Diane K. Godfrey v. Regents of University of California et al
Plaintiff: DIANE K. GODFREY
Defendant: Stanford Health Care, Regents of University of California, Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Tenet California Inc., Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc., Walmart Inc., McNaughton Newspapers Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund Inc., Los Angeles Times, Federal Express Company Inc., The UPS Store Inc., Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc. doing business as Valley Eye Care Medical Associates, Dental Board of California, California Board of Pharmacy, California Board of Optometry, Medical Board of California, California Physicians Assistant Board, Ray Stone Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2023cv02068
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Filing 85 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby continues the hearings on all pending Motions to Dismiss and related motions (ECF Nos. #28 , #30 , #44 , #50 , #51 , #53 , #58 , #60 , #61 , #63 , #64 , #65 , #67 , #72 , #76 ) to August 17, 2023 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. The Court notes that, despite the requirement in the Court's operative standing order (found on the Court's website) that oppositions be filed within 14 days of a motion, Plaintiff has not yet filed oppositions to several of the motions listed here. Oppositions to all such Motions must be filed, if at all, within 14 days of this order. Replies must be filed, if at all, within 7 days of the filing of Oppositions. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.
June 2, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO THE REGENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #28 filed by Defendant Regents of University of California. (Cardozo, Raymond)
June 1, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #65 filed by Defendant The UPS Store Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Maldonado In Support of Non-Opposition to The UPS Store, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(McDonald, Mark)
May 30, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #80 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 26, 2023 Filing 81 Defendant Livermore Optometry Group's Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc. re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #76 (Hewitt, Stephen)
May 26, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen L Hewitt on behalf of Defendant Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc. (Hewitt, Stephen)
May 26, 2023 Filing 79 [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Livermore Optometry's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #76 filed by Defendant Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc.. (Hewitt, Stephen)
May 26, 2023 Filing 78 Notice of Joinder to Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc.. (Hewitt, Stephen)
May 26, 2023 Filing 77 Notice Joinder to Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc.. (Hewitt, Stephen)
May 26, 2023 Filing 76 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration Declaration of Stacy L. Raphael, Esq. in Support of Livermore Optometry Group's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint-Ex. A, #3 Declaration Declaration of John P. Freeman, Esq., in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Attorney Stephen L Hewitt added to party Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Hewitt, Stephen)
May 25, 2023 Filing 75 REPLY Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Def. Gagnon Vision Medical Group, Inc. dba Valley Eye Care Medical Associates #60 filed by Defendant Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc.. (Dodd, John)
May 24, 2023 Filing 74 REPLY and notice of Plaintiff's failure to oppose Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #64 filed by Defendants California Board of Optometry, California Board of Pharmacy. (Morehead, Claudia)
May 10, 2023 Filing 73 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Federal Express Company Inc.. identifying Federal Express Corporation (Flynn, Jane)
May 5, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Federal Express Company Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph Reafsnyder, #2 Proposed Order) (Flynn, Jane)
May 5, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Other error(s) with document(s): The hearing date was closed at 1:11 pm and the motion was filed after.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
May 5, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Tenet California Inc., identifying Tenet California, Inc., Doctors Medical Center of Modesto, Inc., and Tenet Healthcare Corporation. (Michela, Patrick)
May 4, 2023 Filing 69 SUPPLEMENT filed by Defendant McNaughton Newspapers Inc.. (Canning, Joseph)
May 4, 2023 Filing 68 SUPPLEMENT filed by Defendant McNaughton Newspapers Inc.. (Canning, Joseph)
May 4, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant McNaughton Newspapers Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Canning, Joseph)
May 4, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The UPS Store Inc., identifying United Parcel Service, Inc.. (McDonald, Mark)
May 3, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The UPS Store Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Maldonado ISO Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - April 24, 2023 Email to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit B - April 25, 2023 Email to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit C - April 26, 2023 Email to Plaintiff, #5 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Mark)
May 3, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant California Board of Optometry, California Board of Pharmacy. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA MOREHEAD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY AND CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF OPTOMETRYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY AND CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF OPTOMETRYS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)]) (Morehead, Claudia)
May 3, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Ray Stone Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Michael J. Dailey in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Dailey, Michael)
April 27, 2023 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sayyora Badalbaeva counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding Sayyora Badalbaeva as counsel of record for Defendant WALMART INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant WALMART INC.. (Attorney Sayyora Badalbaeva added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Badalbaeva, Sayyora)
April 27, 2023 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Def. Gagnon Vision Medical Group, Inc. dba Valley Eye Care Medical Associates #60 filed by Defendant Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in support of Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dodd, John)
April 27, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Def. Gagnon Vision Medical Group, Inc. dba Valley Eye Care Medical Associates filed by defendant Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Dodd, #2 Memorandum Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dodd, John)
April 27, 2023 Filing 59 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Complaint #50 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #44 filed by Defendants Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Tenet California Inc.. (Michela, Patrick)
