Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. v. Ocean Line Logistics Inc
Counter Defendant: Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.
Counter Claimant: Ocean Line Logistics Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv08825
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan D. Press to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/30/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34706351) filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gaba, Rodolfo)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Attorney Bryan D. Press filed an application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #36 . The Proposed Order submitted with the application, however, is not "flattened," that is, it is not saved in a way that eliminates the text input boxes and prevents further edits to the document. By no later than February 6, 2023, Plaintiff and its counsel shall lodge and submit and Amended Proposed Order that is properly flattened. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice application without prejudice. (lc)
January 31, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan D. Press to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc., Counter Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
January 30, 2023 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan D. Press to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc., Counter Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34706351) filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc., Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gaba, Rodolfo)
January 19, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rodolfo Gaba, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. (Attorney Rodolfo Gaba, Jr added to party Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.(pty:pla))(Gaba, Rodolfo)
January 17, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to Counterclaim #30 filed by Counterdefendant Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc..(Attorney Rodolfo Gaba, Jr added to party Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.(pty:cd))(Gaba, Rodolfo)
January 4, 2023 Filing 33 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Natalya Rutchyk on behalf of Counter Claimant Ocean Line Logistics Inc, Defendant Ocean Line Logistics Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 6, 2023 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
December 21, 2022 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Ocean Line Logistics Inc.(Chen, Shun)
December 21, 2022 Filing 30 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc., filed by Counterclaimant Ocean Line Logistics Inc. (Attorney Shun C Chen added to party Ocean Line Logistics Inc(pty:dft))(Chen, Shun)
December 13, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Ocean Line Logistics Inc. filed by Defendant Ocean Line Logistics Inc (Chen, Shun)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR MSJs. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who havepending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:This action has been transferred to the Central District of California pursuant to the parties'Stipulation and has been assigned to this Court. The parties should familiarize themselves with the Local Rules for this district and this Court's specific rules and procedures. The Court ORDERS that Defendant's Answer or other response to the Complaint is due no later than December 21, 2022. Should Defendant fail to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, Plaintiff shall request entry of default by no later than December 28, 2022. Failure to do so may result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. (lc)
December 6, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error duplicate Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, #22 . Docket item 22 should be disregarded. (car)
December 6, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Natalya Rutchyk. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
December 6, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan D Press. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
December 6, 2022 Filing 23 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
December 6, 2022 Filing 22 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 12/6/2022, SEE ITEM #26 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) Modified on 12/6/2022 (car).
December 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 6, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:22-cv-01631-JMV-MAH, from U.S. District Court District of New Jersey (Newark). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-08825-ODW-PVCx. (car)
December 6, 2022 Filing 19 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New Jersey
December 5, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this matter to the Central District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/29/2022. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 17 Proposed Order to Transfer Venue by COSCO SHIPPING LINES (NORTH AMERICA) INC. re 16 Order,,. (PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' briefs in support of, and in response to, the motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(a). It appears that the parties agree on transfer to a district in California, but it is unclear what district the parties agree on. Accordingly, by November 29, 2022, the parties will submit a proposed consent order of transfer, specifying the district in California to which they have agreed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/2022. (Hammer, Michael) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion filed by COSCO SHIPPING LINES (NORTH AMERICA) INC. re #14 MOTION to Change Venue (PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
November 16, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 12/5/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue by OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Wilson Jiang, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A.Service Contract, #3 Brief Memo of Law, #4 Certificate of Service Certification of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Statement Disclosure Statement)(RUTCHYK, NATALYA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER granting defendant a 30-day adjournment to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/12/2022. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
October 12, 2022 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #12 submitted by OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/12/2022. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from Defendant Ocean Line Logistics Inc.. (RUTCHYK, NATALYA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 11 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney HANBIN WANG terminated. Attorney NATALYA RUTCHYK for OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. added.. (RUTCHYK, NATALYA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER that the defendant is granted until 10/13/2022 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/27/2022. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from counsel for Plaintiff re #8 Order, #7 Waiver of Service Executed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER directing counsel to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within twenty (20) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on October 12, 2022. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/23/2022. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COSCO SHIPPING LINES (NORTH AMERICA) INC.. OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. waiver sent on 7/15/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. (PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC.. (WANG, HANBIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by HANBIN WANG on behalf of OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. (WANG, HANBIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COSCO SHIPPING LINES (NORTH AMERICA) INC.. OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSCO SHIPPING LINES (NORTH AMERICA) INC. identifying COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD. as Corporate Parent.. (PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
April 7, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OCEAN LINE LOGISTICS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13277190), filed by COSCO SHIPPING LINES (NORTH AMERICA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(PRESS, BRYAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/6/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. v. Ocean Line Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Press
Represented By: Rodolfo Gaba, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ocean Line Logistics Inc
Represented By: Shun C. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?