Kristen Pearson et al v. LoanCare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Pearson and Steven Collins
Defendant: LoanCare LLC, Trustee Corps, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Catamount Properties 2018 LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv03882
Filed: May 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Representation by Judge Dale S. Fischer, the Estate will be dismissed without prejudice unless a member of the California Bar appears on its behalf no later than 6/15/2023. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Application for Temporary Protective Order (Dkt. #8 ), DENYING Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt #9 ), and GRANTING in part Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice (Dkt. #15 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 30, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #9 Catamount Properties Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Catamount Properties 2018 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Turner, Meghan)
May 30, 2023 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #9 Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Catamount Properties 2018 LLC. (Attorney Meghan E. Turner added to party Catamount Properties 2018 LLC(pty:dft))(Turner, Meghan)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (docket nos. #8 and #9 ) currently set for June 1, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. will proceed by ZOOM Webinar. Instructions are available on the Court's website under "Judges' Requirements." THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischers Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer for Proof of Notice and Setting Hearing Date for Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs are ordered to file, by 12:00 p.m. Wednesday, 5/24/2023, proof of providing Defendants with notice of the lawsuit. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 22, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
May 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
May 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh)
May 19, 2023 Filing 11 DECLARATION of KRISTEN PEARSON in support of Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #9 filed by Plaintiffs Steven Collins, Kristen Pearson, Kristen Pearson. (jp)
May 19, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #9 filed by Defendants Catamount Properties 2018 LLC, LoanCare LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Trustee Corps. (jp)
May 19, 2023 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiffs Steven Collins, Kristen Pearson. (jp) (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (jp).
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Temporary Protective Order filed by plaintiffs Steven Collins, Kristen Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order. ) (jp)
May 19, 2023 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Catamount Properties 2018 LLC, LoanCare LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Trustee Corps. (sh)
May 18, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Steven Collins, Kristen Pearson. (sh)
May 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Catamount Properties 2018 LLC, Does, LoanCare LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Trustee Corps.Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Steven Collins, Kristen Pearson(as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Pearson), Kristen Pearson(an individual). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristen Pearson et al v. LoanCare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamount Properties 2018 LLC
Represented By: Meghan E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?