April 27, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Tenet California Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Michela, Patrick)
April 27, 2023 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick E Michela counsel for Defendants Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Tenet California Inc.. Filed by Defendant Tenet California, Inc. and Doctors Medical Center of Modesto, Inc.. (Attorney Patrick E Michela added to party Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Michela added to party Tenet California Inc.(pty:dft))(Michela, Patrick)
April 26, 2023 Filing 56 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The moving parties have filed motion for a date that has been closed by this Court. The Court hereby continues the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Complaint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. #50 and the Motion to Strike Punitive Damages in Plaintiff Complaint Complaint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. #51 to 07/06/2023, at 10:00 am. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. Closed motion dates can be found on the Court's website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRYTHERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 26, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents #54 was inadvertently issued in error. (yl)
April 26, 2023 Filing 54 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR #55 ] NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Complaint #50 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Other error(s) with document(s): June 1, 2023 was closed on 4/26/2023 at 9:29 a.m.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) Modified on 4/26/2023 (yl).
April 26, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to CORRECTED Declaration for Motion to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages in Plaintiff Complaint Complaint - (Discovery),, #51 Previous Decl was duplicate from Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - phone, #2 Exhibit Ex B - meet and confer, #3 Exhibit Ex C - further meet and confer) (Smith, Andrew)
April 25, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages in Plaintiff Complaint Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Ps and As, #2 Declaration Decl of Sayyora Badalbaeva, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - phone, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - meet and confer, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - further meet and confer, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order pdf) (Smith, Andrew)
April 25, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Complaint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Ps and As, #2 Declaration Decl of Sayyora Badalbaeva, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - phone, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - meet and confer, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - further meet and confer, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order pdf) (Attorney Andrew O Smith added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft)) (Smith, Andrew)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MCNAUGHTON NEWPAPER INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRTY-DAY Extension to Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff Diane K. Godfrey #48 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Defendant McNaughton Newspapers, Inc.'s response to the Complaint of Plaintiff Diane K. Godfrey shall be due on May 4, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 24, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #46 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 21, 2023 Filing 48 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/4/2023 filed by Defendant McNaughton Newspapers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting) (Canning, Joseph) Modified on 5/5/2023 (lom). Modified on 5/5/2023 (lom).
April 21, 2023 Filing 47 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #44 filed by Defendant McNaughton Newspapers Inc.. (Canning, Joseph)
April 21, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph M Canning on behalf of Defendant McNaughton Newspapers Inc. (Attorney Joseph M Canning added to party McNaughton Newspapers Inc.(pty:dft))(Canning, Joseph)
April 21, 2023 Filing 45 JOINDER filed by Defendant Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc. joining in Notice (Other), #30 . (Jones, Gregory)
April 21, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7-3 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Gregory)
April 21, 2023 Filing 43 Notice of Interested Parties (Dodd, John)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT THE UPS STORE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRD-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #25 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered TUPPS'S Ex Parte Application and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Ex Parte Application and ORDERS as follows: Defendant the UPS Store, Inc.'s response to the Complaint shall be due on May 3, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 18, 2023 Filing 41 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc.. Amendment to Miscellaneous Document, #34 Proposed Order (Dodd, John)
April 12, 2023 Filing 40 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #28 Amended [Proposed] Order [28-2] filed by Defendant Regents of University of California. (Cardozo, Raymond)
April 12, 2023 Filing 39 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Regents of University of California, identifying University of California, Berkeley; University of California, Los Angeles; University of California, Santa Barbara; University of California, San Diego; University of California, Irvine; University of California, Davis; University of California, Santa Cruz; University of California, Riverside; University of California, Merced; University of California, San Francisco; UC Davis Health; UC San Diego Health; UCI Health; UCLA Health; UCR Health; UCSF Health; UC Law SF. (Cardozo, Raymond)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY [ECF NO. #37 ) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered FedEx's Ex Parte Application and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the application and ORDERS that defendant Federal Express Corporation's responsive pleading to the Complaint of Plaintiff Diane K. Godfrey is due by May 7, 2023. SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 6, 2023 Filing 37 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/5/2023 filed by Defendant Federal Express Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jane M Flynn added to party Federal Express Company Inc.(pty:dft)) (Flynn, Jane)
April 6, 2023 Filing 36 JOINDER filed by Defendant Federal Express Company Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Flynn, Jane)
April 6, 2023 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan Jonathan Su counsel for Defendant Stanford Health Care. Bryan Su is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Defendant. (Su, Bryan)
April 5, 2023 Filing 34 [DEFENDANT GAGNON VISION MEDICAL GROUP, INC. DBA VALLEY EYE CARE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY filed as] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodd, John) Modified on 4/6/2023 (lom).
