Todd R.G. Hill et al v. The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law et al
Plaintiff: Todd R. G. Hill
Defendant: Hector Candelario Pena Ramirez, Jessica Viramontes, The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law, The Guild Law School doing business as Peoples College of Law, Hector P. Ramirez, Hector C. Pena, Christina Marin Gonzalez, Robert Ira Spiro, Juan Manuel Sarinana, Prem Sarin, David Tyler Bouffard, Joshua Gillens, Clemente Franco, Hector Sanchez, Pascual Torres, Carol Dupree, Gary Silbiger, Chuyita, Edith Pomposo, Adriana Zuniga Nunez, Leah Wilson, Suzanne Celia Grandt, Vanessa Holton, Ellin Davytyan, Louisa Ayrapetyan, Alfredo Hernandez, Juan De La Cruz, Natalie Leonard, Donna Hershkowitz, Carmen Nunez, Elizabeth Hom, Jay Frykberg, Gina Crawford, Larry Kaplan, David Lawrence, Hon James Herman, Paul A. Kramer, Caroline Holmes, Imelda Santiago, Natalie Hope, Steve Mazer, Yun Xiang, Joan Randolph, Jean Krisilnikoff, Enrique Zuniga, Robert S. Brody, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, George S. Cardona, Melanie J. Lawrence, Anthony J Garcia, Shataka Shores Brooks, Eli D. Morgenstern, Does 1-888, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, Ruben Duran, Brandon N. Stallings, Mark Broughton, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Gregory E. Knoll, Melanie M Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr., Mark W. Toney, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, Amy Nunez, Audrey Ching, Lisa Cummins, Tammy Campbell, Kim Wong, Devan McFarland, Attorney General of the United Staes, The Sovereign State of California, James Herman, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Roger Aramayo, William Maestas and Ismael Venegas
Case Number: 2:2023cv01298
Filed: February 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
2 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Joshua Gillens, William Maestas, Christina Marin Gonzalez, The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law, The Guild Law School. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Gonzalez in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Entire Action, #2 Proposed Order Re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Davis, Yvette)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant Spiro's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 58) by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Spiro's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and for Sanctions Against Plaintiff, filed on September 28, 2023. (ECF No. 58.) Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 18, 2023. Defendant's reply, if any, is due NO LATER THAN TWO WEEKS AFTER SERVICE OF THE OPPOSITION. The Court will take the matter under submission without oral argument as of the date Defendant's reply is due. Plaintiff is advised that failure to oppose a motion to dismiss may be construed as consent to granting of the motion and may result in the dismissal of this Defendant from the action. Local Rule 7-12. IT IS SO ORDERED. re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #58 (ch)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS JOSHUA GILLENS, WILLIAM MAESTAS, BOARD OF DIRECTORS FOR THE PEOPLE'S COLLEGE OF LAW, AND CHRISTINE MARIN GONZALEZ TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #75 by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deadline for Defendants to file and serve a Responsive Pleading to the Second Amended Complaint of Todd R. G. Hill is hereby extended to 11/22/2023. (et)
November 14, 2023 Filing 75 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to William Maestas answer now due 11/22/2023; The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law answer now due 11/22/2023; Joshua Gillens answer now due 11/22/2023; Christina Marin Gonzalez answer now due 11/22/2023, re Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #55 filed by defendants William Maestas; The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law; Joshua Gillens; Christina Marin Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Yvette Davis added to party Joshua Gillens(pty:dft), Attorney Yvette Davis added to party William Maestas(pty:dft), Attorney Yvette Davis added to party Christina Marin Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Yvette Davis added to party The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law(pty:dft))(Davis, Yvette)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE GUILD LAW SCHOOL DBA PEOPLE'S COLLEGE OF LAW TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #73 , by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deadline for Defendant to file and serve a Responsive Pleading to the Second Amended Complaint of Todd R. G. Hill is hereby extended from November 8, 2023, to November 22, 2023. (es)
November 7, 2023 Filing 73 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Guild Law School answer now due 11/22/2023, re Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #55 filed by Defendant The Guild Law School. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Yvette)
