Michelle Albahae et al v. Olaplex Holdings, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone, Robin Vogt, Alexa Roemer, Nicole Hoff, Rebecca Barnhouse, Aleha Ingle, Holly Burkett-Murphy, Theresa McCormack, Alana Green, Tiffany Berry, Tanya Vallejo, Christina Ventor, Jennifer Georgeson, Jodi Sobiech, Jerika Vega, Amanda Murphy, Denisha Freeman, Chelsea Aranjo, Terri Witts, Jessica Nguyen, Stacey Lobdell, Amanda Fontenot, Juliette Ball, Sa Hollifield, Tina Lewis, Sara Petty, Kim Marietta, Heather Passmore, Jean Riccio, Robin Poston, Jacob Eisen, Hilary Cecile, Holly Burkhart, Kathleen Keehner, Heather Burkett-Murphy, Vanessa Tocco, Sandra Ferguson, Ashley Courtney, Maria Sokolova, Lisa Mendez, Charity Reddish, Ashley Branning, Katherine Donnelly, Lyana Luciano, Heather Rife, Angelina da Gama, Khila James, Heather Garon, Laura Llewellyn, Julia Leon, Monica Easily, Llasmin Lozoya, Liza Krengel, Farzana Siddiquei, Monica Hollifield, Kristie Letizia, Danielle Sigmon, Jill Mooshagian, Felicia Sanchez, Hope Daley-Derry, Michelle Estrada, Sarah Dahan, Chelsea Balmer, Donna Bowen, Noel Talerico, Danielle Phelps, Erica Pilicy-Ryan, Marina Tolic, Jennifer Morgan, Emma Broderick, Jessica Jones, Rhiannon Singer and Pa Jones
Petitioner: Heather Jackson and Tanya Karakasheva
Respondent: Olaplex Holdings, Inc and Cosway Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00982
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott L Hengesbach counsel for Respondent Cosway Co., Inc.. Adding Scott L. Hengesbach as counsel of record for Cosway Co., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant COSWAY CO., INC.. (Attorney Scott L Hengesbach added to party Cosway Co., Inc.(pty:res))(Hengesbach, Scott)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION SETTING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING #60 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that: (1) Any Motion to Dismiss shall be filed with a 30-page limit; (2) Any Response to a Motion to Dismiss shall be filed with a 30-page limit; (3) Any Reply in support of a Motion to Dismiss shall be filed with a 15-page limit. (jp)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #56 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel P Raphael APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc., designating Jennifer S Romano as local counsel. (jp)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #55 Non-Resident Attorney Hilary E Johnson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc., designating Jennifer S Romano as local counsel. (jp)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #54 Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl A Falvey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc, designating Jennifer S Romano as local counsel. (jp)
April 3, 2023 Filing 60 STIPULATION for Order Setting Schedule and Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss Briefing filed by defendant Olaplex Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Setting Schedule and Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss Briefing)(Romano, Jennifer)
April 3, 2023 Filing 59 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Chelsea Aranjo, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Juliette Ball, Chelsea Balmer, Rebecca Barnhouse, Tiffany Berry, Donna Bowen, Ashley Branning, Emma Broderick, Joanne Brown, Heather Burkett-Murphy, Holly Burkhart, Hilary Cecile, Makenzie Cogle, Ashley Courtney, Sarah Dahan, Hope Daley-Derry, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Katherine Donnelly, Brianda Earle, Monica Easily, Jacob Eisen, Michelle Estrada, Sandra Ferguson, Amanda Fontenot, Denisha Freeman, Heather Garon, Jennifer Georgeson, Alana Green, Nicole Hoff, Monica Hollifield, Sa Hollifield, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Aleha Ingle, Heather Jackson, Khila James, Kat Johnston, Jessica Jones, Pa Jones, Eunice Kahler, Tanya Karakasheva, Kathleen Keehner, Liza Krengel, Anna Kurilova, Julia Leon, Kristie Letizia, Tina Lewis, Laura Llewellyn, Stacey Lobdell, Llasmin Lozoya, Lyana Luciano, Kim Marietta, Theresa McCormack, Leslie McDonald, Lisa Mendez, Jill Mooshagian, Jennifer Morgan, Amanda Murphy, Jessica Nguyen, Leslie Orr, Heather Passmore, Sylva Pate, Sara Petty, Danielle Phelps, Erica Pilicy-Ryan, Robin Poston, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Charity Reddish, Natalie Register, Jean Riccio, Sarah Richardson, Heather Rife, Alexa Roemer, Felicia Sanchez, Amy Shay, Farzana Siddiquei, Danielle Sigmon, Rhiannon Singer, Jodi Sobiech, Maria Sokolova, Debra Sterlacci, Noel Talerico, Miecha Isys Thomas, Vanessa Tocco, Marina Tolic, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Tanya Vallejo, Jerika Vega, Christina Ventor, Robin Vogt, Terri Witts, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone, Angelina da Gama. (Davis, Amy)
