Lorne Currie v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: LORNE CURRIE
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv00927
Filed: February 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Lorne Currie. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Lorne Currie for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lorne Currie. (Campbell, Christopher)
October 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Campbell on behalf of Plaintiff Lorne Currie (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Lorne Currie(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 8, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Lorne Currie. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Lorne Currie for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Lorne Currie. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Lorne Currie(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-00927 SPG(ASx). (rn)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
February 7, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.[FILED IN STATE COURT 09/16/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 16 EXHIBIT O THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
February 7, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram.[FILED IN STATE COURT 09/16/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 15 EXHIBIT N TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
February 7, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Lorne Currie pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Does, FCA US LLC, Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram.[FILED IN STATE COURT 01/09/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 7, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lorne Currie, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 8/17/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 08/22/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 13 EXHIBIT L TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 7, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Lorne Currie.[FILED IN STATE COURT 08/08/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 7, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lorne Currie, upon Defendant Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram served on 8/18/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 08/22/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 14 EXHIBIT M TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
February 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
February 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA HOLDCO B.V.; STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
February 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
February 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22TRCV00675 Receipt No: ACACDC-34759346 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Decl iso Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl iso Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl iso Removal, #6 Exhibit E to Atty Decl iso Removal, #7 Exhibit F to Atty Decl iso Removal, #8 Exhibit G to Atty Decl iso Removal, #9 Exhibit H to Atty Decl iso Removal, #10 Exhibit I to Atty Decl iso Removal, #11 Exhibit J to Atty Decl iso Removal, #12 Exhibit K to Atty Decl iso Removal, #13 Exhibit L to Atty Decl iso Removal, #14 Exhibit M to Atty Decl iso Removal, #15 Exhibit N to Atty Decl iso Removal, #16 Exhibit O to Atty Decl iso Removal, #17 Exhibit P to Atty Decl iso Removal, #18 Exhibit Q to Atty Decl iso Removal, #19 Exhibit R to Atty Decl iso Removal, #20 Exhibit S to Atty Decl iso Removal, #21 Exhibit T to Atty Decl iso Removal, #22 Exhibit U to Atty Decl iso Removal, #23 Exhibit V to Atty Decl iso Removal, #24 Exhibit W to Atty Decl iso Removal, #25 Exhibit X to Atty Decl iso Removal, #26 Exhibit Y to Atty Decl iso Removal, #27 Exhibit Z to Atty Decl iso Removal, #28 Exhibit AA to Atty Decl iso Removal, #29 Exhibit BB to Atty Decl iso Removal, #30 Exhibit CC to Atty Decl iso Removal, #31 Exhibit DD to Atty Decl iso Removal, #32 Exhibit EE to Atty Decl iso Removal, #33 Exhibit FF to Atty Decl iso Removal, #34 Exhibit GG to Atty Decl iso Removal, #35 Exhibit HH to Atty Decl iso Removal, #36 Exhibit II to Atty Decl iso Removal, #37 Exhibit JJ to Atty Decl iso Removal, #38 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorne Currie v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORNE CURRIE
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Sanam Vaziri
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?