November 7, 2023 Filing 72 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yvette Davis counsel for Defendant The Guild Law School. Adding Yvette Davis as counsel of record for The Guild Law School dba People's College of Law for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Guild Law School dba People's College of Law. (Attorney Yvette Davis added to party The Guild Law School(pty:dft))(Davis, Yvette)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR STATE BAR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #70 by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Upon stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, the Court hereby ORDERS: The time for Defendants Louisa Ayrapetyan, et al to respond to Plaintiff Todd Hill's Second Amended Complaint, filed September 20, 2023, is extended to December4, 2023. [See document for further details.] (es)
November 6, 2023 Filing 70 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 4, 2023 re Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #55 filed by Defendants Louisa Ayrapetyan, Robert S. Brody, Mark Broughton, Tammy Campbell, George S. Cardona, Hailyn Chen, Audrey Ching, Jose Cisneros, Gina Crawford, Lisa Cummins, Ellin Davytyan, Juan De La Cruz, Ruben Duran, Jay Frykberg, Anthony J Garcia, Suzanne Celia Grandt, James Herman, Alfredo Hernandez, Donna Hershkowitz, Caroline Holmes, Vanessa Holton, Elizabeth Hom, Natalie Hope, Larry Kaplan, Gregory E. Knoll, Paul A. Kramer, Jean Krisilnikoff, Melanie J. Lawrence, Natalie Leonard, Steve Mazer, Devan McFarland, Eli D. Morgenstern, Amy Nunez, Joan Randolph, Imelda Santiago, Melanie M Shelby, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon N. Stallings, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, Mark W. Toney, Leah Wilson, Kim Wong, Yun Xiang, Enrique Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for State Bar Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Complaint)(Krasilnikoff, Jean)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #58 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: In light of the Court's Order (Doc. 63) referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff pursuant to General Order 05-07, the hearing on the motion before this Court is VACATED. (jp)
October 27, 2023 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill, upon Defendant Christina Marin Gonzalez served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were served by mail, USP Priority mail Express (attached receipt) in compliance with statute not specified. (es)
October 27, 2023 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill, upon Defendant Joshua Gillens served on 10/27/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Second Amended Complaint were executed by mail, USP Priority mail Express (attached receipt) in compliance with statute not specified. (es)
October 27, 2023 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill, upon Defendant William Maestas served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023, Service of the Summons and Complaint were served by mail, USP Priority mail Express (attached receipt) in compliance with statute not specified. (es)
October 27, 2023 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill, upon Defendant The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed by mail, USP' Priority mail Express (attached receipt) in compliance with statute not specified. (es)
October 16, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE filed. Pursuant to minute order filed on 10/13/2023. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for any matters that are referred pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-01298 JLS(BFM). (rn)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REFERRING Case to Magistrate Judge Pursuant to General Order 05-07 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court VACATES the discovery-only reference to the assigned Magistrate Judge and ORDERS that the matter be referred to a Magistrate Judge for a Report and Recommendation in accordance with the procedures set forth in General Order 05-07 and Clerk's Office procedures for such assignments. The Court directs the Clerk to reclassify the present case as necessary to effectuate the procedures set forth in General Order 05-07. (jp)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for State Bar Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #60 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The time for Defendants The State Bar of California, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel of the State Bar of California, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California, The Office of Admissions of the State Bar of California, Leah Wilson, Suzanne Grandt, Vanessa Holton, Ellin Davtyan, Louisa Ayrapetyan, Alfredo Hernandez, Juan De La Cruz, Natalie Leonard, Donna Hershkowitz, Elizabeth Hom, Jay Frykberg, Gina Crawford, Larry Kaplan, Hon. James Herman, Paul Kramer, Caroline Holmes, Imelda Santiago, Nathalie Hope, Steve Mazer, Yun Xiang, Joan Randolph, Jean Krasilnikoff, Enrique Zuniga, Robert Brody, George Cardona, Melanie Lawrence, Anthony Garcia, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Eli Morgenstern, Ruben Duran, Brandon Stallings, Mark Broughton, Hailyn Chen, Jose Cisneros, Gregory Knoll, Melanie Shelby, Arnold Sowell, Jr., Mark Toney, Amy Nunez, Audrey Ching, Lisa Cummins, Tammy Campbell, Kim Wong, and Devan McFarland to respond to Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint is extended to 11/13/2023. (jp)
