William McDuffey et all v. American Laundry Machinery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William McDuffey and Teri McDuffey
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC, ITT, Inc., Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., American Laundry Machinery, Inc., Ecolab, Inc., FMC Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, ITT Corporation, ITT Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Viacom CBS, Inc., CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crane Co., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Allen Bradley Co., LLC, Allen Bradley Co., Inc., Rostone Corporation, SPX Flow, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., DOES 1-500 and 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv02491
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Buck, James)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Scheduling Conference is continued from June 9, 2023, to June 30, 2023, at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2023 Filing 72 Notice of Partial Resolution of Matter filed by Defendant ITT, Inc.. (Duffy, Joseph)
May 31, 2023 Filing 71 Notice NOTICE OF DEATH OF PLAINTIFF WILLIAM MCDUFFEY filed by Plaintiff Teri McDuffey, William McDuffey. (Keller, Daniel)
May 24, 2023 Filing 70 JOINT RULE 26F REPORT REPORT of JOINT RULE 26F REPORT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Teri McDuffey, William McDuffey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Keller, Daniel)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO WHITMAN CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT NAMED IN THE COMPLAINT AS SPX FLOW, INC., AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WAUKESHA PUMPS ONLY AND DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court ORDERS that the Joint Stipulation #67 is GRANTED. To the extent the Whitman Corporation has appeared, Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Whitman Corporation on behalf of the defendant named in the complaint as SPX Flow, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Waukesha Pumps only. For avoidance of doubt, SPX Flow, Inc. shall remain a party to the extent claims are alleged against it as the successor-in-interest to Johnson Pump and Waukesha Cherry-Burrell as successor-by-merger to Cherry-Burrell, but any claims based on SPX Flow, Inc.'s status as successor-in-interest to Waukesha Pumps are DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs. The Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause #66 . The Court shall not strike the 5/5/2023 Answers, unless Plaintiff objects. Any objection must be made within ten days of this Order and supported by legal authority. Unless Defendant seeks leave to file multiple separate filings for separate predecessors-in-interest, supported by legal authority allowing it to do so, any future filing on behalf of Defendant SPX Flow, Inc. as the successor-in-interest to Johnson Pump and Waukesha Cherry-Burrell as successor-by-merger to Cherry-Burrell shall be filed together, rather than separately. (gk)
May 18, 2023 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Jonathon D. Sayre, Michael J. Estrada DECLARATION OF JONATHON D. SAYRE AND MICHAEL J. ESTRADA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CANVAS SX, LLC on behalf of defendant SPX FLOW, INC. as successor in interest to JOHNSON PUMP and WAUKESHA CHERRYBURRELL as successor by merger to CHERRY-BURRELL'S RESPONSE TO OSC RE: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant SPX Flow, Inc.. (Peralta, Karen)
May 17, 2023 Filing 67 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant SPX Flow, Inc. filed by Defendant SPX Flow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Joseph)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SECOND-FILED ANSWERS SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant SPX Flow, Inc. is hereby ORDERED to show cause why its 5/5/2023 Answers #59 , #60 should not be stricken for failure to seek leave to amend its 3/30/2023 Answer. Defendant SPX Flow, Inc. is further ORDERED to outline its relationships to Whitman Corporation and Canvas SX LLC, and explain the legal basis for filing separate Answers based on separate predecessor-in-interests, particularly where Johnson Pumps, Waukesha Cherry-Burrell, and Waukesha Pumps are not individually named, but only named to the extent that SPX Flow, Inc.--a single entity--is their successor-in-interest. Defendant SPX Flow, Inc.'s response shall be due no later than 5/19/2023. If Defendant does not respond by the deadline, the 5/5/2023 Answers shall be stricken without further notice. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 11, 2023 Filing 65 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer filed 6/8/2023 #62 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (gk)
May 10, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #62 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 9, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint, #59 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document no. 59 is an Answer by Canvas SX LLC (fka SPX LLC) on behalf of defendant SPX Flow, Inc. as successor in interest to Waukesha Cherry-Burrell as successor by merger to Cherry-Burrell. Document no. 60 is an Answer filed by Canvas CT, LLC f/k/a SPX Flow Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Johnson Pump, only. Whitman Corporation filed an Answer on behalf of the defendant named in the Complaint as SPX Flow, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Waukesha Cherry-Burrell and Waukesha Pumps on 3/30/2023 in the state court prior to removal. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 8, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 with Jury Demand filed by Defendant 3M Company. [Electronically filed on 4/7/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
May 8, 2023 Filing 62 Notice Notice of Filing of State Court Answer filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kort, Jason)
May 8, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason A Kort on behalf of Defendant 3M Company (Attorney Jason A Kort added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Kort, Jason)
May 5, 2023 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant SPX Flow, Inc..(Attorney Michael Joseph Estrada added to party SPX Flow, Inc.(pty:dft))(Estrada, Michael)
May 5, 2023 Filing 59 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 DEFENDANT CANVAS SX, LLC (FKA SPX LLC)S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY filed by Defendant CANVAS SX, LLC (FKA SPX LLC) American Laundry Machinery, Inc..(Attorney Karen Amezcua Peralta added to party American Laundry Machinery, Inc.(pty:dft))(Peralta, Karen)
May 4, 2023 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Rockwell Automation, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