March 31, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #53 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 31, 2023 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Olaplex Holdings, Inc, identifying Olaplex Holdings, Inc., a publicly-traded Delaware Corporation, Hanover Insurance Group, Advent International Corporation, Advent International GPE IX Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-B Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-C Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-F Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-G Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-H Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-I Limited Partnership, Advent International GPE IX-A SCSp, Advent International GPE IX-D SCSp, Advent International GPE IX-E SCSp, Advent International GPE IX Strategic Investors SCSp, Advent Partners GPE IX Limited Partnership, Advent Partners GPE IX-A Limited Partnership, Advent Partners GPE IX Cayman Limited Partnership, Advent Partners GPE IX-A Cayman Limited Partnership, Advent Partners GPE IX-B Cayman Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to the Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Romano, Jennifer)
March 31, 2023 Filing 56 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel P. Raphael to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35062154) filed by defendant Olaplex Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Romano, Jennifer)
March 31, 2023 Filing 55 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hilary E. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/31/2023, Receipt No. 35062041) filed by defendant Olaplex Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Romano, Jennifer)
March 31, 2023 Filing 54 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl Adams Falvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35061950) filed by defendant Olaplex Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Romano, Jennifer)
March 31, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sigourney Rosy Haylock on behalf of Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc (Attorney Sigourney Rosy Haylock added to party Olaplex Holdings, Inc(pty:res))(Haylock, Sigourney)
March 23, 2023 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yasmine Hussein counsel for Respondent Cosway Co., Inc.. Adding Yasmine Hussein as counsel of record for COSWAY CO., INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cosway Co., Inc.. (Attorney Yasmine Hussein added to party Cosway Co., Inc.(pty:res))(Hussein, Yasmine)
March 23, 2023 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gina E Och counsel for Respondent Cosway Co., Inc.. Adding Gina E. Och as counsel of record for COSWAY CO., INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cosway Co., Inc.. (Attorney Gina E Och added to party Cosway Co., Inc.(pty:res))(Och, Gina)
March 23, 2023 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard C Moreno counsel for Respondent Cosway Co., Inc.. Adding Richard C. Moreno as counsel of record for COSWAY CO., INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cosway Co., Inc.. (Attorney Richard C Moreno added to party Cosway Co., Inc.(pty:res))(Moreno, Richard)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE DEADLINE FOR COSWAY CO., INC.S RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #46 #47 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Cosway Co., Inc. ("CCI") will have up and until April 13, 2023 to file a response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #46 #47 . The Order to Show Cause #45 issued on March 17, 2023 is hereby discharged. (lom) Modified on 3/22/2023 (lom).