October 2, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time for State Bar Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Complaint re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),,,,,,,,,,,,, #60 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time for State Bar Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Complaint)(Krasilnikoff, Jean)
October 2, 2023 Filing 60 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Donna Hershkowitz answer now due 11/13/2023; Ellin Davytyan answer now due 11/13/2023; Lisa Cummins answer now due 11/13/2023; Steve Mazer answer now due 11/13/2023; Eli D. Morgenstern answer now due 11/13/2023; Kim Wong answer now due 11/13/2023; Hailyn Chen answer now due 11/13/2023; Natalie Leonard answer now due 11/13/2023; Jay Frykberg answer now due 11/13/2023; Enrique Zuniga answer now due 11/13/2023; Melanie M Shelby answer now due 11/13/2023; Alfredo Hernandez answer now due 11/13/2023; The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals answer now due 11/13/2023; Gregory E. Knoll answer now due 11/13/2023; Ruben Duran answer now due 11/13/2023; Caroline Holmes answer now due 11/13/2023; Melanie J. Lawrence answer now due 11/13/2023; Mark Broughton answer now due 11/13/2023; Yun Xiang answer now due 11/13/2023; Arnold Sowell, Jr answer now due 11/13/2023; Tammy Campbell answer now due 11/13/2023; Jose Cisneros answer now due 11/13/2023; Shataka Shores-Brooks answer now due 11/13/2023; Mark W. Toney answer now due 11/13/2023; Audrey Ching answer now due 11/13/2023; The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals answer now due 11/13/2023; Juan De La Cruz answer now due 11/13/2023; Vanessa Holton answer now due 11/13/2023; Louisa Ayrapetyan answer now due 11/13/2023; Paul A. Kramer answer now due 11/13/2023; Devan McFarland answer now due 11/13/2023; Amy Nunez answer now due 11/13/2023; Brandon N. Stallings answer now due 11/13/2023; Robert S. Brody answer now due 11/13/2023; Suzanne Celia Grandt answer now due 11/13/2023; Anthony J Garcia answer now due 11/13/2023; Imelda Santiago answer now due 11/13/2023; Joan Randolph answer now due 11/13/2023; Leah Wilson answer now due 11/13/2023; Gina Crawford answer now due 11/13/2023; George S. Cardona answer now due 11/13/2023; Jean Krisilnikoff answer now due 11/13/2023; Elizabeth Hom answer now due 11/13/2023; Larry Kaplan answer now due 11/13/2023; Natalie Hope answer now due 11/13/2023; The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals answer now due 11/13/2023, re Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #55 filed by Defendants Donna Hershkowitz; Ellin Davytyan; Lisa Cummins ; Steve Mazer ; Eli D. Morgenstern; Kim Wong; Hailyn Chen; Natalie Leonard; Jay Frykberg; Enrique Zuniga; Melanie M Shelby; Alfredo Hernandez; The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals; James Herman; Gregory E. Knoll; Ruben Duran; Caroline Holmes; Melanie J. Lawrence; Mark Broughton; Yun Xiang; Arnold Sowell, Jr; Tammy Campbell; Jose Cisneros; Shataka Shores-Brooks; Mark W. Toney; Audrey Ching; The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals; Juan De La Cruz; Vanessa Holton; Louisa Ayrapetyan; Paul A. Kramer; Devan McFarland; Amy Nunez; Brandon N. Stallings; Robert S. Brody; Suzanne Celia Grandt; Anthony J Garcia; Imelda Santiago; Joan Randolph; Leah Wilson; Gina Crawford; George S. Cardona; Jean Krisilnikoff; Elizabeth Hom; Larry Kaplan; Natalie Hope. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time for State Bar Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Complaint)(Krasilnikoff, Jean)
October 2, 2023 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff counsel for Defendants Louisa Ayrapetyan, Robert S. Brody, Mark Broughton, Tammy Campbell, George S. Cardona, Hailyn Chen, Audrey Ching, Jose Cisneros, Gina Crawford, Lisa Cummins, Ellin Davytyan, Juan De La Cruz, Ruben Duran, Jay Frykberg, Anthony J Garcia, Suzanne Celia Grandt, James Herman, Alfredo Hernandez, Donna Hershkowitz, Caroline Holmes, Vanessa Holton, Elizabeth Hom, Natalie Hope, Larry Kaplan, Gregory E. Knoll, Paul A. Kramer, Jean Krisilnikoff, Melanie J. Lawrence, Natalie Leonard, Steve Mazer, Devan McFarland, Eli D. Morgenstern, Amy Nunez, Joan Randolph, Imelda Santiago, Melanie M Shelby, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon N. Stallings, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, Mark W. Toney, Leah Wilson, Kim Wong, Yun Xiang, Enrique Zuniga. Adding Jean Krasilnikoff as counsel of record for State Bar of California; The Office of Chief Trial Counsel of the State Bar of California; The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California; The Office of Admissions of the State Bar of California; Leah Wilson; Suzanne Grandt; Vanessa Holton; Ellin Davtyan; Louisa Ayrapetyan; Alfredo Hernandez; Juan