indictment in United States v. Thomas Girardi, et al., U.S. District Case No. 123-cr-00054, #2 Exhibit Indictment in the US v. Girardi, et al., U.S. District Court, C.D. California, Case No. 223-cr-00047)(Lannen, Rachel)
February 13, 2023 Filing 194 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding filed by Defendant David Lira. Motion set for hearing on 3/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Lannen, Rachel)
February 13, 2023 Filing 193 DECLARATION of Anthony Lanza, Esq. in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony)
February 13, 2023 Filing 192 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony)
February 13, 2023 Filing 191 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 filed by Defendants EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Borges, Evan)
February 13, 2023 Filing 190 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony)
February 13, 2023 Filing 189 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. Motion set for hearing on 3/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Indictment in U.S. v. Girardi, et al., USDC, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1_23-cr-00054, #2 Exhibit 2: Minute Entry in Edelson v. Girardi, et al., USDC, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1_20cv07115, #3 Exhibit 3: Waiver of Indictment in U.S. v. Kamon, USDC, C.D. California, Case No. 2_23-cr-00024, #4 Exhibit 4: Notice of Related Case filed in U.S. v. Girardi, et al., USDC, C.D. California, Case No. 2_23-cr-00047, #5 Exhibit 5: Federal Bureau of Prisons Visiting Regulations, #6 Exhibit 6: Federal Bureau of Prisons Legal Activities, Inmate, #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Park, Steven)
February 13, 2023 Filing 188 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William)
February 13, 2023 Filing 187 Text Entry Order: Defendant David Liras Motion to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding, filed February 10, 2023 (Docket No. #184 ), and Defendant Christopher Kamons Motion to Stay Proceedings, filed February 10, 2023 (Docket No. #182 ), are STRICKEN for violating paragraph 3(b) of the Courts Standing Order which provides in relevant part, All documents filed electronically shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rule 5-4. Each PDF file shall contain no more than one document or exhibit, see Local Rule 5-4.3.1, and each document or exhibit shall be meaningfully described on the docket such that the document or exhibit can be easily identified. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2023 Filing 186 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #161 filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Scherer, Richard)
February 10, 2023 Filing 185 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding #184 filed by Defendant David Lira. (Lannen, Rachel)
February 10, 2023 Filing 184 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of the Parallel Criminal Proceeding filed by Defendant David Lira. Motion set for hearing on 3/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lannen, Rachel) Modified on 2/13/2023 (sr).
February 10, 2023 Filing 183 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters #182 filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. (Park, Steven)
February 10, 2023 Filing 182 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Criminal Matters filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. Motion set for hearing on 3/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Park, Steven) Modified on 2/13/2023 (sr).
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2024 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 3/15/2024 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on February 13, 2023 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby orders this case referred to: ADR Procedure No. 3: Private mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: September 18, 2023. (iv)
February 6, 2023 Filing 179 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Wade-Scott, J.)
February 6, 2023 Filing 178 DECLARATION of Alexander G. Tievsky In Support of Plaintiffs Consolidated Opposition to Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule 12(b)(7) Motions to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 #171 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #161 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Tievsky, Alexander)
February 6, 2023 Filing 177 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 #171 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #161 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Wade-Scott, J.)
February 5, 2023 Filing 176 LOCAL RULE 7-3 REPORT filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. (Park, Steven)
February 1, 2023 Filing 175 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Case Management Statement ; estimated length of trial 15-20 days, filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC.. (Wade-Scott, J.)
January 30, 2023 Filing 174 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo, identifying EDELSON PC, DAVID LIRA, KEITH GRIFFIN, ERIKA GIRARDI a/k/a ERIKA JAYNE, EJ GLOBAL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER KAMON, GEORGE HATCHER, WRONGFUL DEATH CONSULTANTS, JOSEPH DINARDO, and CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY LENDING II, INC.. (Scherer, Richard)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS IN PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS #172 by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff may file a Consolidated Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss of up to 50 pages. (iv)
January 25, 2023 Filing 172 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Wade-Scott, J.)