May 3, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Valeria Golodnitska on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Golodnitska, Valeria)
May 3, 2023 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc., (Golodnitska, Valeria)
May 3, 2023 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Attorney Valeria Golodnitska added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Golodnitska, Valeria)
May 2, 2023 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ecolab, Inc. (Baravarian, Tina)
May 1, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 filed by Defendant Ecolab, Inc. [Electronically filed on 4/3/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
May 1, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Defendant Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co. [Electronically filed on 4/13/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
May 1, 2023 Filing 53 Notice OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by Defendant Ecolab, Inc.. (Baravarian, Tina)
May 1, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Redco Corporation, identifying Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co.; Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC; Globe Indemnity; Liberty Mutual; Hartford; Aetna; Continental; INA; Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies; The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas; The Home Insurance Company; Firemans Fund Insurance Company; American Home Assurance Company; American Reinsurance Company; Aetna Casualty and Surety Company; Midland Insurance Company; Highlands Insurance Company; Granite State Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Prudential Reinsurance Company; The North River Insurance Company; AIU Insurance Company; Boston Old Colony Insurance Company; Insurance Company of North America; Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company; Employers Mutual Casualty; American Excess Insurance; Transit Casualty Company; First State Insurance Company; New England Reinsurance Corporation; Employers Insurance of Wausau; Government Employees Insurance Company; Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance; Mission Insurance Company; Dairyland Insurance Company; Century Indemnity Company; Centaur Insurance Company; Twin City Fire Insurance Company; Transamerica Insurance Company; American Centennial Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania; Pacific Insurance Company; Integrity Insurance Company. (Attorney Damon M. Pitt added to party Redco Corporation(pty:dft))(Pitt, Damon)
May 1, 2023 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Redco Corporation identifying Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC as Corporate Parent. (Pitt, Damon)
May 1, 2023 Filing 50 Notice filed by Defendant Redco Corporation. NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer to Complaint)(Pitt, Damon)
April 19, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ana T Reeg on behalf of Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company (Reeg, Ana)
April 18, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #46 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #37 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #38 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #42 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #41 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #36 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #39 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #43 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #44 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #40 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #45 , Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 17, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days, #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 14, 2023 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC served on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ROBIN HUTT-BANKS (MANAGING AGENT) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant SPX Flow, Inc. served on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares (Managing Agent) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant ITT, Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant General Electric Company served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant FMC Corporation served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Ecolab, Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems c/o Diana Ruiz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Velan Valve Corp. served on 3/8/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Rebecca Vang in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company served on 3/8/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Rebecca Vang in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Paramount Global served on 3/8/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Rebecca Vang in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC.(Powell, Glen)
April 13, 2023 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William McDuffey, Teri McDuffey, upon Defendant Redco Corporation served on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ROBIN HUTT-BANKS (MANAGING AGENT) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Keller, Daniel)
April 13, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp., identifying Velan Inc.. (Powell, Glen)
April 13, 2023 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp..(Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Velan Valve Corp.(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
April 13, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document linked incorrectly to the wrong document/docket entry. Notice of Appearance should be submitted as a separate document and not as an attachment to Answer to Complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lt)
April 12, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. [Electronically filed on 3/29/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
April 12, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and IMO Holdings, Inc. (Martinovich, Edward)
April 12, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward Martinovich counsel for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. Adding Bobbie R. Bailey, Edward Martinovich, Frederick Gatt as counsel of record for Imo Industries, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Imo Industries, Inc. (Attorney Edward Martinovich added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martinovich, Edward)
April 12, 2023 Filing 27 Notice OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Martinovich, Edward)