April 5, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc., (Jones, Gregory)
April 5, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #28 , Notice (Other), #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed orders SHALL NOT have counsel's name, address, and phone number in upper, left corner. Please refer to Judge's Procedure page at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong for review of the Proposed Order Sample. Counsel MUST re-submit their Proposed Order in accordance with the Judge's posted sample. (lom)
April 5, 2023 Filing 31 JOINDER filed by Defendant Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Dodd, John)
April 4, 2023 Filing 30 Notice OF MOTION AND MOTION filed by Defendant Stanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gil Burkwitz, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Order Re MTD, #4 Exhibit C - Order, #5 Exhibit D - Judgement, #6 Proposed Order RE: Motion To Dismiss, #7 Request for Judicial Notice)(Burkwitz, Gil)
April 4, 2023 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The moving party has filed a motion for a date that has been closed by this Court. The Court hereby continues the Motion to Dismiss #28 to 07/06/2023 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. Closed motion dates can be found on the Court's website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Regents of University of California. Motion set for hearing on 5/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 [Proposed] Order) (Attorney Raymond A Cardozo added to party Regents of University of California(pty:dft)) (Cardozo, Raymond)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT THE UPS STORE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FORA THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #25 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court ORDERS as follows: Defendant The UPS Store, Inc.'s response to the Complaint shall be due on May 3, 2023. (lom) Modified on 4/4/2023 (lom).
April 3, 2023 Filing 26 JOINDER filed by Defendant The UPS Store Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (McDonald, Mark)
April 3, 2023 Filing 25 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/3/2023 re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant The UPS Store Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark R. McDonald In Support of Ex Parte, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Mark R McDonald added to party The UPS Store Inc.(pty:dft)) (McDonald, Mark)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT RAY STONE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY #22 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby GRANTS the ex parte Application and ORDERS as follows: Defendant Ray Stone Inc.'s response to the Complaint shall be due on May 3, 2023. (lom)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TENET CALIFORNIA, INC. AND DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODREY #16 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby GRANTS the ex parte application andORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants Tenet California, Inc. and Doctors Medical Center of Modesto, Inc. joint response to the Complaint of Plaintiff Diane K. Godfrey shall be due on May 8, 2023. (lom)
March 31, 2023 Filing 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/3/2023 re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Ray Stone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Re 30 Day Extension to Respond to Complaint) (Dailey, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ray Stone Inc., identifying Defendants REGENTS OF UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., TENET CALIFORNIA, INC., DIGNITY HEALTH MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC., WALMART INC., MCNAUGHTON NEWSPAPERS, INC., ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, INC., LOS ANGELES TIMES, THE UPS STORE, INC., GAGNON VISION MEDICAL GROUP, INC., DENTAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF PHARMACY, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF BARBERING AND COSMETOLOGY, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF OPTOMETRY, MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA, CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS ASSISTANT BOARD, RAY STONE INC., STANFORD HEALTH CARE, PROVIDENCE MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS COMPANY, INC., and LIVERMORE OPTOMETRY, INC.. (Dailey, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 19 JOINDER filed by Defendant Ray Stone Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Dailey, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael J. Dailey counsel for Defendant Ray Stone Inc.. Adding Michael J. Dailey as counsel of record for Ray Stone Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ray Stone Inc.. (Attorney Michael J. Dailey added to party Ray Stone Inc.(pty:dft))(Dailey, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig J. Mariam counsel for Defendant Ray Stone Inc.. Adding Craig J. Mariam as counsel of record for Ray Stone Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ray Stone Inc.. (Attorney Craig J. Mariam added to party Ray Stone Inc.(pty:dft))(Mariam, Craig)
March 31, 2023 Filing 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/8/2023 re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendants Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Tenet California Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Tenet California, Inc. And Doctors Medical Center Of Modesto, Inc.S Ex Parte Application For A Thirty-Day Extension To Respond To The Complaint Of Plaintiff Diane K. Godrey) (Attorney Michael S Turner added to party Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael S Turner added to party Tenet California Inc.(pty:dft)) (Turner, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #13 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Having considered the Application and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Application and ORDERS that DHMFs response to the complaint shall be due on April 28, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
March 30, 2023 Filing 14 JOINDER filed by Defendant Tenet California Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Turner, Michael)