De La Cruz; Natalie Leonard; Donna Hershkowitz; Elizabeth Hom; Jay Frykberg; Gina Crawford; Larry Kaplan; Hon. James Herman; Paul Kramer; Caroline Holmes; Imelda Santiago; Nathalie Hope; Steve Mazer; Yun Xiang; Joan Randolph; Jean Krasilnikoff; Enrique Zuniga; Robert Brody; George Cardona; Melanie Lawrence; Anthony Garcia; Shataka Shores-Brooks; Eli Morgenstern; Ruben Duran; Brandon Stallings; Mark Broughton; Hailyn Chen; Jose Cisneros; Gregory Knoll; Melanie Shelby; Arnold Sowell, Jr.; Mark Toney; Amy Nunez; Audrey Ching; Lisa Cummins; Tammy Campbell; Kim Wong; Devan McFarland for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants State Bar of California; The Office of Chief Trial Counsel of the State Bar of California; The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California; The Office of Admissions of the State Bar of California; Leah Wilson; Suzanne Grandt; Vanessa Holton; Ellin Davtyan; Louisa Ayrapetyan; Alfredo Hernandez; Juan De La Cruz; Natalie Leonard; Donna Hershkowitz; Elizabeth Hom; Jay Frykberg; Gina Crawford; Larry Kaplan; Hon. James Herman; Paul Kramer; Caroline Holmes; Imelda Santiago; Nathalie Hope; Steve Mazer; Yun Xiang; Joan Randolph; Jean Krasilnikoff; Enrique Zuniga; Robert Brody; George Cardona; Melanie Lawrence; Anthony Garcia; Shataka Shores-Brooks; Eli Morgenstern; Ruben Duran; Brandon Stallings; Mark Broughton; Hailyn Chen; Jose Cisneros; Gregory Knoll; Melanie Shelby; Arnold Sowell, Jr.; Mark Toney; Amy Nunez; Audrey Ching; Lisa Cummins; Tammy Campbell; Kim Wong; Devan McFarland. (Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Louisa Ayrapetyan(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Robert S. Brody(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Mark Broughton(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Tammy Campbell(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party George S. Cardona(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Hailyn Chen(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Audrey Ching(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Jose Cisneros(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Gina Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Lisa Cummins (pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Ellin Davytyan(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Juan De La Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Ruben Duran(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Jay Frykberg(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Anthony J Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Suzanne Celia Grandt(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party James Herman(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Alfredo Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Donna Hershkowitz(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Caroline Holmes(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Vanessa Holton(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Elizabeth Hom(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Natalie Hope(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Larry Kaplan(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Gregory E. Knoll(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Paul A. Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Jean Krisilnikoff(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Melanie J. Lawrence(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Natalie Leonard(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Steve Mazer (pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Devan McFarland(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Eli D. Morgenstern(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Amy Nunez(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Joan Randolph(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Imelda Santiago(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Melanie M Shelby(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Shataka Shores-Brooks(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Arnold Sowell, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Brandon N. Stallings(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Mark W. Toney(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Leah Wilson(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Kim Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Yun Xiang(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Roche Krasilnikoff added to party Enrique Zuniga(pty:dft))(Krasilnikoff, Jean)
September 28, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Robert Ira Spiro. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email Hill to Spiro 9/11/23, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Order of Dismissal, Superior Court, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Hill, Superior Court, #5 Exhibit Supplemental First Amended Complaint, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting this motion) (Spiro, Robert)