January 24, 2023 Filing 171 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #167 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #166 filed by Defendant Keith Griffin. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (St Martin, Laura)
January 23, 2023 Filing 170 DECLARATION of Brodie H. Smith, Esq. in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibit A) Emails between attorneys Alex Tievsky and Brodie H. Smith dated Nov. 29 - Dec. 1, 2022)(Lanza, Anthony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 169 DECLARATION of George Hatcher in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back #168 filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 168 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Claw Back filed by Defendants Wrongful Death Consultants and George Hatcher. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Lanza, Anthony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Wrongful Death Consultants George Hatcher. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Lanza, Anthony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 166 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Edelson PC's Complaint) (Borges, Evan)
January 23, 2023 Filing 165 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William)
January 23, 2023 Filing 164 DECLARATION of Paul Cody in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #163 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Loan Documents, #2 Exhibit UCC Filings)(Brueckner, William)
January 23, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brueckner, William)
January 23, 2023 Filing 162 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #161 filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assignment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Stipulation)(Scherer, Richard)
January 23, 2023 Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Scherer, Richard)
January 13, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant George Hatcher, identifying EDELSON PC, DAVID LIRA, KEITH GRIFFIN, ERIKA GIRARDI a/k/a ERIKA JAYNE, EJ GLOBAL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER KAMON, GEORGE HATCHER, WRONGFUL DEATH CONSULTANTS, JOSEPH DINARDO, and CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY LENDING II, INC.. (Lanza, Anthony)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 13, 2023 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before February 1, 2023. (iv)
January 11, 2023 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon, (Park, Steven)
January 11, 2023 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon.(Park, Steven)
January 9, 2023 Filing 156 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean E Ponist counsel for Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. Samantha Yu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Ponist, Sean)
January 9, 2023 Filing 155 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean E Ponist counsel for Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. Cary D. McReyolds is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Ponist, Sean)
January 9, 2023 Filing 154 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #153 , Notice of Appearance #152 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 6, 2023 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Laura Kelly St Martin on behalf of Defendant Keith Griffin (Attorney Laura Kelly St Martin added to party Keith Griffin(pty:dft))(St Martin, Laura)
January 6, 2023 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan D Saba on behalf of Defendant Keith Griffin (Saba, Ryan)
January 6, 2023 Filing 151 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. Amendment to Report #150 Regarding Local Rule 7-3 (Brueckner, William)
January 5, 2023 Filing 150 LOCAL RULE 7-3 JOINT REPORT filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William)
January 5, 2023 Filing 149 LOCAL RULE 7-3 JOINT REPORT of Regarding Defendants Hatcher and Wrongful Death Consultants Intended Claw Back Motion filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony)
December 28, 2022 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Steven D. Park re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. (Park, Steven)
December 16, 2022 Filing 147 DECLARATION of J. Eli Wade-Scott re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Wade-Scott, J.)
December 15, 2022 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Balabanian, Rafey)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON- RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A ECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: Granting #131 Non-Resident Attorney Alexander G. Tievsky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Edelson PC, designating Daniel Abraham as local counsel. (es)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON- RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: Granting #132 Non-Resident Attorney Jay Edelson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Edelson PC, designating Daniel Abraham as local counsel. (es)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: Granting #134 Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Hilligoss APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Edelson PC, designating Daniel Abraham as local counsel. (es)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: Granting #133 Non-Resident Attorney Eli J. Wade-Scott APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Edelson PC, designating Daniel Abraham as local counsel. (es)
December 15, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #130 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 14, 2022 Filing 140 DECLARATION of William E. Brueckner re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William)
December 14, 2022 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Richard M. Scherer re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Scherer, Richard)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney William Savino to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc., designating Sean Ponist as local counsel #125 . (iv)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Richard Scherer,Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Joseph DiNardo, designating Jeff Poole as local counsel #114 . (iv)
December 13, 2022 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David Lira David Lira, identifying Thomas V. Girardi and Girardi & Keese. (Lannen, Rachel)
December 13, 2022 Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant David Lira David Lira.(Lannen, Rachel)
December 13, 2022 Filing 134 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Hilligoss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Edelson PC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34468692) filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV Hannah Hilligoss) (Abraham, Daniel)
December 13, 2022 Filing 133 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Edelson PC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34468626) filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV J. Eli Wade-Scott) (Abraham, Daniel)
December 13, 2022 Filing 132 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jay Edelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Edelson PC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34468247) filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV Jay Edelson) (Abraham, Daniel)
December 13, 2022 Filing 131 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander G. Tievsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Edelson PC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 12/13/2022, Receipt No. 34467847) filed by Plaintiff Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV Alexander G. Tievsky) (Abraham, Daniel)
December 13, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel David McDonough Abraham on behalf of Plaintiff Edelson PC (Attorney Daniel David McDonough Abraham added to party Edelson PC(pty:pla))(Abraham, Daniel)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER KAMON TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #126 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant shall have up to and including January 11, 2023. (iv)
December 12, 2022 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Evan C. Borges re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Defendants EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Borges, Evan)
December 12, 2022 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Brodie H. Smith re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Defendant George Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony)