March 28, 2023 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/28/2023 re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Gregory Jones added to party Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc.(pty:dft)) (Jones, Gregory)
March 27, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Avi Burkwitz counsel for Defendant Stanford Health Care. Adding Avi Burkwitz as counsel of record for Stanford Health Care for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Stanford Health Care. (Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party Stanford Health Care (pty:dft))(Burkwitz, Avi)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY AND CALIFORNIA BOARD OF OPTOMETRYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY #8 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered Defendants California State Board of Pharmacy and California Board of Optometry's Ex Parte Application for a Thirty-Day Extension to Respond to the Complaint and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the ex parte application and ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants Board of Pharmacy and Board of Optometry's joint response to the Complaint of Plaintiff Diane K. Godfrey shall be due on May 3, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
March 24, 2023 Filing 10 JOINDER filed by Defendant Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Jones, Gregory)
March 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed PROPOSED ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY #8 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants California State Board Pharmacy and California Board of Optometrys Ex Parte Application for a Thirty Day Extension to Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff)(Morehead, Claudia)
March 23, 2023 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF DIANE K. GODFREY filed by Defendants California Board of Optometry, California Board of Pharmacy. (Attorney Claudia Morehead added to party California Board of Optometry(pty:dft), Attorney Claudia Morehead added to party California Board of Pharmacy(pty:dft)) (Morehead, Claudia)
March 23, 2023 Filing 7 JOINDER filed by Defendants California Board of Optometry, California Board of Pharmacy (Morehead, Claudia)
March 21, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
March 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
March 20, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Animal Legal Defense Fund Inc., California Board of Optometry, California Board of Pharmacy, California Physicians Assistant Board, Dental Board of California, Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc., Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc., Does, Federal Express Company Inc., Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc., Los Angeles Times, McNaughton Newspapers Inc., Medical Board of California, Ray Stone Inc., Regents of University of California, Stanford Health Care, Tenet California Inc., The UPS Store Inc., Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Diane K. Godfrey.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/06/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Stanford Health Care. (Burkwitz, Gil)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Stanford Health Care, identifying REGENTS OF UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., TENET CALIFORNIA INC., DIGNITY HEALTH MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. WALMART INC., MCNAUGHTON NEWSPAPERS, INC., ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, INC., LOS ANGELES TIMES, FEDERAL EXPRESS COMPANY, INC., THE UPS STORE, INC., GAGNON VISION MEDICAL GROUP, INC., DENTAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF PHARMACY, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF BARBERING AND COSMETOLOGY, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF OPTOMETRY, MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA, CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS ASSISTANT BOARD, RAY STONE INC.. (Burkwitz, Gil)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Stanley Mosk Courthouse, case number 23STCV04785 Receipt No: ACACDC-34987344 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Stanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF GIL BURKWITZ, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1441 & 1446, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Filed Pleadings/Documents, #4 Exhibit C - Case Summary) (Attorney Gil Y Burkwitz added to party Stanford Health Care (pty:dft))(Burkwitz, Gil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diane K. Godfrey v. Regents of University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE K. GODFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Health Care
Represented By: Gil Y Burkwitz
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Represented By: Bryan Jonathan Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of University of California
Represented By: Raymond A Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Turner
Represented By: Patrick E Michela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenet California Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Turner
Represented By: Patrick E Michela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew O Smith
Represented By: Sayyora Badalbaeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNaughton Newspapers Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M Canning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Legal Defense Fund Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Times
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Company Inc.
Represented By: Jane M Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UPS Store Inc.
Represented By: Mark R McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc. doing business as Valley Eye Care Medical Associates
Represented By: John H Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Board of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Board of Pharmacy
Represented By: Claudia Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Board of Optometry
Represented By: Claudia Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Board of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians Assistant Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Stone Inc.
Represented By: Craig J. Mariam
Represented By: Michael J. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?