March 21, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),,,,,, #46 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
March 21, 2023 Filing 47 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Chelsea Aranjo, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Juliette Ball, Chelsea Balmer, Rebecca Barnhouse, Tiffany Berry, Donna Bowen, Ashley Branning, Emma Broderick, Joanne Brown, Heather Burkett-Murphy, Holly Burkhart, Hilary Cecile, Makenzie Cogle, Ashley Courtney, Sarah Dahan, Hope Daley-Derry, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Katherine Donnelly, Brianda Earle, Monica Easily, Jacob Eisen, Michelle Estrada, Sandra Ferguson, Amanda Fontenot, Denisha Freeman, Heather Garon, Jennifer Georgeson, Alana Green, Nicole Hoff, Monica Hollifield, Sa Hollifield, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Aleha Ingle, Khila James, Kat Johnston, Jessica Jones, Pa Jones, Eunice Kahler, Kathleen Keehner, Liza Krengel, Anna Kurilova, Julia Leon, Kristie Letizia, Tina Lewis, Laura Llewellyn, Stacey Lobdell, Llasmin Lozoya, Lyana Luciano, Kim Marietta, Theresa McCormack, Leslie McDonald, Lisa Mendez, Jill Mooshagian, Jennifer Morgan, Amanda Murphy, Jessica Nguyen, Leslie Orr, Heather Passmore, Sylva Pate, Sara Petty, Danielle Phelps, Erica Pilicy-Ryan, Robin Poston, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Charity Reddish, Natalie Register, Jean Riccio, Sarah Richardson, Heather Rife, Alexa Roemer, Felicia Sanchez, Amy Shay, Farzana Siddiquei, Danielle Sigmon, Rhiannon Singer, Jodi Sobiech, Maria Sokolova, Debra Sterlacci, Noel Talerico, Miecha Isys Thomas, Vanessa Tocco, Marina Tolic, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Tanya Vallejo, Jerika Vega, Christina Ventor, Robin Vogt, Terri Witts, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone, Angelina da Gama, Petitioners Heather Jackson, Tanya Karakashevato Order to Show Cause #45 re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (Davis, Amy)
March 20, 2023 Filing 46 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cosway Co., Inc. answer now due 4/13/2023, filed by Plaintiff Julia Leon; Amy Shay; Roxanna De la Cruz; Rebekah Valentine; Jessica Nguyen; Jill Mooshagian; Melinda Quinn; Angelina da Gama; Emma Broderick; Terri Witts; Robin Poston; Sylva Pate; Nicole Hoff; Robin Yeager; Kathleen Keehner; Rhiannon Singer; Rebecca Barnhouse; Christina Ventor; Sarah Richardson; Katherine Donnelly; Llasmin Lozoya; Lyana Luciano; Tiffany Huval; Noel Talerico; Michelle Estrada; Sara Petty; Kat Johnston; Alexa Roemer; Heather Passmore; Tina Lewis; Liza Krengel; Tanya Karakasheva; Jean Riccio; Chelsea Balmer; Denisha Freeman; Marina Tolic; Eunice Kahler; Sarah Dahan; Leslie Orr; Jennifer Morgan; Juliette Ball; Monica Easily; Felicia Sanchez; Amanda Murphy; Danielle Sigmon; Natalie Register; Robin Vogt; Tanya Vallejo; Sandra Ferguson; Lisa Mendez; Tiffany Berry; Laura Llewellyn; Nicole Quenga; Megan Arcadi; Jessica Jones; Erica Pilicy-Ryan; Chelsea Aranjo; Jennifer Georgeson; Monica Hollifield; Michelle Albahae; Jacob Eisen; Ashley Branning; Cosway Co., Inc.; Alexandra Urresti; Kristie Letizia; Stacey Lobdell; Maureen Zavatone; Sa Hollifield; Heather Rife; Heather Jackson; Theresa McCormack; Heather Burkett-Murphy; Leslie McDonald; Donna Bowen; Kim Marietta; Jerika Vega; Leslie Tolstoy; Charity Reddish; Heather Garon; Khila James; Alana Green; Debra Sterlacci; Vanessa Tocco; Farzana Siddiquei; Miecha Isys Thomas; Anna Kurilova; Hilary Cecile; Aleha Ingle; Robin Daniels; Maria Sokolova; Jessica Auriana; Lauren Hudson; Danielle Phelps; Brianda Earle; Ashley Courtney; Joanne Brown; Pa Jones; Jodi Sobiech; Amanda Fontenot; Hope Daley-Derry; Holly Burkhart; Makenzie Cogle.(Davis, Amy)
March 17, 2023 Filing 45 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/22/2023. (jre)
March 10, 2023 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Leon, Amy Shay, Roxanna De la Cruz, Rebekah Valentine, Jessica Nguyen, Jill Mooshagian, Melinda Quinn, Angelina da Gama, Emma Broderick, Terri Witts, Robin Poston, Sylva Pate, Nicole Hoff, Robin Yeager, Kathleen Keehner, Rhiannon Singer, Rebecca Barnhouse, Christina Ventor, Sarah Richardson, Katherine Donnelly, Llasmin Lozoya, Lyana Luciano, Tiffany Huval, Noel Talerico, Michelle Estrada, Sara Petty, Kat Johnston, Alexa Roemer, Heather Passmore, Tina Lewis, Liza Krengel, Tanya Karakasheva, Jean Riccio, Chelsea Balmer, Denisha Freeman, Marina Tolic, Eunice Kahler, Sarah Dahan, Leslie Orr, Jennifer Morgan, Juliette Ball, Monica Easily, Felicia Sanchez, Amanda Murphy, Danielle Sigmon, Natalie Register, Robin Vogt, Tanya Vallejo, Sandra Ferguson, Lisa Mendez, Tiffany Berry, Laura Llewellyn, Nicole Quenga, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Jones, Erica Pilicy-Ryan, Chelsea Aranjo, Jennifer Georgeson, Monica Hollifield, Michelle Albahae, Jacob Eisen, Ashley Branning, Alexandra Urresti, Kristie Letizia, Stacey Lobdell, Maureen Zavatone, Sa Hollifield, Heather Rife, Heather Jackson, Theresa McCormack, Heather Burkett-Murphy, Leslie McDonald, Donna Bowen, Kim Marietta, Jerika Vega, Leslie Tolstoy, Charity Reddish, Heather Garon, Khila James, Alana Green, Debra Sterlacci, Vanessa Tocco, Farzana Siddiquei, Miecha Isys Thomas, Anna Kurilova, Hilary Cecile, Aleha Ingle, Robin Daniels, Maria Sokolova, Jessica Auriana, Lauren Hudson, Danielle Phelps, Brianda Earle, Ashley Courtney, Joanne Brown, Pa Jones, Jodi Sobiech, Amanda Fontenot, Hope Daley-Derry, Holly Burkhart, Makenzie Cogle, upon Defendant Cosway Co., Inc. served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Smiley, CFO in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, Amy)
