Sangshin Lee v. DoNotPay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sangshin Lee
Defendant: DoNotPay, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02968
Filed: April 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. Dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF SANGSHIN LEE AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PUTATIVE CLASS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Sodaify, Bahar)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit his claims to arbitration as provided by his agreement. Accordingly, the Court STAYS this action pending completion of the arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report every 90 days apprising the Court of the status of the arbitration proceedings, with the first report due on October 23, 2023. (iv)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eli Richlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant DoNotPay, Inc., designating Sophia Mancall-Bitel as local counsel #18 . (iv)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Paul Gross to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant DoNotPay, Inc., designating Sophia Mancall-Bitel as local counsel #17 . (iv)
July 18, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Position as to Waiver Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-15 filed by Defendant DoNotPay, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eli B. Richlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant DoNotPay, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35685365) filed by Defendant DoNotPay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mancall-Bitel, Sophia)
July 17, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul C. Gross to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant DoNotPay, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-35682742) filed by defendant DoNotPay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mancall-Bitel, Sophia)
July 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sophia Mancall-Bitel on behalf of Defendant DoNotPay, Inc. (Attorney Sophia Mancall-Bitel added to party DoNotPay, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mancall-Bitel, Sophia)
July 10, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 filed by Defendant DoNotPay, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
July 3, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 [REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION] filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)(Sodaify, Bahar)
July 3, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF SANGSHIN LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, #2 Declaration OF BAHAR SODAIFY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sodaify, Bahar)
June 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DoNotPay, Inc., identifying Sangshin Lee and DoNotPay, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
June 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant DoNotPay, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Kim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Bish, Dale)
June 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dale Richard Bish on behalf of Defendant DoNotPay, Inc. (Attorney Dale Richard Bish added to party DoNotPay, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bish, Dale)
April 26, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. upon DoNotPay, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Paul C. Gross. (Sodaify, Bahar)
April 20, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant DoNotPay, Inc.. (sh)
April 20, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
April 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
April 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
April 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee, (Sodaify, Bahar)
April 19, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. (Sodaify, Bahar)
April 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. (Sodaify, Bahar)
April 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35168081 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sangshin Lee. (Attachments: #1 Appendix [ONLINE CUSTOMER REVIEWS OF DEFENDANTS SERVICES], #2 Declaration OF BAHAR SODAIFY REGARDING VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1780(d)) (Attorney Bahar Sodaify added to party Sangshin Lee(pty:pla))(Sodaify, Bahar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sangshin Lee v. DoNotPay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sangshin Lee
Represented By: Bahar Sodaify
Represented By: Alan Gudino
Represented By: Ryan Ardi
Represented By: Ryan J Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DoNotPay, Inc.
Represented By: Dale Richard Bish
Represented By: Sophia Mancall-Bitel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?