California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute v. Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al
Plaintiff: California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute
Defendant: Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv00444
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Further Status Conference previously scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 5/15/2023 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request to Appear. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
March 10, 2023 Filing 18 Defendant's Request to Appear via Zoom filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund (Do, Tino)
March 8, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute. upon Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/7/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Mary Kate Kamka. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
March 6, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status conference held. The Court orders that defendant Anthem be served this week, and sets a further status conference for March 27, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (aco)
January 31, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document not flattened. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 31, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ana Patrisia Hallmon counsel for Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Hallmon, Ana Patrisia)
January 27, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund.(Do, Tino)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/6/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER re DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The contact information for attorney Ana P. Hallmon is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 1/25/23. (Do, Tino)
January 24, 2023 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, re Notice (Other), #4 served on 1/24/23. (Do, Tino)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Notice to Adverse Party of Defendant's Removal of Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Do, Tino)
January 20, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co., Does 1-10, Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
January 20, 2023 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, (Do, Tino)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Do, Tino)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV38850 Receipt No: ACACDC-34651611 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh. A) (Attorney Tino Xuan Do added to party Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund (pty:dft))(Do, Tino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute v. Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Ana Patrisia Hallmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?