March 2, 2023 Filing 43 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Respondent Cosway Co., Inc., Olaplex Holdings, Inc amending Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #4 , filed by Plaintiff Amy Shay, Roxanna De la Cruz, Rebekah Valentine, Melinda Quinn, Sylva Pate, Robin Yeager, Sarah Richardson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Leslie Orr, Natalie Register, Megan Arcadi, Nicole Quenga, Michelle Albahae, Alexandra Urresti, Maureen Zavatone, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Tolstoy, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Anna Kurilova, Robin Daniels, Jessica Auriana, Lauren Hudson, Brianda Earle, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Vogt, Alexa Roemer, Nicole Hoff, Rebecca Barnhouse, Aleha Ingle, Holly Burkett-Murphy, Theresa McCormack, Alana Green, Tiffany Berry, Tanya Vallejo, Christina Ventor, Jennifer Georgeson, Jodi Sobiech, Jerika Vega, Amanda Murphy, Heather Jackson, Denisha Freeman, Chelsea Aranjo, Terri Witts, Jessica Nguyen, Stacey Lobdell, Amanda Fontenot, Juliette Ball, Sa Hollifield, Tina Lewis, Sara Petty, Kim Marietta, Heather Passmore, Jean Riccio, Robin Poston, Jacob Eisen, Hilary Cecile, Holly Burkhart, Kathleen Keehner, Heather Burkett-Murphy, Vanessa Tocco, Sandra Ferguson, Ashley Courtney, Maria Sokolova, Lisa Mendez, Charity Reddish, Ashley Branning, Katherine Donnelly, Lyana Luciano, Heather Rife, Angelina da Gama, Khila James, Heather Garon, Laura Llewellyn, Julia Leon, Monica Easily, Llasmin Lozoya, Liza Krengel, Farzana Siddiquei, Monica Hollifield, Kristie Letizia, Danielle Sigmon, Jill Mooshagian, Felicia Sanchez, Hope Daley-Derry, Tanya Karakasheva, Michelle Estrada, Sarah Dahan, Chelsea Balmer, Donna Bowen, Noel Talerico, Danielle Phelps, Erica Pilicy-Ryan, Marina Tolic, Jennifer Morgan, Emma Broderick, Jessica Jones, Rhiannon Singer, Pa Jones(Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Chelsea Aranjo(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Juliette Ball(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Chelsea Balmer(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Rebecca Barnhouse(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Tiffany Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Donna Bowen(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Ashley Branning(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Emma Broderick(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Holly Burkett-Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Heather Burkett-Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Holly Burkhart(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Hilary Cecile(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Ashley Courtney(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Angelina da Gama(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Sarah Dahan(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Hope Daley-Derry(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Katherine Donnelly(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Monica Easily(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jacob Eisen(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Michelle Estrada(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Sandra Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Amanda Fontenot(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Denisha Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Heather Garon(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jennifer Georgeson(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Alana Green(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Nicole Hoff(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Monica Hollifield(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Sa Hollifield(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Aleha Ingle(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Heather Jackson(pty:pet), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Khila James(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jessica Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Pa Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Tanya Karakasheva(pty:pet), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Kathleen Keehner(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Liza Krengel(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Julia Leon(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Kristie Letizia(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Tina Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Laura Llewellyn(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Stacey Lobdell(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Llasmin Lozoya(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Lyana Luciano(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Kim Marietta(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Theresa McCormack(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Lisa Mendez(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jill Mooshagian(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jennifer Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Amanda Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jessica Nguyen(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Heather Passmore(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Sara Petty(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Danielle Phelps(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Erica Pilicy-Ryan(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Robin Poston(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Charity Reddish(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jean Riccio(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Heather Rife(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Alexa Roemer(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Felicia Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Farzana Siddiquei(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Danielle Sigmon(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Rhiannon Singer(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jodi Sobiech(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Maria Sokolova(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Vanessa Tocco(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Noel Talerico(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Marina Tolic(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Tanya Vallejo(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Jerika Vega(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Christina Ventor(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Robin Vogt(pty:pla), Attorney Amy E. Davis added to party Terri Witts(pty:pla))(Davis, Amy)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #40 Non-Resident Attorney Steven G Calamusa APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager and Maureen Zavatone, designating David E Rosen as local counsel. (lom)
