Chelsey L. Jones v. L Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chelsey L. Jones
Defendant: L Oreal USA, Inc., L Oreal USA, Products, Inc., Strength of Nature Global, LLC, Soft Sheen Carson Inc., Soft Sheen Carson W.I., Inc. and Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00476
Filed: January 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 27 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Illinois, 1:23-cv-01048 filed 2/24/2023. (rolm)
February 22, 2023 Filing 26 Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3060, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case transferred electronically. (aco)
February 21, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Bluth, Andrew)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff is ordered to file a substantive Response to the January 31, 2023 Order no later than noon February 21, 2023. Failure to timely and adequately respond may result in the dismissal or transfer of this action without further warning. (aco)
February 14, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones to Order to Show Cause [Doc 22] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE IN CHAMBER-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson: Plaintiff is ordered to file its Response to this Order no later than February 14, 2023. Defendants may file a Response no later than the latter of February 28, 2023, or 21 days after they are served with the Summons and Complaint. Failure to timely and adequately respond to this Order may result in the dismissal or transfer of this action without further warning. IT IS SO ORDERED. (et)
January 26, 2023 Filing 21 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants L Oreal USA, Inc., L Oreal USA, Products, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Soft Sheen Carson Inc., Soft Sheen Carson W.I., Inc., Strength of Nature Global, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones(Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Based on the foregoing, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to establish this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's action. However, a district court may, and should, grant leave to amend when it appears that subject matter jurisdiction may exist, even though the complaint inadequately alleges jurisdiction. Therefore the Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend to establish federal subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, if any, is to be filed by February 6, 2023. The failure to file a Second Amended Complaint by that date or to adequately allege the Court's jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's action without prejudice. (See document for further details). (aco)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant L Oreal USA, Inc., L Oreal USA, Products, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Soft Sheen Carson Inc., Soft Sheen Carson W.I., Inc., Strength of Nature Global, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones(Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 23, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: Please remove the et al from the caption of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Summons LOreal USA, Inc, 2 Summons LOreal USA Products, Inc., 3 Strength of Nature Global, LLC, 4 Summons Soft Sheen/Carson Inc, 5 Summons Soft Sheen Carson (W.I.) is attached to the Request for Clerk to Issue Summons. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) Modified on 1/23/2023 (ghap). Modified on 1/23/2023 (ghap).
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Complaint is not the title for document. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
January 21, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons LOreal USA, Inc, #2 Summons LOreal USA Products, Inc., #3 Strength of Nature Global, LLC, #4 Summons Soft Sheen/Carson Inc, #5 Summons Soft Sheen Carson (W.I.), Inc., #6 Summons Namaste Laboratories, LLC)(Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34658862 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Chelsey L. Jones. (Attorney Christopher Ross Rodriguez added to party Chelsey L. Jones(pty:pla))(Rodriguez, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chelsey L. Jones v. L Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsey L. Jones
Represented By: Kristen D Miller
Represented By: Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Bluth
Represented By: Kristen Danielle Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Oreal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Oreal USA, Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen Carson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen Carson W.I., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?