December 12, 2022 Filing 126 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christopher Kamon answer now due 1/11/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 filed by Defendant Christopher Kamon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Steven D Park added to party Christopher Kamon(pty:dft))(Park, Steven)
December 12, 2022 Filing 125 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William F. Savino to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34461238) filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ponist, Sean)
December 9, 2022 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Rachel M Lannen re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Defendant David Lira. (Lannen, Rachel)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING ALL MOTIONS WITHOUTPREJUDICE by Judge John F. Walter. In light of the transfer of this action to this Court's calendar, all Motions are denied without prejudice to refiling in accordance with this Court's Standing Order, filed on December 6, 2022 (Docket No. 113). (lom)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #119 Non-Resident Attorney William E Brueckner, III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of California Attorney Lending II, Inc., designating Sean E Ponist as local counsel. (lom)
December 8, 2022 Filing 121 REPLY in support of #60 Motion to Dismiss Complaint of Edelson PC filed by Defendants EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Borges, Evan)
December 8, 2022 Filing 120 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #43 DEFENDANT W.D.C.S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND OTHER GROUNDS (JOINED BY DEFENDANT HATCHER) filed by Defendant Wrongful Death Consultants. (Lanza, Anthony)
December 8, 2022 Filing 119 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William E. Brueckner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34447238) filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ponist, Sean)
December 8, 2022 Filing 118 REPLY In Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #58 filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Poole, Jeff)
December 8, 2022 Filing 117 REPLY in support of #55 MOTION TO DISMISS for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Ponist, Sean)
December 8, 2022 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Ryan Saba re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #113 filed by Defendant Keith Griffin. (Saba, Ryan)
December 6, 2022 Filing 115 REPLY in support of a motion MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(7) #49 filed by Defendant Keith Griffin. (Saba, Ryan)
December 6, 2022 Filing 114 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard M. Scherer, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Joseph Dinardo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34434647) filed by Defendant Joseph Dinardo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Poole, Jeff)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
December 6, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William F. Savino. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard M Scherer, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jay Edelson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Hilligoss. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alexander Glenn Tievsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 106 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:22-cv-03977-JSC, from California Northern District San Francisco. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-08787 JFW (MAAx). (sh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 102 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE: VENUE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/2/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
December 2, 2022 Case transferred to Central District of California. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing on Dkt. Nos. 41, 43, 47, 54, 55, 61 held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on 12/1/2022. (Digital Recording Time: 9:00-9:25)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 30, 2022 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE re #93 ORDER. Copies of #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Issued, and #93 ORDER, provided to US Marshal for service. USM-285 form attached to this docket entry. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah Hilligoss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17767473.) filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hilligoss, Hannah) (Filed on 11/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 23, 2022 Filing 96 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(7), #43 MOTION to Dismiss , #60 MOTION to Dismiss , #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byEdelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander G. Tievsky, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #94 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitations in Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Page Limitations in Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss filed by Edelson PC. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #87 Ex Parte Application for Motion for Service by United States Marshal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 92 REPLY (re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue to the Central District of California ) filed byEJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Borges, Evan) (Filed on 11/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 91 REPLY (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byCalifornia Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brueckner, William) (Filed on 11/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 90 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California ) filed byGeorge Hatcher. (Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 11/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 89 REPLY (re #54 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to Section 1404(a) to the Central District of California ) filed byKeith Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Griffin)(Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 11/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 16, 2022 Filing 88 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California ) filed byDavid Lira. (Lannen, Rachel) (Filed on 11/16/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 87 Ex Parte Application for Motion for Service by United States Marshal filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Detention Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Service by United States Marshal)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw #17 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Edelson PC. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 11/28/2022. Replies due by 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Detention Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 85 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California, #43 MOTION to Dismiss , #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue, #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue to the Central District of California, #54 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to Section 1404(a) to the Central District of California, #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byEdelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott)(Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 11/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #83 Stipulation to have the various motions scheduled to be heard on December 1, 2022 and December 22, 2022 placed on Zoom calendar. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #54 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to Section 1404(a) to the Central District of California, #61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue to the Central District of California, #43 MOTION to Dismiss , #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California, #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim, #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #60 MOTION to Dismiss , #49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(7), #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing reset for 12/1/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an app earance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 11/30/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing reset for 12/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 12/21/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to have the various motions scheduled to be heard on December 1, 2022 and December 22, 2022 placed on Zoom calendar filed by Joseph DiNardo. (Scherer, Richard) (Filed on 11/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 13, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE of Errata re #81 Case Management Statement by Edelson PC. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 10/13/2022) Modified on 10/17/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 10, 2022 Filing 81 Case Management Statement & [Proposed] Order filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott, #2 Exhibit 1) (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 10/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 5, 2022 Filing 80 REQUEST for Photocopies by Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #78 Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for Service on Christopher Kamon. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 4, 2022 Filing 78 Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for Service on Christopher Kamon filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott, #2 Proposed Order)(Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 10/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #75 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on Pending Motions. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 29, 2022 Filing 76 RESPONSE re #39 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent - Response to Notice of Pendency of Related Action Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-13 by Edelson PC. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 9/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule on Pending Motions filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott in Support of Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on Pending Motions) (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 9/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING DATE Motion Hearing ( #41 , #43 , #47 , #49 , #54 , #55 , #58 , #60 , and #61 ) reset for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding In-Person Hearing) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party (Defendant Christopher Kamon) has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Scherer, Richard) (Filed on 9/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Borges, Evan) (Filed on 9/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Defendants George Hatcher and Wrongful Death Consultants (Smith, Brodie) (Filed on 9/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 68 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lannen, Rachel) (Filed on 9/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 67 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 9/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 66 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Keith Griffin (Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 9/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 65 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 9/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir Shakoorian (Shakoorian, Amir) (Filed on 9/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by David Shackelford (Shackelford, David) (Filed on 9/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Brodie Hugh Smith for Defendants George Hatcher and Wrongful Death Consultants (Smith, Brodie) (Filed on 9/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue to the Central District of California filed by EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan C. Borges in Support of Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue to the Central District of California)(Borges, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Edelson PC's Complaint)(Borges, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 59 Request for Judicial Notice re #58 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed byJoseph DiNardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assignment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Stipulation)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Scherer, Richard) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph DiNardo. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scherer, Richard) (Filed on 9/21/2022) Modified on 9/21/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 57 Request for Judicial Notice re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim filed byCalifornia Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 56 Declaration of Paul Cody in Support of #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim filed byCalifornia Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Loan Documents, #2 Exhibit UCC Filings)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim)(Brueckner, William) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to Section 1404(a) to the Central District of California; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Keith Griffin. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) Modified on 9/21/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 53 Certificate of Interested Entities by Keith Griffin identifying Other Affiliate Thomas V. Girardi, Other Affiliate Girardi Keese for Keith Griffin. (Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 52 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keith Griffin.. (Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 51 Joinder by Keith Griffin re #48 Request for Judicial Notice, #43 MOTION to Dismiss , #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) Modified on 9/21/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 50 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George Hatcher.. (Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(7); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Keith Griffin. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Replies due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saba, Ryan) (Filed on 9/21/2022) Modified on 9/21/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 20, 2022 Filing 48 Request for Judicial Notice re #47 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed byDavid Lira. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Lannen, Rachel) (Filed on 9/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 20, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California filed by David Lira. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/4/2022. Replies due by 10/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration) (Lannen, Rachel) (Filed on 9/20/2022) Modified on 9/20/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 16, 2022 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Defendants George Hatcher and Wrongful Death Consultants filed Motions to Dismiss on 9/15/2022. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3, the opposition to a motion is due no more than 14 days after the motion is filed and the reply is due 7 days after the opposition is filed. Counsel did not obtain a Court order to extend the briefing schedules on the motions. (See Civil Local Rule 6). Accordingly, the Court adjusts the briefing schedules in accordance with the Local Rules: Responses due by 9/29/2022. Replies due by 10/6/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants George Hatcher and Wrongful Death Consultants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/22/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ( Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 44 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Request for Judicial Notice re #43 MOTION to Dismiss filed byWrongful Death Consultants. (Related document(s) #43 ) (Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 9/15/2022) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wrongful Death Consultants. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/17/2022. Replies due by 10/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 9/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 42 Declaration of George Hatcher in Support of #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California filed byGeorge Hatcher. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 9/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Other Grounds, Or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Central District of California filed by George Hatcher. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/17/2022. Replies due by 10/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 9/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by George Hatcher and Wrongful Death Consultants (Lanza, Anthony) (Filed on 9/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 15, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Pendency of Related Action Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-13 by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 9/15/2022) Modified on 9/20/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent California Attorney Lending Holdings, LLC for California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 9/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph DiNardo.. (Scherer, Richard) (Filed on 9/12/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Lira.. (Lannen, Rachel) (Filed on 9/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 35 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants David Lira and Joseph DiNardo shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/23/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
