Michael Kelley v. Penske Media Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Kelley
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation, SheMedia, LLC and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv01718
Filed: March 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/7/2023. (tj)
April 26, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Penske Media Corporation, SheMedia, LLC, (Bandlow, Lincoln)
April 26, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Penske Media Corporation, SheMedia, LLC.(Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Penske Media Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party SheMedia, LLC(pty:dft))(Bandlow, Lincoln)
April 21, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelleyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #13 (Doniger, Stephen)
April 12, 2023 Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than April 20, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding overdue responses as to Penske Media Corporation and SheMedia, LLC. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelley, upon Defendant SheMedia, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Lincoln Bandlow, Esq, Attorney. (Doniger, Stephen)
April 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelley, upon Defendant Penske Media Corporation acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Lincoln Bandlow, Esq, Attorney. (Doniger, Stephen)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
March 8, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Does, Penske Media Corporation, SheMedia, LLC. (sh)
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
March 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
March 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelley. (Doniger, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doniger, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelley, (Doniger, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelley. (Doniger, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34912631 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Michael Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint) (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Michael Kelley(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Kelley v. Penske Media Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kelley
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: Benjamin Firestone Tookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SheMedia, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?