Angel Men Chan v. Panera, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Angel Men Chan
Defendant: Panera, LLC, Beverly Nguyen and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv04194
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua Shirian counsel for Plaintiff Angel Men Chan. Adding Brian Zaghi as counsel of record for Angel Men Chan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Joshua Shirian. (Shirian, Joshua)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: (1) Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court (Doc. #11 ); and (2) CONTINUING Scheduling Conference by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendant is ordered to file its Opposition within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, and any Reply shall be filed within seven (7) days. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/21/2023, at 10:30 AM., is CONTINUED to 8/18/2023 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-15 days, filed by Plaintiff Angel Men Chan.. (Shirian, Joshua)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney Angel Men Chan, identifying Joshua Shirian. (Shirian, Joshua)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Attorney Angel Men Chan. Motion set for hearing on 9/29/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JOSHUA SHIRIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ANGEL MEN CHANS MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT, #3 Memorandum PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE PROFFERED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Shirian, Joshua)
June 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Panera, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 served on 05/31/2023. (Kang, Judy)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Beverly Nguyen, Panera, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Angel Men Chan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/21/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Panera, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Panera, LLC filed by Defendant Panera, LLC identifying Panera Bread Company as Corporate Parent. (Reese, Kevin)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Panera, LLC, identifying Angel Men Chan, Panera, LLC, Beverly Nguyen. (Reese, Kevin)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Panera, LLC. (Reese, Kevin)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 23STCV09024 Receipt No: ACACDC-35402792 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Panera, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barb Muellerleile in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal Regarding LLC, #2 Declaration of Barb Muellerleile in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal Regarding Damages) (Attorney Kevin Durrell Reese added to party Panera, LLC(pty:dft))(Reese, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel Men Chan v. Panera, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Men Chan
Represented By: Joshua Shirian
Represented By: Brian Zaghi
Represented By: David D Bibiyan
Represented By: Jeffrey D Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Durrell Reese
Represented By: Judy Kang
Represented By: Karen W Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?