September 26, 2023 Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 20, 2023 Filing 56 21 DAY Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint #55 as to Defendants Roger Aramayo, Attorney General of the United States, Louisa Ayrapetyan, David Tyler Bouffard, Robert S. Brody, Mark Broughton, Tammy Campbell, George S. Cardona, Hailyn Chen, Audrey Ching, Jose Cisneros, Gina Crawford, Lisa Cummins, Ellin Davytyan, Juan De La Cruz, Does, Carol Dupree, Ruben Duran, Clemente Franco, Jay Frykberg, Anthony J Garcia, Joshua Gillens, Suzanne Celia Grandt, James Herman, Alfredo Hernandez, Donna Hershkowitz, Caroline Holmes, Vanessa Holton, Elizabeth Hom, Natalie Hope, Robert Ira Spiro, Larry Kaplan, Gregory E. Knoll, Paul A. Kramer, Jean Krisilnikoff, David Lawrence, Melanie J. Lawrence, Natalie Leonard, William Maestas, Christina Marin Gonzalez, Steve Mazer, Devan McFarland, Eli D. Morgenstern, Amy Nunez, Carmen Nunez, Hector C. Pena, Edith Pomposo, Joan Randolph, Hector Sanchez, Imelda Santiago, Prem Sarin, Juan Manuel Sarinana, Melanie M Shelby, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Gary Silbiger, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon N. Stallings, The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Guild Law School, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Sovereign State of California, Mark W. Toney, Pascual Torres, Ismael Venegas, Jessica Viramontes, Leah Wilson, Kim Wong, Yun Xiang, Enrique Zuniga, Adriana Zuniga Nunez. (jp)
September 20, 2023 Filing 55 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Attorney General of the United States, Louisa Ayrapetyan, David Tyler Bouffard, Robert S. Brody, Mark Broughton, Tammy Campbell, George S. Cardona, Hailyn Chen, Audrey Ching, Jose Cisneros, Gina Crawford, Lisa Cummins, Ellin Davytyan(individually), Ellin Davytyan(as General Counsel State Bar of California), Juan De La Cruz(Assembly Appointee, Public Member), Juan De La Cruz, Does, Carol Dupree, Ruben Duran, Clemente Franco, Jay Frykberg, Anthony J Garcia, Joshua Gillens, Suzanne Celia Grandt, James Herman, Alfredo Hernandez, Donna Hershkowitz, Caroline Holmes, Vanessa Holton, Elizabeth Hom, Natalie Hope, Robert Ira Spiro, Larry Kaplan, Gregory E. Knoll, Paul A. Kramer, Jean Krisilnikoff, David Lawrence, Melanie J. Lawrence, Natalie Leonard(Principal Program Analyst, Law School Regulation), Natalie Leonard(Esq), Christina Marin Gonzalez, Steve Mazer, Devan McFarland, Eli D. Morgenstern, Amy Nunez, Carmen Nunez, Hector C. Pena, Edith Pomposo, Joan Randolph, Hector Sanchez, Imelda Santiago, Prem Sarin, Juan Manuel Sarinana, Melanie M Shelby, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Gary Silbiger, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon N. Stallings, The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Guild Law School, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Sovereign State of California, Mark W. Toney, Pascual Torres, Jessica Viramontes, Leah Wilson, Kim Wong, Yun Xiang, Enrique Zuniga, Adriana Zuniga Nunez; Adding Roger Aramayo, William Maestas, Ismael Venegas amending First Amended Complaint #38 with Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: 1) ORDERING Plaintiff to Stop Emailing the Courtroom Deputy and 2) GRANTING Motion for Relief from Judgment (Doc. #48 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Motion is GRANTED, and the Judgment of Dismissal is set aside. Plaintiff is ordered to file any amended complaint within 14 days of the issuance of this Order. (MD JS-5. Case Reopened.) (jp)
September 19, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #52 . The following error(s) was found: (1) The caption of the summons must match the caption of the Second Amended Complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. (2) Second Amended Complaint is STRICKEN, Pursuant to Court Order #51 . The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
September 18, 2023 Filing 52 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Second Amended Complaint #49 filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Second Amended Complaint #49 , for the following reasons: Case is closed. (2) The Second Amended Complaint may not be filed until the Judgment of Dismissal (Doc. 47) is set aside and leave to file is granted. (jp)
September 12, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Second Amended Complaint #49 . The following error(s) was found: The Caption of the Second Amended Complaint does not match the caption of the Civil Summons requesting to be issued.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
September 7, 2023 Filing 49 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER COURT'S ORDER #51 ] - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending First Amended Complaint #38 ; JURY DEMAND filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill (lc). Modified on 9/11/2023 (lc). Modified on 9/19/2023 (jp).
September 7, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to Set Aside Judgment of Dismissal filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (jp)
