Tamara Bryant v. LOreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Bryant
Defendant: LORAL USA, Inc., LOral USA Products, Inc.,, Soft Sheen-Carson LLC., Soft Sheen Products, Inc., DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc., Dabur International Ltd., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Strength of Nature, LLC, LOreal USA, Inc., LOreal USA, Products, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson LLC and Godrej Son Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00287
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 23 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Illinois, 1:23-cv-01045 filed 2/24/2023. (rolm)
February 22, 2023 Filing 22 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3060, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
February 6, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc. answer now due 3/9/2023; Dabur International Ltd. answer now due 3/9/2023; Namaste Laboratories, LLC answer now due 3/9/2023, filed by Defendants DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc.; Dabur International Ltd.; Namaste Laboratories, LLC.(Elizabeth, Sierra)
February 6, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Dabur International Ltd., DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, identifying DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc. and Dabur India Limited. (Elizabeth, Sierra)
February 6, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sierra Elizabeth counsel for Defendants Dabur International Ltd., DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC. Adding Sierra Elizabeth as counsel of record for Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Dabur International Limited, and DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Dabur International Limited, and DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc.. (Attorney Sierra Elizabeth added to party Dabur International Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Sierra Elizabeth added to party DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sierra Elizabeth added to party Namaste Laboratories, LLC(pty:dft))(Elizabeth, Sierra)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LOreal USA, Products, Inc. answer now due 3/16/2023; LOreal USA, Inc. answer now due 3/16/2023; Soft Sheen Carson LLC answer now due 3/16/2023, filed by Defendants LOreal USA, Products, Inc.; LOreal USA, Inc.; Soft Sheen Carson LLC.(Ellis, Dennis)
January 31, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants LOreal USA, Inc., LOreal USA, Products, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson LLC, identifying L'Oreal S.A.. (Ellis, Dennis)
January 31, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicholas James Begakis on behalf of Defendants LOreal USA, Inc., LOreal USA, Products, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson LLC (Attorney Nicholas James Begakis added to party LOreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas James Begakis added to party LOreal USA, Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas James Begakis added to party Soft Sheen Carson LLC(pty:dft))(Begakis, Nicholas)
January 31, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Frenck Murray on behalf of Defendants LOreal USA, Inc., LOreal USA, Products, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson LLC (Attorney Katherine Frenck Murray added to party LOreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Frenck Murray added to party LOreal USA, Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Frenck Murray added to party Soft Sheen Carson LLC(pty:dft))(Murray, Katherine)
January 31, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dennis S Ellis on behalf of Defendants LOreal USA, Inc., LOreal USA, Products, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson LLC (Attorney Dennis S Ellis added to party LOreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dennis S Ellis added to party LOreal USA, Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dennis S Ellis added to party Soft Sheen Carson LLC(pty:dft))(Ellis, Dennis)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Enrique G. Serna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Bryant, designating Lisa Holder as local counsel #12 . (gk)
January 23, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Enrique G. Serna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Bryant (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34663414) filed by Plaintiff Tamara Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holder, Lisa)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Enrique Serna. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Dabur International Ltd., DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc., Godrej Son Holdings, Inc., LOreal USA, Inc., LOreal USA, Products, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Soft Sheen Carson LLC, Soft Sheen Products, Inc., Strength of Nature, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc., #2 Godrej Son Holdings, Inc., #3 LOreal USA, Products, Inc., #4 LOreal USA, Inc., #5 Namaste Laboratories, LLC, #6 Soft Sheen Products, Inc., #7 Soft Sheen Carson LLC, #8 Strength of Nature, LLC) (sh)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Tamara Bryant. (Attachments: #1 DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc. Summons, #2 Godrej SON Holdings, Inc. Summons, #3 L'Oral USA Products, Inc. Summons, #4 L'Oral USA, Inc. Summons, #5 Namaste Laboratories, LLC Summons, #6 Soft Sheen Products, Inc. Summons, #7 Soft Sheen-Carson LLC Summons, #8 Strength of Nature, LLC Summons)(Dermody, Kelly)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tamara Bryant, identifying Plaintiff. (Dermody, Kelly)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tamara Bryant. (Dermody, Kelly)
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tamara Bryant. (Dermody, Kelly)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34621759 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Tamara Bryant. (Attorney Kelly M Dermody added to party Tamara Bryant(pty:pla))(Dermody, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamara Bryant v. LOreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Bryant
Represented By: Kelly M Dermody
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: Fabrice N. Vincent
Represented By: Lisa Holder
Represented By: R Mona Tawatao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORAL USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOral USA Products, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen-Carson LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DermoViva Skin Essentials Inc.
Represented By: Sierra Elizabeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur International Ltd.
Represented By: Sierra Elizabeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Sierra Elizabeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis S Ellis
Represented By: Katherine Frenck Murray
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOreal USA, Products, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Frenck Murray
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Represented By: Dennis S Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen Carson LLC
Represented By: Dennis S Ellis
Represented By: Katherine Frenck Murray
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godrej Son Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?