Geico General Insurance Company v. Kenneth Iarussi et al
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Defendant: Kenneth Iarussi, Monica Hastings Iarussi, Jasmine Hastings, Jacob Kooi, Helen Kooi, City of San Luis Obispo, Colorado Structures, Inc. dba CSI Construction Company, Paloma Badaracco, Kellie Avila Construction Services, Inc. dba Avila Traffic Safety, Colorado Structures, Inc. doing business as CSI Construction Company and Kellie Avila Construction Services, Inc. doing business as Avila Traffic Safety
Case Number: 2:2023cv00507
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: George H Wu
2 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 64 **AMENDED** TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: IN CHAMBERS by Senior District Judge George H Wu: The Court has received the parties Joint Status Report re Mediation (ECF No. #62 ). Based thereon, the November 20, 2023 post-mediation status conference is continued to December 18, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a dismissal or a joint report by December 14. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 17, 2023 Filing 63 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: IN CHAMBERS by Senior District Judge George H Wu: The Court has received the parties Joint Status Report re Mediation (ECF No. #62 ). Based thereon, the November 20, 2023 post-mediation status conference is continued to December 18, 2023. The parties are to file a dismissal or a joint report by December 14. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2023 Filing 62 JOINT REPORT of MEDIATION COMPLETION filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Wagoner, James)
November 16, 2023 Filing 61 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the post mediation status conference set on Monday, November 20, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. After considering the stipulation submitted by the parties, good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Defendant Monica Hastings Iarussi shall be bound by the final determination and judgment which may be entered on GEICO's Complaint. RE: Stipulation to Enforce #57 . (aco)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. After considering the stipulation submitted by the parties, good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Defendant Jasmine Hastings shall be bound by the final determination and judgment which may be entered on GEICO's Complaint. RE: Stipulation to Enforce #58 . (aco)
October 17, 2023 Filing 58 STIPULATION to Enforce AND BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT JASMINE HASTINGS) filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, James)
October 17, 2023 Filing 57 STIPULATION to Enforce AND BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT MONICA HASTINGS IARUSSI) filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, James)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Defendant Paloma Badaracco shall be bound by the final determination and judgment which may be entered on GEICO's Complaint. RE: STIPULATION to Enforce AND BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT, #55 . (aco)
September 5, 2023 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Enforce AND BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT PALOMA BADARACCO) filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, James)
July 3, 2023 Filing 54 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Kenneth Iarussi. (aco)
July 3, 2023 Filing 53 DEFENDANT KENNETH IAURSSI'S ANSWER to Complaint #1 FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Kenneth Iarussi. (aco)
June 21, 2023 Filing 52 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint #50 by Judge George H. Wu. Docket No. 50 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #51 filed on June 21, 2023. (aco)
June 21, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint #50 . The following error(s) was/were found: Pro Per filer has not been given leave to electronically file documents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
June 20, 2023 Filing 50 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 06/21/2023, SEE DOCKET NO. 52] ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant in Pro Per Kenneth Iarussi.(McKiernan, James) Modified on 6/21/2023 (aco).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Defendant City of San Luis Obispo shall be bound by the final determination and judgment which may be entered on GEICO's Complaint. (aco)
May 10, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Stipulation to Be Bound by Judgment as to Defendant City of San Luis Obispo re Miscellaneous Document #41 (Wagoner, James)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT #45 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Defendant Kellie Avila Construction Services, Inc. dba Avila Traffic Safety shall be bound by the final determination and judgment which may be entered on GEICO's Complaint. (lom)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT #42 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That Defendant Colorado Structures, Inc. dba CSI Construction Company shall be bound by the final determination and judgment which may be entered on GEICO's Complaint. (aco)
May 3, 2023 Filing 45 STIPULATION to Enforce AND BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT KELLIE AVILA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. DBA AVILA TRAFFIC SAFETY) filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, James)
May 2, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re Stipulation to Be Bound by Judgment as to Defendant Colorado Structures re Miscellaneous Document #42 (Wagoner, James)
May 1, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
May 1, 2023 Filing 42 STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT COLORADO STRUCTURES, INC. dba CSI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY) filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Wagoner, James)
April 28, 2023 Filing 41 STIPULATION TO BE BOUND BY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT CITY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO) filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Wagoner, James)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 27, 2023 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to May 26, 2023. A post-mediation status conference is set for November 20, 2023 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by November 15. The pre-trial conference will be held on February 15, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on February 27, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS). (aco)
April 25, 2023 Filing 39 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for Thursday's 04/27/2023 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2023 Filing 38 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Wagoner, James)