July 27, 2023 Filing 47 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 6/7/2023, the Court issued an Order dismissing Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and giving Plaintiff 21 days to file a Second Amended Complaint. (6/7/2023 Order, Doc. #45 .) Although more than 21 days have passed, Plaintiff has not filed a Second Amended Complaint. Accordingly, a JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL is hereby entered. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Perfect Summons and Effect Service of Process (Doc. #43 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, there is no operative complaint that can be served on the Defendants in this matter and Hill's Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. (jp)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: (1) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement First Amended Complaint (Doc. #40 ); and (2) DISMISSING First Amended Complaint With Leave to Amend by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Hill's Motion is DENIED and the First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. If Hill still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order within to file a Second Amended Complaint, attempting to cure the defects in the Complaint described herein. The Second Amended Complaint must be complete in itself and not refer in any manner to the FAC or the original Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint should contain a "short and plain statement" of the claim or claims for relief, setting forth, in straightforward fashion, the facts supporting each claim. See FRCP 8(a), (d)(1). All allegations should be made in (correctly) numbered paragraphs. See FRCP 10(b). (jp)
May 21, 2023 Filing 44 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Todd R G Hill's First Amended Complaint Under Fed. Rule 15(D); Alternatively Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint #40 OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Robert Ira Spiro. (Attorney Robert Ira Spiro added to party Robert Ira Spiro(pty:dft))(Spiro, Robert)
May 15, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Perfect Summons and Effect Service of Process Under FRCP 4 on Defendants filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
May 10, 2023 Filing 42 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint #38 filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
May 9, 2023 Filing 41 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendant Robert Ira Spiro. (jp)
May 5, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to Supplement Todd R G Hill's First Amended Complaint Under Fed. Rule 15(D); Alternatively Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand). (jp)
April 24, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendant Robert Ira Spiro. (jp)
April 18, 2023 Filing 38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Attorney General of the United States, Louisa Ayrapetyan, David Tyler Bouffard, Robert S. Brody, Mark Broughton, Tammy Campbell, George S. Cardona, Hailyn Chen, Audrey Ching, Jose Cisneros, Gina Crawford, Lisa Cummins, Ellin Davytyan, individually and as General Counsel State Bar of California, Juan De La Cruz(Assembly Appointee, Public Member), Juan De La Cruz, Does, Carol Dupree, Ruben Duran, Clemente Franco, Jay Frykberg, Anthony J Garcia, Joshua Gillens, Suzanne Celia Grandt, James Herman, Alfredo Hernandez, Donna Hershkowitz, Caroline Holmes, Vanessa Holton, Elizabeth Hom, Natalie Hope, Robert Ira Spiro, Larry Kaplan, Gregory E. Knoll, Paul A. Kramer, Jean Krisilnikoff, David Lawrence, Melanie J. Lawrence, Natalie Leonard, Natalie Leonard (Esq), Christina Marin Gonzalez, Steve Mazer, Devan McFarland, Eli D. Morgenstern, Amy Nunez, Carmen Nunez, Hector C. Pena, Edith Pomposo, Joan Randolph, Hector Sanchez, Imelda Santiago, Prem Sarin, Juan Manuel Sarinana, Melanie M Shelby, Shataka Shores-Brooks, Gary Silbiger, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon N. Stallings, The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Guild Law School, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Sovereign State of California, Mark W. Toney, Pascual Torres, Jessica Viramontes, Leah Wilson, Kim Wong, Yun Xiang, Enrique Zuniga, Adriana Zuniga Nunez amending Complaint - (Discovery) #1 with Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: (1) DISMISSING Complaint with Leave to Amend; and (2) REVOKING Plaintiff's Electronic Filing Privileges by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds that Plaintiff's use of the e-filing system has proven problematic and REVOKES Plaintiff's electronic filing privileges in this case. Plaintiff may not register anew to file via ECF in this case without Court approval. The Court also ORDERS Plaintiff to refrain from emailing the Deputy Clerk and the Court for status updates. See document for further information. (jp)
April 4, 2023 Filing 36 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #35 filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exact naming re-addressed to clarify deficiency.)(Hill, Todd)
