Chanh Trinh et al v. Brian Birkholz et al
Plaintiff: Chanh V. Trinh, Brian E. Sawyers, Dennis McPherson, Robert Wann, Derrick A. Givens, Raynard Davis, Michael D. Miller, Abraham Castro, Robert Scully and Robert E. Wallace
Defendant: Brian Birkholz, Bureau of Prisons, Law Office of Manatt, Phelps, and Phillips, LLP, Law Office Bird, Marella, PC and ACLU Foundation Southern California
Case Number: 2:2023cv04521
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
2 Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
3 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Filing 18 Mail Returned addressed to Dennis McPherson Reg. No. 50223 048 re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form #14 . (et)
July 24, 2023 Filing 17 Mail Returned addressed to Dennis McPherson Reg. No. 50223 048 re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support #12 . (et)
July 24, 2023 Filing 16 Mail Returned addressed to Dennis McPherson Reg. No. 50223 048 re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form #13 . (et)
July 11, 2023 Filing 15 Mail Returned addressed to Brian E. Sawyers re Financial Entry 7 (hr)
July 7, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #13 , MEMO: Request to be Added to All Future Correspondence #12 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The document is stricken. (hr)
July 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: MEMO: Request to be Added to All Future Correspondence #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: L.R. 11-3 Document presented to the Court - improper form and format. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
June 30, 2023 Filing 11 Mail Returned addressed to Dennis McPherson Reg. No. 50223 048 re Transferring Case purs GO 23-05 (Related Case)(CV-34) #6 . (et)
June 26, 2023 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Brian E. Sawyers Reg. No. 130434 047 re Transferring Case purs GO 23-05 (Related Case)(CV-34) #6 . (et)
June 26, 2023 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Derrick A. Givens re Transferring Case pursuant G.O. 23-05 (Related Case)(CV-34) #6 (hr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 8 Mail Returned addressed to Brian E. Sawyers re Transferring Case pursuant G.O. 23-05 (Related Case)(CV-34) #6 (hr)
June 23, 2023 Filing 7 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $402.00 from Chanh Trinh. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93),, #2 . Receipt number 4112. (fa)
June 22, 2023 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #14 *** MEMO: Request to be Added to All Future Correspondence, filed by Non-Party Scott Allensworth (hr) Modified on 7/10/2023 (hr).
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04450 CBM(PVCx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-04521 CBM(MRW). Signed by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall (rn)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment General Order 05-07 pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-04521 MWF(MRW). (rn)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-04521 MWF(MAA). (rn)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. (jtil)
June 8, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Robert Wann, Brian E. Sawyers, Robert E. Wallace, Derrick A. Givens, Michael D. Miller, Abraham Castro, Chanh V. Trinh, Raynard Davis, Dennis McPherson, Robert Scully against Defendants ACLU Foundation Southern California, Brian Birkholz, Bureau of Prisons, Law Office Bird, Marella, PC, Law Office of Manatt, Phelps, and Phillips, LLP, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanh Trinh et al v. Brian Birkholz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanh V. Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian E. Sawyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick A. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynard Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Manatt, Phelps, and Phillips, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office Bird, Marella, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACLU Foundation Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?