Dyson, Inc. v. Kuehne Nagel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dyson, Inc.
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel, Inc. doing business as Blue Anchor America Line, a corporation, Doe and Kuehne Nagel, Inc. a corporation doing business as Blue Anchor America Line
Case Number: 2:2023cv04516
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of New York, 1:23-cv-06818 filed 8/3/2023. (rolm)
August 2, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #12 Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause (Kirsch, Joshua)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO TRANSFER ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Plaintiff's Request pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) and/or Section 1404(a) #13 , the Court ORDERS the immediate transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Case transferred electronically. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (gk)
July 27, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST to Transfer Case to United States District Court for Southern District of New York filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kirsch, Joshua)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 8/2/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This matter will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
June 27, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc., upon Defendant Kuehne Nagel, Inc. served on 6/21/2023, answer due 7/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Vang- CSC (Agent of Service) in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 12, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kuehne Nagel, Inc. (et)
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
June 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 12, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc. identifying Dyson, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 8, 2023 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc., identifying W.K. Webster & Co., Ltd.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35459968 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Dyson, Inc.. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Dyson, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyson, Inc. v. Kuehne Nagel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyson, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Represented By: Peter Riley Witherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel, Inc. doing business as Blue Anchor America Line, a corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne Nagel, Inc. a corporation doing business as Blue Anchor America Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?