WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, v. Friends Marketing 2, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company and WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd
Defendant: Friends Marketing 2, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Friends Marketing, Inc., a Florida corporation, SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc., a California corporation, HSIN Silk Road Shipping USA, Inc., a Texas corporation, DOES 1-20, inclusive, Friends Marketing 2, Inc., Friends Marketing, Inc., SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. and HSIN Silk Road Shipping USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv09152
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Friends Marketing 2, Inc. answer now due 2/14/2023; Friends Marketing, Inc. answer now due 2/14/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Friends Marketing 2, Inc..(Oster, Thomas)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. On February 3, 2023, the clerk entered default as to Defendant SCL - Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. #20 . Plaintiff shall move for default judgment within 30 days after a final disposition of the pending claims against all remaining Defendants. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 3, 2023 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to SCL - Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. (gk)
February 2, 2023 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Frank C. Brucculeri re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #18 filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd. (Brucculeri, Frank)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 2/8/2023 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendants Friends Marketing 2, Inc. and Friends Marketing, Inc. for lack of prosecution. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendants Friends Marketing 2, Inc. and Friends Marketing, Inc. if the document(s) mentioned in this order are not filed by the date indicated above. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Ronald Oster counsel for Defendants Friends Marketing 2, Inc., Friends Marketing, Inc.. Adding Thomas R Oster as counsel of record for Friends of Marketing 2, Inc. and Friends of Marketing, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Friends of Marketing 2, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas Ronald Oster added to party Friends Marketing 2, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Ronald Oster added to party Friends Marketing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Oster, Thomas)
January 31, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST for Entry of Default against SCL - Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd. (Brucculeri, Frank)
January 16, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, upon Defendant Friends Marketing, Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Samantha Gabe, Registered Agent Authorized Representative for Corporation Service Company in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brucculeri, Frank)
January 16, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, upon Defendant Friends Marketing 2, Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Authorized to Accept Service for Corporation Service Company in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brucculeri, Frank)
January 11, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, upon Defendant SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Roland Goh, Person In Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Friends Marketing 2, Inc., Friends Marketing, Inc., HSIN Silk Road Shipping USA, Inc., SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Friends Marketing, Inc., #2 HSIN Silk, #3 SCL Nielsen) (jtil)
December 19, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company. (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company. (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company. (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company. (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company, (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company. (Brucculeri, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34493268 - Fee: $402. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Frank C Brucculeri added to party WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company(pty:pla))(Brucculeri, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, v. Friends Marketing 2, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd, a People's Republic of China limited liability company
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WenZhou Dianwang Lighter Co., Ltd
Represented By: Bradley Rose
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Marketing 2, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Marketing, Inc., a Florida corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSIN Silk Road Shipping USA, Inc., a Texas corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Marketing 2, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Ronald Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Ronald Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL-Nielsen Multimodal Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSIN Silk Road Shipping USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?