April 11, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 , with Jury Demand filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. (erroneously named as successor-in-interest to Joy Manufacturing Co. and Nash Engineering Co.) [Electronically filed on 3/28/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
April 11, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles William Jenkins counsel for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. Adding Charles W Jenkins as counsel of record for Gardner Denver, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Jenkins, Charles)
April 11, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc., identifying Ingersoll Rand Inc. and KKR & Co. L.P.. (Attorney Charles William Jenkins added to party Gardner Denver, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Charles)
April 11, 2023 Filing 24 Notice OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Jenkins, Charles)
April 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #16 , Notice of Appearance #18 , Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 10, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 , with Jury Demand filed by Defendant Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump business. [Electronically filed on 3/2/2012 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
April 10, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 , with Jury Demand filed by Defendant ITT LLC sued as "ITT, Inc., f/k/a ITT Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett, Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co., McDonnell & Miller, Fabri-Valve, Hoffman Specialty Manufacturing Co." [Electronically filed on 3/28/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
April 10, 2023 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 , with Jury Demand filed by Defendant Whitman Corporation on behalf of the defendant named in the Complaint as SPX Flow, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Waukesha Cherry-Burrell and Waukesha Pumps [Electronically filed on 3/30/2023 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 23LBCV00320] (gk)
April 10, 2023 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Whitman Corporation on behalf of the Defendant Named in the Complaint as SPX Flow, Inc. filed by Defendant SPX Flow, Inc. identifying Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Chaves, Marisa)
April 10, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ITT, Inc. (Chaves, Marisa)
April 10, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant SPX Flow, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa)
April 10, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant ITT, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa)
April 10, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Marisa R Chaves on behalf of Defendants ITT, Inc., SPX Flow, Inc. (Attorney Marisa R Chaves added to party ITT, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marisa R Chaves added to party SPX Flow, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chaves, Marisa)
April 10, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Jo Talarico on behalf of Defendants ITT, Inc., SPX Flow, Inc. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party SPX Flow, Inc.(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
April 10, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph Duffy on behalf of Defendants ITT, Inc., SPX Flow, Inc. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party SPX Flow, Inc.(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 10, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FMC Corporation, identifying Vanguard Group. (Buck, James)
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 Notice OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Buck, James)
April 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
April 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Michael Buck on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney James Michael Buck added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Buck, James)
April 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel L Keller on behalf of Plaintiffs Teri McDuffey, William McDuffey (Keller, Daniel)
April 7, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Notice of Appearance)(Attorney Ana T Reeg added to party Rheem Manufacturing Company(pty:dft))(Reeg, Ana)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-cv-02491 AB(ASx). (rn)
April 6, 2023 Filing 5 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vam)
April 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
April 3, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs William McDuffey and Teri McDuffey in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/21/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
April 3, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Warren Pumps, LLC (Powell, Glen)
April 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Powell, Glen)
April 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 23LBCV00320 Receipt No: ACACDC-35071364 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3-9 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Powell, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William McDuffey et all v. American Laundry Machinery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Damon M. Pitt
Represented By: Christina N. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Laundry Machinery, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Amezcua Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Stepanyan
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Tina Ladan Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Charles William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Represented By: Frederick W Gatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Damon M. Pitt
Represented By: Christina N. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Ana T Reeg
Represented By: Claire C Weglarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Bradley Co., LLC
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Bradley Co., Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rostone Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Flow, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Jonathon D Sayre
Represented By: Karen Amezcua Peralta
Represented By: Marisa R Chaves
Represented By: Michael Joseph Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jason A Kort
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Represented By: Stephanie Ghanem Peatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McDuffey
Represented By: Stephen M Fishback
Represented By: Daniel L Keller
Represented By: John Bruce Jackson
Represented By: Tenny Mirzayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri McDuffey
Represented By: Stephen M Fishback
Represented By: Daniel L Keller
Represented By: John Bruce Jackson
Represented By: Tenny Mirzayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?