Luz E. Atencio v. Bird Rides Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luz Atencio and Luz E. Atencio
Defendant: Bird Rides, Inc., Segway Inc., Ninebot, Inc., Bird Rides Inc., Ninebot Inc. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2023cv04787
Filed: June 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING #27 Non-Resident Attorney Yongmoon Kim APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio, designating Alik Ekmekchyan as local counsel. (jp)
August 9, 2023 Filing 27 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yongmoon Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35824090) filed by Plaintiff, LUZ E. ATENCIO Luz E. Atencio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Application Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 2023.06.30.CertificateOfGoodStanding(PA), #3 Exhibit 2023.06.28.CertificateOfGoodStanding(NY), #4 Exhibit 2023.07.11.CertificateOfGoodStanding(NJ)) (Ekmekchyan, Alik)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Ninebot, Inc. and Segway, Inc. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/14/2023. (jre)
August 8, 2023 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio, upon Defendant Bird Rides Inc. served on 7/20/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent, CT Corp in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Borison, Scott)
August 8, 2023 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio, upon Defendant Segway Inc. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Resident Agent CT Corp in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Borison, Scott)
August 8, 2023 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Luz E. Atencio, upon Defendant Ninebot Inc. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robin Hutt-Banks, Business Filings Incorporated in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Borison, Scott)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court has reviewed the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint #21 filed on 8/8/2023. No later than 8/9/2023, Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall immediately file proof/s of service of the summons and complaint (including notices of acknowledgment and/or waivers of service) which form the basis of the stipulated extension. Proof of service must generally be filed within 5 days of service. See Standing Order #12 . Failure to file the proofs of service may result in the striking of the stipulation as having no grounds. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 8, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bird Rides Inc. answer now due 9/8/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Bird Rides Inc..(Attorney Sarah G. Odegaard added to party Bird Rides Inc.(pty:dft))(Odegaard, Sarah)
August 2, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alik A Ekmekchyan counsel for Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio. Filed by Plaintiff LUZ E. ATENCIO. (Attorney Alik A Ekmekchyan added to party Luz E. Atencio(pty:pla))(Ekmekchyan, Alik)
July 13, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Yongmoon Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am currently awaiting my Certificates of Good Standing. (lt)
July 5, 2023 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bird Rides Inc. (jp)
July 5, 2023 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Segway Inc. (jp)
July 5, 2023 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ninebot Inc. (jp)
July 3, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
July 3, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
July 3, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luz E. Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Yongmoon Kim. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
June 20, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
June 16, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luz Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
June 16, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luz Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luz Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying none. (Borison, Scott)
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luz Atencio. (Borison, Scott)
June 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35512781 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Luz Atencio. (Attorney Scott C Borison added to party Luz Atencio(pty:pla))(Borison, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luz E. Atencio v. Bird Rides Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Atencio
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz E. Atencio
Represented By: Yongmoon Kim
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Represented By: Alik A Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Rides, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninebot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Rides Inc.
Represented By: Sarah G. Odegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninebot Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?