April 4, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #33 . The following error(s) was found: Defendants David Bouffard; Carol Deupree; Anthony Garcia; Christina Gonzalez; Suzanne Celia Grandt; Gregory Knoil; Paul Kramer; Melanie Lawrence; Eli Morgenstern; Hector Pena/Hector P. Rami; Juan Sarinana; Melanie Shelby; Shataka Shore-Brooks; Ira Spiro; Brandon Stallings; and Adriana Zuniga DOES NOT match of the COMPLAINT; The named of defendants must be exactly as how you have it on the complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
April 2, 2023 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #33 filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Individuals)(Hill, Todd)
March 28, 2023 Filing 33 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #29 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,,, #32 filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exact naming addressed to clarify deficiency.)(Hill, Todd)
March 27, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #31 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Unclear as to your summons. You have multiple pages regarding just To: Louisa Ayrapetyan. See section: To: (Defendants name and address), you can list each defendant individually on the form, and/or attach a list of all defendants on a separate sheet of page with their addresses. The named defendants must be exactly as how you have it on the complaint. If you do separate summons, please attach it as separate attachments to the main document. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
March 20, 2023 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Hill, Todd)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (REFER TO DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv)
March 14, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #28 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
March 13, 2023 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (lom)
March 3, 2023 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 25 EXHIBIT PRA - 1 P1 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 24 EXHIBIT CSG - The Book of Volume 53 The States filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 23 EXHIBIT NOV-Ongoing violations of CBPC 17200 and 17500 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 22 EXHIBIT PP1 CAO 2015-030 pg. 1 of 1 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 21 EXHIBITS - PMT filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 20 EXHIBIT filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 19 EXHIBIT re Email filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 18 EXHIBIT RE FIRST CH-120-With Attachment 11 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 17 EXHIBIT filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 16 Law Library filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 15 EXHIBIT UI-1 units issue memo to PCL Board RDS, p.1 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 EXHIBIT 60 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 13 EXHIBIT AO-1 p.1 - Administrative Order 2017-09-20 - In the Supreme Court of California filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 12 Antitrust Determination 2023-0001 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 10 EXHIBIT DNO-1 ANV Todd Hill-Final denial 08522.pdf pg 1 of 6 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 9 EXHIBIT FD-1, P1 OF 5 filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Filing 8 People's College of Law filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING #6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (jp)
March 2, 2023 Filing 11 Report on Disparities in the Discipline System - Executive Summary filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (jp)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (hc)
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (sh)
February 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Attorney General of the United Staes, Louisa Ayrapetyan, David Tyler Bouffard, Robert S. Brody, Mark Broughton, Tammy Campbell, George S. Cardona, Hailyn Chen, Audrey Ching, Jose Cisneros, Gina Crawford, Lisa Cummins, Ellin Davytyan(individually), Ellin Davytyan(as General Counsel State Bar of California), Juan De La Cruz(Assembly Appointee, Public Member), Juan De La Cruz, Does, Carol Dupree, Ruben Duran, Clemente Franco, Jay Frykberg, Anthony J Garcia, Joshua Gillens, Suzanne Celia Grandt, James Herman, Alfredo Hernandez, Donna Hershkowitz, Caroline Holmes, Vanessa Holton, Elizabeth Hom, Natalie Hope, Robert Ira Spiro, Larry Kaplan, Gregory E. Knoll, Paul A. Kramer, Jean Krisilnikoff, David Lawrence, Melanie J. Lawrence, Natalie Leonard(Principal Program Analyst, Law School Regulation), Natalie Leonard(Esq), Christina Marin Gonzalez, Steve Mazer, Devan McFarland, Eli D. Morgenstern, Amy Nunez, Carmen Nunez, Hector Candelario Pena Ramirez, Edith Pomposo, Joan Randolph, Hector Sanchez, Imelda Santiago, Prem Sarin, Juan Manuel Sarinana, Melanie M Shelby, Shataka Shores Brooks, Gary Silbiger, Arnold Sowell, Jr, Brandon N. Stallings, The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law, The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Guild Law School, The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals, The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals, The Sovereign State of California, Mark W. Toney, Pascual Torres, Jessica Viramontes, Leah Wilson, Kim Wong, Yun Xiang, Enrique Zuniga.Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Todd R. G. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Complaint Part 3, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd R.G. Hill et al v. The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Candelario Pena Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Viramontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors, Officers and Agents and Individuals of the Peoples College of Law
