Deidra Bonner v. The Walman Optical Company et al
Plaintiff: Deidra Bonner
Defendant: The Walman Optical Company Incorrectly Named as X-Cel Specialty Contacts, Inc., a Foreign Corporation doing business as X-Cel Specialty Contracts and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2023cv04710
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Deidra Bonner to Scheduling Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Hearing, #16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Engelhardt, Max)
July 31, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Not Held)/STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge R. Gary KlausnerThe Court sets an Order to Show Cause Hearing for 8/14/2023 at 09:00 AM., to determine why the complaint should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff's written response is due on or before 8/7/2023. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 8/14/2023 at 09:00 AM. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (jp)
July 24, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule for Case Deadlines, #2 Exhibit ADR Form 1)(Russell, Andrew)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney Byron N Miller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Walman Optical Company, designating Andrew S Russell as local counsel. (jp)
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Byron N. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Walman Optical Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35663483) filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Russell, Andrew)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS ORDER) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Order to Show Cause #10 issued on 6/27/2023 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 30, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Companyto Order to Show Cause, #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Russell, Andrew)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Jurisdiction by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court hereby orders Defendant to show cause in writing why this action should not be remanded to state court. An adequate response must include facts that establish by a preponderance of the evidence that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Defendant's response is limited to 5 pages in length, and due no later than 7/3/2023. (jp)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/24/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-CV-04710 RGK(MAAx). (rn)
June 15, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
June 15, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Company (d/b/a X-Cel Specialty Contacts) identifying Essilor of America, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Russell, Andrew)
June 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Company (d/b/a X-Cel Specialty Contacts). (Russell, Andrew)
June 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for State of California County of Los Angeles, case number 23AHCV01047 Receipt No: ACACDC-35498501 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Company (d/b/a X-Cel Specialty Contacts). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Memorandum) (Attorney Andrew Smith Russell added to party The Walman Optical Company (d/b/a X-Cel Specialty Contacts)(pty:dft))(Russell, Andrew)
June 15, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant The Walman Optical Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/14/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
June 15, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, The Walman Optical Company, filed by Plaintiff Deidra Bonner. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/9/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deidra Bonner v. The Walman Optical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra Bonner
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walman Optical Company Incorrectly Named as X-Cel Specialty Contacts, Inc., a Foreign Corporation doing business as X-Cel Specialty Contracts
Represented By: Andrew Smith Russell
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?