April 19, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelley Elizabeth Harman counsel for Defendant Colorado Structures, Inc.. Adding Kelley E. Harman as counsel of record for Colorado Structures, Inc., dba CSI Construction Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant. (Attorney Kelley Elizabeth Harman added to party Colorado Structures, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harman, Kelley)
April 19, 2023 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE of Rule 26 Initial filed by Defendants Helen Kooi, Jacob Kooi (West, Mark)
April 12, 2023 Filing 35 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Colorado Structures, Inc. answer now due 5/8/2023, filed by Defendant Colorado Structures, Inc..(Gowharrizi, Azadeh)
April 12, 2023 Filing 34 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Colorado Structures, Inc., (Attorney Azadeh Gowharrizi added to party Colorado Structures, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gowharrizi, Azadeh)
April 6, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jasmine Hastings, Monica Hastings Iarussi. (Epps, Darren)
April 6, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
April 5, 2023 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Jasmine Hastings, Monica Hastings Iarussi.(Attorney Darren W Epps added to party Jasmine Hastings(pty:dft), Attorney Darren W Epps added to party Monica Hastings Iarussi(pty:dft))(Epps, Darren)
March 23, 2023 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Colorado Structures, Inc. served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Wagoner, James)
March 23, 2023 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Kenneth Iarussi served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Wagoner, James)
March 23, 2023 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Paloma Badaracco served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Wagoner, James)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 20, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
March 20, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
March 17, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Helen Kooi, Jacob Kooi.(Attorney Mark West added to party Helen Kooi(pty:dft), Attorney Mark West added to party Jacob Kooi(pty:dft))(West, Mark)
March 10, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant City of San Luis Obispo acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2023, answer due 3/29/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Joshua M. George, Attorney. (Wagoner, James)
March 10, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Monica Hastings Iarussi acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Darren Epps, Attorney. (Wagoner, James)
March 10, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Jasmine Hastings acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/9/2023, answer due 3/30/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Darren Epps, Attorney. (Wagoner, James)
March 2, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Jacob Kooi acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jacob Kooi, Defendant. (Wagoner, James)
March 2, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, upon Defendant Helen Kooi acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Helen Kooi, Defendant. (Wagoner, James)
February 10, 2023 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Kenneth Iarussi. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Monica Hastings Iarussi. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Jasmine Hastings. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Jacob Kooi. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Helen Kooi. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant City of San Luis Obispo. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Colorado Structures, Inc. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Kellie Avila Construction Services, Inc. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Paloma Badaracco. (aco)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Monica H Iarussi, #2 Jasmine Hastings, #3 Jacob Kooi, #4 Helen Kooi, #5 City of San Luis Obispo, #6 Colorado Structures, #7 Paloma Badaracco, #8 Kellie Avila)(Wagoner, James)
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Requests, #8 . The following error(s) was found: Case number and judge's initials are not indicated in the caption of summons requests. No address is indicated for service under defendants' names. If multiple defendants on a case, one summons can be issued with the lead defendant indicated in the "To:" field, followed by "(see attached list)", and attach a list indicating the rest of the defendants with their addresses. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Monica H. Iarussi, #2 Jasmine Hastings, #3 Jacob Kooi, #4 Helen Kooi, #5 City of San Luis Obispo, #6 Colorado Structures, #7 Paloma Badarocco, #8 Kellie Avila)(Wagoner, James)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
January 24, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
January 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
January 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company, identifying GEICO Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.. (Wagoner, James)
January 23, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Wagoner, James)
January 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34664522 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Geico General Insurance Company. (Attorney James P Wagoner added to party Geico General Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Wagoner, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico General Insurance Company v. Kenneth Iarussi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: James P Wagoner
Represented By: Graham Van Leuven
Represented By: Lejf Edwin Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Iarussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Hastings Iarussi
Represented By: Darren W Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Hastings
Represented By: Darren W Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Kooi
Represented By: Mark West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Kooi
Represented By: Mark West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Luis Obispo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Structures, Inc. dba CSI Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paloma Badaracco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Avila Construction Services, Inc. dba Avila Traffic Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Structures, Inc. doing business as CSI Construction Company
Represented By: Kelley Elizabeth Harman
Represented By: Azadeh Gowharrizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Avila Construction Services, Inc. doing business as Avila Traffic Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?