John Doe v. Grindr Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Grindr Inc. and Grindr LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02093
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam)
April 27, 2023 Filing 36 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff John Doe(Meropol, Hannah)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam G. Massey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe and designating Kevin M. Loew as local counsel #34 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
April 21, 2023 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam G. Massey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35180647) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loew, Kevin)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS) #30 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
April 5, 2023 Filing 32 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM #30 was prematurely set. The Court CONTINUES the motion to May 1, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel are reminded to review the Local Rules(6.1, 7.3.7.4, etc) for motions before efiling.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) filed 4/4/2023 by John Doe #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion: Order. filing attempts to set Motion to proceed under pseudonym "John Doe" and set hearing for "APRIL 24, 2023" 1:30 pm. Due to incorrect event NO Motion NOR Hearing set on Judge's Motion calendar. The cited correct event, will prompt filer for timely hearing, date and Judge. Other error(s) with document(s): Review LR 6.1 re timely hearings; Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 4, 2023 Filing 30 Notice PLAINTIFF JOHN DOES RE-NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM filed by Plaintiff John Doe. See Dkt. Nos. 1-6, 1-7, 1-8 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym)(Meropol, Hannah) Modified on 4/18/2023 (lc).
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe and designating Kevin M. Loew as local counsel #27 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
March 27, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Adam Massey on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. Awaiting Delivery of Certificate of Good Standing, plan to reapply once received. (lt)
March 27, 2023 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35028668) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loew, Kevin)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ambika Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC and designating Adam S. Sieff as local counsel #14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT ANDPROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendants Grindr Inc. and Grindr LLC's last day to respond to the Complaint is continued toApril 28, 2023. The Parties have further jointly stipulated and agreed to set a briefing schedule regarding Defendants' forthcoming Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' forthcoming Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by May 26, 2023, and that Defendants' reply shall be filed by June 16, 2023. (lc)
March 27, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Doe, (Meropol, Hannah)
March 27, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35019243) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application not an EX PARTE APPLICATION. See form caption. (lt)
March 27, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document #18 , Miscellaneous Document #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of summons and complaint returned executed 21 days. The forms efiled are the service of process made in state court prior to removal of case. The forms should have been attached to the MISSING Formal USDC title page and the LR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court and case information Other error(s) with document(s): NOTE: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 25, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin Mathew Loew on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Loew, Kevin)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35019243) #16 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected. Correct Event is: Pro hac vice.; Ex parte applications are solely for extraordinary relief and should be used with discretion. Sanctions may be imposed for misuse of ex parte applications. See Mission Power Eng'g v. Cont'l Casualty Co., 883 F. Supp. 488 (C.D. Cal. 1995). Counsels attention is directed to the to the Local Rule 7-19, et seq. (lc)
March 24, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Grindr LLC answer now due 4/28/2023; Grindr Inc. answer now due 4/28/2023, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Grindr LLC; Grindr Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule)(Sieff, Adam)
March 24, 2023 Filing 18 Proof of Service of Summons filed by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt by Grindr LLC)(Meropol, Hannah)
March 24, 2023 Filing 17 Proof of Service of Summons filed by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt by Grindr, Inc.)(Meropol, Hannah)
March 24, 2023 Filing 16 (STRICKEN PER 3/27/2023 ORDER DOCKET NO. 23). EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35019243) filed by Plaintiff John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kevin Mathew Loew added to party John Doe(pty:pla)) (Loew, Kevin) Modified on 3/27/2023 (lc).
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ambika Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34996092) #11 , for the following reasons: Stricken for the reasons stated in the Notice of Deficiencies at ECF No. 13. (lc)
March 23, 2023 Filing 14 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ambika Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/21/2023, Receipt No. 34996092) filed by Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ambika Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34996092) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. The applicant must also attach a Certificate of Good Standing (issued within the last 30 days) from every state bar to which he or she is admitted; failure to do so will be grounds for denying the application. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
March 21, 2023 Filing 11 (STRICKEN PER 3/23/2023 ORDER DOCKET NO. 15). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ambika Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34996092) filed by Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam) Modified on 3/23/2023 (lc).
March 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam Massey on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carrie Goldberg on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ambika Kumar behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 21, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC, re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on March 21, 2023. (Sieff, Adam)
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC (Sieff, Adam)
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC. (Sieff, Adam)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LASC, case number 23SMCV01084 Receipt No: ACACDC-34991661 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Grindr LLC, Grindr Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Assignment, #4 Exhibit Notice of Conference, #5 Exhibit ADR Packet, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Leave, #7 Exhibit Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Meropol ISO Motion for Leave) (Attorney Adam S. Sieff added to party Grindr Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam S. Sieff added to party Grindr LLC(pty:dft))(Sieff, Adam)
March 21, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Grindr Inc., Grindr LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff John Doe. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/10/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. Grindr Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Hannah Claire Meropol
Represented By: Adam G. Massey
Represented By: Carrie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Kevin Mathew Loew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grindr Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Sieff
Represented By: Ambika Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grindr LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Sieff
Represented By: Ambika Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?