Demetrious Polychron v. Jeff Bezos et al
Plaintiff: Demetrious Polychron
Defendant: Jeff Bezos, Jennifer Salke, Simon Tolkien, Patrick McKay, John D Payne, Amazon Studios LLC, Amazon Content Services LLC, The Tolkien Estate, The Tolkien Estate Limited, The Tolkien Trust and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 2:2023cv02831
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Summons Request #13 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
May 5, 2023 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. upon The Tolkien Estate Limited waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; The Tolkien Trust waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; Simon Tolkien waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Lacy H. Koonce, III. (Charleston, Katie)
May 5, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. upon Amazon Content Services LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; Amazon Studios LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; Jeff Bezos waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; Patrick McKay waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; John D Payne waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023; Jennifer Salke waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Nicolas A. Jampol. (Charleston, Katie)
April 25, 2023 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Amazon Content Services LLC, Amazon Studios LLC, Jeff Bezos, Patrick McKay, John D Payne, Jennifer Salke, The Tolkien Estate, The Tolkien Estate Limited, The Tolkien Trust and Simon Tolkien. (Attachments: #1 AmazonStudios, #2 JBesos, #3 PMcKay, #4 JPayne, #5 JSalke, #6 TolkienEst, #7 TolkienEstLtd, #8 TolkienTrust, #9 STolkien) (jtil)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 20 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
April 17, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 17, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
April 17, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Request (AO 88), Summons Request #9 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 14, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katie Marie Charleston on behalf of Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Charleston, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35143645 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Demetrious Polychron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- TFOTK Copyright 11-21-2017, #2 Exhibit B- Rings Of Power Copyright Infringements) (Attorney Katie Marie Charleston added to party Demetrious Polychron(pty:pla))(Charleston, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demetrious Polychron v. Jeff Bezos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrious Polychron
Represented By: Katie Marie Charleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Salke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Tolkien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Content Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tolkien Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tolkien Estate Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tolkien Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?