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guild Law School doing business as Peoples College of Law
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector P. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector C. Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Marin Gonzalez
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ira Spiro
Represented By: Robert Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Manuel Sarinana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prem Sarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tyler Bouffard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Gillens
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemente Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pascual Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Silbiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuyita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Pomposo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Zuniga Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Wilson
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Celia Grandt
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Holton
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellin Davytyan
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisa Ayrapetyan
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Hernandez
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan De La Cruz
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Leonard
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hershkowitz
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hom
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Frykberg
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Crawford
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Kaplan
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon James Herman
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Kramer
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Holmes
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda Santiago
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Hope
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Mazer
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yun Xiang
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Randolph
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Krisilnikoff
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Zuniga
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Brody
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of Chief Trial Counsel The State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Cardona
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie J. Lawrence
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J Garcia
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shataka Shores Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli D. Morgenstern
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-888
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees the State Bar of California as Agents and Individuals
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Duran
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon N. Stallings
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Broughton
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailyn Chen
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cisneros
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory E. Knoll
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie M Shelby
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Sowell, Jr.
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W. Toney
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of Admissions The State Bar of California as Staff Agents and Individuals
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Nunez
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Ching
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cummins
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Campbell
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wong
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devan McFarland
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United Staes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sovereign State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shataka Shores-Brooks
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Aramayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Maestas
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Venegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd R. G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?