February 28, 2023 Filing 41 Notice filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae. Plaintiffs' Attorney's Unavailability (Davis, Amy)
February 23, 2023 Filing 40 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Calamusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/21/2023, Receipt No. ACADC-34828626) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice) (Rosen, David)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #35 Non-Resident Attorney Geffrey S Stahl APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone, designating David E Rosen as local counsel. (jp)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING #34 Non-Resident Attorney Steven G Calamusa APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Because Local counsel failed to sign application. (jp)
February 23, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer S Romano counsel for Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc. Adding Jennifer S. Romano as counsel of record for Olaplex Holdings, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Olaplex Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party Olaplex Holdings, Inc(pty:res))(Romano, Jennifer)
February 22, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Calamusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). (lt)
February 21, 2023 Filing 35 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey S. Stahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34828738) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice) (Rosen, David)
February 21, 2023 Filing 34 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Calamusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34828626) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice) (Rosen, David)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A Bentley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone, designating David E Rosen as local counsel. (jp)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #30 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of All Plaintiffs, designating David E Rosen as local counsel. Granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis. (rolm)
February 16, 2023 Filing 31 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/14/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34798441) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Rosen, David)
February 16, 2023 Filing 30 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/14/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34798005) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Rosen, David)
February 16, 2023 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kat Johnston, Amy Shay, Roxanna De la Cruz, Rebekah Valentine, Nicole Quenga, Megan Arcadi, Debra Sterlacci, Michelle Albahae, Melinda Quinn, Miecha Isys Thomas, Sylva Pate, Anna Kurilova, Robin Yeager, Alexandra Urresti, Robin Daniels, Maureen Zavatone, Jessica Auriana, Lauren Hudson, Eunice Kahler, Sarah Richardson, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Brianda Earle, Joanne Brown, Leslie Tolstoy, Natalie Register, Tiffany Huval, Makenzie Cogle. upon Olaplex Holdings, Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/16/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Olaplex Holdings, Inc.. (Rosen, David)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #21 . The document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Document STRICKEN for the reasons indicated in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #25 . Counsel to refile corrected application should admission still be desired. (jre)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #20 . The document(s) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Document STRICKEN for the reasons indicated in the Notices to Filer of Deficiencies #24 and #26 . Counsel shall file a corrected application if admission still desired. (jre)
February 15, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffa #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
February 15, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
February 15, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffa #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Applicant failed to list state bars where they are admitted. Only listed appellate and district courts. See Instructions for Applicants (1)(G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
February 14, 2023 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #4 as to Respondent Cosway Co., Inc. (jp)
February 14, 2023 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #4 as to Respondent Olaplex Holdings, Inc. (jp)
February 14, 2023 Filing 21 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #28 .) - First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34798441) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David) Modified on 2/16/2023 (jre).
February 14, 2023 Filing 20 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #27 .) - First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34798005) filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David) Modified on 2/16/2023 (jre).
