Kyland Young v. NeoCortext, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kyland Young
Defendant: NeoCortext, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02496
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
2 Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Filing 46 MINUTES OF JULY 28, 2023 INFORMAL TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE settling #45 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute; Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. The Court heard from counsel on both sides. The Court explained that because the dispute concerns application of the District Judge's Initial Standing Order and potential modification of the District Judge's Scheduling Order, any request for a discovery stay should be presented to the District Judge. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 07-28-23. (hr)
July 26, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Telephone Conference set for 7/28/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (hr)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for July 21, 2023 is hereby VACATED. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the far right column labeled "Court Order" located on the parties' Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which accompanies this Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Please refer to the Court's Standing Order for Newly Assigned Civil Cases for requirements for specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to chambers, settlement, and other matters pertaining to all civil cases. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2024 03:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 6/4/2024 09:00 AM. See order for other deadlines and information. (lom) Modified on 7/17/2023 (lom).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 04/12/2024. (hc)
July 17, 2023 Filing 41 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND DISMISS [DKT. NOS. 32 & 33] TO AUGUST 25, 2023 #39 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. The Defendant's motions to dismiss and strike are hereby continued from July 28, 2023 to August 25, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. (lom)
July 11, 2023 Filing 39 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Strike and Dismiss [Dkt. Nos. 32 & 33] to August 4, 2023 (L.R. 7-1) filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 425.16 & DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (DKTS. #32 & #33 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The court on its own motion, continues the MOTIONS from 7/14/2023 to 7/28/2023 at 01:00 PM. The hearing will proceed in-person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2023 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young.. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
June 30, 2023 Filing 36 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 425.16 #32 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #33 (CONSOLIDATED REPLY) filed by Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. (Newby, Tyler)
June 23, 2023 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 425.16 #32 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #33 filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2023 at 01:00 PM. (lom)
May 31, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Newby, Tyler)
May 31, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 425.16 filed by defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Newby, Tyler)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-041) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02496 WLH(PVCx). (rn)
May 9, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicholas Antonio Santos counsel for Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. Adding Nicholas A. Santos as counsel of record for NeoCortext, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. (Attorney Nicholas Antonio Santos added to party NeoCortext, Inc.(pty:dft))(Santos, Nicholas)
May 8, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary Mornay Griffin counsel for Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. Adding Mary M. Griffin as counsel of record for NeoCortext, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. (Attorney Mary Mornay Griffin added to party NeoCortext, Inc.(pty:dft))(Griffin, Mary)
May 5, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn J Fritz counsel for Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. Adding Kathryn J. Fritz as counsel of record for NeoCortext, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. (Attorney Kathryn J Fritz added to party NeoCortext, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fritz, Kathryn)
May 4, 2023 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant NeoCortext, Inc. (Newby, Tyler)
April 27, 2023 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Philip L. Fraietta re Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/12/2023, Receipt No. 35128122) #20 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Fraietta, Philip)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer APPROVING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By 30 Days (L.R. 7-1) #24 by 5/31/2023. (jp)
April 24, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to NeoCortext, Inc. answer now due 5/31/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant NeoCortext, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Tyler Griffin Newby added to party NeoCortext, Inc.(pty:dft))(Newby, Tyler)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney Philip L Fraietta APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young, designating Thiago M Coelho as local counsel. (jp)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING #19 Non-Resident Attorney Michael W Ovca APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young, designating Thiago M Coelho as local counsel. (jp)
April 19, 2023 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kyland Young, upon Defendant NeoCortext, Inc. served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane H. Gibbs, US Corp Agents Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
April 14, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/12/2023, Receipt No. 35128122) filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip L. Fraietta in support of Application of Non-Resident to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order re Application Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Coelho, Thiago)
April 14, 2023 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael W. Ovca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/12/2023, Receipt No. 35128122) filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Application Michael W. Ovca to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Coelho, Thiago)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael W. Ovca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35128122) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35128222) #16 . (jp)
April 13, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael W. Ovca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35128122) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35128222) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
April 12, 2023 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 4/14/2023, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #18 ] - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35128222) filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip L. Fraietta in support of Application of Non-Resident to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order re Application Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Coelho, Thiago). Modified on 4/14/2023 (jp).
April 12, 2023 Filing 15 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 4/14/2023, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #18 ] - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael W. Ovca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35128122) filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Application Michael Ovca to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Coelho, Thiago). Modified on 4/14/2023 (jp).
April 12, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho counsel for Plaintiff Kyland Young. Adding Thiago M. Coelho as counsel of record for Kyland Young for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Kyland Young(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago)
April 12, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott on behalf of Plaintiff Kyland Young. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Ovca. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
April 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
April 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Philip L Fraietta. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
April 5, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant NeoCortext, Inc. (car)
April 5, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
April 3, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
April 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young, (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
April 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Bogdanovich, Stefan)
April 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35072410 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kyland Young. (Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich added to party Kyland Young(pty:pla))(Bogdanovich, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyland Young v. NeoCortext, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyland Young
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Represented By: Thiago Merlini Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NeoCortext, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Mary Mornay Griffin
Represented By: Nicholas Antonio Santos
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?