Robin Shenas v. Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROBIN SHENAS
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv09360
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates #27 by Judge R. Gary Klausner as follows: (a) Fact Discovery Cutoff: 11/28/2023 (b) Expert Disclosure: 11/29/2023; (c) Expert Rebuttal: 12/29/2023 (d) Last Date to File Motions: 12/18/2023; (e) Final Pretrial Conference: 1/29/2024; (f) Jury Trial: 2/13/2024. The Parties may conduct discovery, including taking depositions, after the discovery cutoff if they so stipulate. (jp)
November 13, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL AND RELATED DATES from February 13, 2024 to April 2, 2024 filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF BRYAN A. REYNOLDS IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES)(Reynolds, Bryan)
October 18, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Robin Shenas. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Robin Shenas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Robin Shenas(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 15, 2023. (jre)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 5, 2023 Filing 23 AMENDED MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference before Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Scheduling Conference is held. The Court orders the following dates: Jury Trial (Est. 2-3 days): 2/13/2024 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference: 1/29/2024 at 9:00 AM. Motion Cut-Off Date (last day to file): 11/29/2023. Discovery Cut-Off Date: 11/14/2023. Last day to motion the Court to add parties or amend the complaint is 7/10/2023. Counsel inform the Court that they have selected settlement option number 3. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jp)
June 5, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2023; Discovery cut-off 11/14/2023; Motions due by 11/29/2023; Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2024 0\at 9:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/13/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (vdr)
June 2, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Robin Shenas. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Robin Shenas(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David W Lunn counsel for Plaintiff Robin Shenas. Adding David Lunn as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas. (Attorney David W Lunn added to party Robin Shenas(pty:pla))(Lunn, David)
June 2, 2023 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, identifying Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (JLRNA). (Reynolds, Bryan)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
April 20, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Attorney Bryan A. Reynolds added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Reynolds, Bryan)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Order to Show Cause #13 issued on 3/28/2023 is hereby DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas, upon Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC served on 3/30/2023, answer due 4/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens, Client Representative, CSC Lawyers Incorporated, Registered Agent, authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner. In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing by March 30, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to certain defendant/s. Alternatively, the Court will consider the following a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause: Proof of timely service of summons and operative complaint due 3/30/23 as to Jaguar Land Rover North America,LLC. (lom) Modified on 3/28/2023 (lom).
January 31, 2023 Filing 12 21 DAY Amended Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (jp)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 , Summons Request #4 filed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robin Shenas, upon Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc., Registered Agent, authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (lh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ROBIN SHENAS. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ROBIN SHENAS, identifying JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ROBIN SHENAS. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34534531 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff ROBIN SHENAS. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party ROBIN SHENAS(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin Shenas v. Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN SHENAS
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: David W Lunn
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Brian Takahashi
Represented By: Bryan A. Reynolds
Represented By: Theodore Dorenkamp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?