February 14, 2023 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #4 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 14, 2023 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #4 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 14, 2023 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #4 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Bentley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Geoff S. Stahl. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve Calamusa. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Davis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
February 13, 2023 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil)
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #4 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #4 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone, (Rosen, David)
February 9, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34772864 - Fee: $402, [filed by counsel as PETITION; modified by Clerk] filed by Plaintiff Kat Johnston, Amy Shay, Roxanna De la Cruz, Rebekah Valentine, Nicole Quenga, Megan Arcadi, Debra Sterlacci, Michelle Albahae, Melinda Quinn, Miecha Isys Thomas, Sylva Pate, Anna Kurilova, Robin Yeager, Alexandra Urresti, Robin Daniels, Maureen Zavatone, Jessica Auriana, Lauren Hudson, Eunice Kahler, Sarah Richardson, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Brianda Earle, Joanne Brown, Leslie Tolstoy, Natalie Register, Tiffany Huval, Makenzie Cogle. (Attorney David E Rosen added to party Michelle Albahae(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Megan Arcadi(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Jessica Auriana(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Joanne Brown(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Makenzie Cogle(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Robin Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Roxanna De la Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Brianda Earle(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Lauren Hudson(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Tiffany Huval(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Kat Johnston(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Eunice Kahler(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Anna Kurilova(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Leslie McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Leslie Orr(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Sylva Pate(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Nicole Quenga(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Melinda Quinn(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Natalie Register(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Sarah Richardson(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Amy Shay(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Debra Sterlacci(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Miecha Isys Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Leslie Tolstoy(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Alexandra Urresti(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Rebekah Valentine(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Robin Yeager(pty:pla), Attorney David E Rosen added to party Maureen Zavatone(pty:pla))(Rosen, David) Modified on 2/13/2023 (jtil).
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71), #1 , Summons Request,, #2 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71), #1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Albahae, Megan Arcadi, Jessica Auriana, Joanne Brown, Makenzie Cogle, Robin Daniels, Roxanna De la Cruz, Brianda Earle, Lauren Hudson, Tiffany Huval, Kat Johnston, Eunice Kahler, Anna Kurilova, Leslie McDonald, Leslie Orr, Sylva Pate, Nicole Quenga, Melinda Quinn, Natalie Register, Sarah Richardson, Amy Shay, Debra Sterlacci, Miecha Isys Thomas, Leslie Tolstoy, Alexandra Urresti, Rebekah Valentine, Robin Yeager, Maureen Zavatone. (Rosen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle Albahae et al v. Olaplex Holdings, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Albahae
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Arcadi
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Auriana
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Brown
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makenzie Cogle
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Daniels
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanna De la Cruz
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianda Earle
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Hudson
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Huval
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kat Johnston
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Kahler
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Kurilova
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie McDonald
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Orr
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylva Pate
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Quenga
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Quinn
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Register
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Richardson
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Shay
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sterlacci
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miecha Isys Thomas
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Tolstoy
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Urresti
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Valentine
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Yeager
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Zavatone
Represented By: David E Rosen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: David E. Rosen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Vogt
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Roemer
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Hoff
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Barnhouse
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleha Ingle
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Burkett-Murphy
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa McCormack
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Green
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Berry
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Vallejo
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ventor
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Georgeson
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Sobiech
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerika Vega
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Murphy
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denisha Freeman
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Aranjo
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Witts
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Nguyen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Lobdell
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Fontenot
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliette Ball
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sa Hollifield
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Lewis
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Petty
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Marietta
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Passmore
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Riccio
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Poston
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Eisen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Cecile
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Burkhart
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Keehner
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Burkett-Murphy
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Tocco
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ferguson
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Courtney
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sokolova
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mendez
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Reddish
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Branning
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Donnelly
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyana Luciano
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Rife
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina da Gama
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khila James
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Garon
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Llewellyn
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Leon
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Easily
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Llasmin Lozoya
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Krengel
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farzana Siddiquei
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Hollifield
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Letizia
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Sigmon
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Mooshagian
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Sanchez
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Daley-Derry
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Estrada
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dahan
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Balmer
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Bowen
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Talerico
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Phelps
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Pilicy-Ryan
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Tolic
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Morgan
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Broderick
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Jones
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhiannon Singer
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pa Jones
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Olaplex Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Hilary E. Johnson
Represented By: Rachel P. Raphael
Represented By: Cheryl A. Falvey
Represented By: Sigourney Rosy Haylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cosway Co., Inc.
Represented By: Scott L Hengesbach
Represented By: Richard C Moreno
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Represented By: Gina E Och
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Yasmine Hussein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heather Jackson
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya Karakasheva
Represented By: Amy E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?