September 2, 2022 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edelson PC identifying Other Affiliate United States of America, Other Affiliate State Bar of California, Other Affiliate Bias Ramadhan A.S. Bin Misyadi, Other Affiliate Guntur Idil Akbar Bin Misyadi, Other Affiliate Dzikri Agung Haryadi, Other Affiliate Hana Kamila Chairunnisa Binti Misyadi, Other Affiliate Dian Daniaty Binti Uidn Zaenudin, Other Affiliate M.N., a minor child of Dian, Other Affiliate Anice Kasim, Other Affiliate T.A.S., a minor child of Anice, Other Affiliate S.C.S., a minor child of Anice, Other Affiliate Zahra Amanda, Other Affiliate Elza Warti, Other Affiliate Multi Rizki, Other Affiliate Westhi Ramadina, Other Affiliate Mugni Rifki, Other Affiliate Muhammad Nur Fuadi, Other Affiliate M. Nuran Tk. Mudo, Other Affiliate Septiana Damayanti, Other Affiliate N.I.R., a minor child of Septiana, Other Affiliate A.M.Q., a minor child of Septiana, Other Affiliate Hudson Property & Casualty, Other Affiliate Wisner Law Firm for Edelson PC. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 9/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 33 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi.. (Borges, Evan) (Filed on 8/30/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 25, 2022 Filing 32 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Attorney Lending II, Inc... (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 8/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 23, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION re Extension for Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global LLC to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1 filed by EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Borges, Evan) (Filed on 8/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Filing 28 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17457203.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/19/2022 filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Brueckner, William) (Filed on 8/19/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17455602.) filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc.. (Savino, William) (Filed on 8/18/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17453417.) filed by Joseph DiNardo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scherer, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants David Lira, Erika Girardi, EJ Global, LLC, Joseph DiNardo, and California Attorney Lending II, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/30/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Joseph DiNardo. (Poole, Jeff) (Filed on 8/16/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension to Defendant David Lira's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Lira. (Lannen, Rachel) (Filed on 8/9/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION re Extension for Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global LLC to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1 filed by EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi. (Borges, Evan) (Filed on 8/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edelson PC. Erika Girardi served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 8/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edelson PC. EJ Global, LLC served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 8/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
August 5, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time for Defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead to September 21, 2022 filed by Edelson PC. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 8/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 21, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edelson PC.. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 7/21/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Edelson PC. Service waived by Wrongful Death Consultants waiver sent on 7/18/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 7/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Edelson PC. Service waived by George Hatcher waiver sent on 7/18/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 7/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edelson PC. California Attorney Lending II, Inc. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Wade-Scott, J.) (Filed on 7/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Edelson. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Eli Wade-Scott. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander G. Tievsky. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to California Attorney Lending II, Inc., Joseph DiNardo, EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi, Keith Griffin, George Hatcher, Christopher Kamon, David Lira, Wrongful Death Consultants. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 7/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted Version of Complaint)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 7/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17328686.) filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 7/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17328677.) filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wade-Scott, J. Eli) (Filed on 7/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17328672.) filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 7/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Racketeering; Demand for Jury Trial against California Attorney Lending II, Inc., Joseph DiNardo, EJ Global, LLC, Erika Girardi, Keith Griffin, George Hatcher, Christopher Kamon, David Lira, Wrongful Death Consultants (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17328580.). Filed by Edelson PC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 7/6/2022) Modified on 7/8/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelson PC v. David Lira et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erika Girardi
Represented By: Evan Christopher Borges
Represented By: Amir A Shakoorian Tabrizi
Represented By: David T Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Lira
Represented By: Rachel Marilyn Lannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Griffin
Represented By: Ryan D Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erika Jayne
Represented By: Evan Christopher Borges
Represented By: Amir A Shakoorian Tabrizi
Represented By: David T Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EJ Global, LLC
Represented By: Evan Christopher Borges
Represented By: Amir A Shakoorian Tabrizi
Represented By: David T Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Kamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Hatcher
Represented By: Anthony L. Lanza
Represented By: Brodie Hugh Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wrongful Death Consultants
Represented By: Anthony L. Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOSEPH DINARDO
Represented By: Jeff W. Poole
Represented By: Richard M Scherer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Attorney Lending II, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Eric Ponist
Represented By: William F. Savino
Represented By: William E Brueckner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edelson PC
Represented By: Rafey S Balabanian
Represented By: Alexander Glenn Tievsky
Represented By: Hannah Hilligoss
Represented By: J. Eli Wade-Scott
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?