Skechers U.S.A., Inc. et al v. Steven Madden, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Skechers U.S.A., Inc. and Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II
Defendant: Steven Madden, LTD. and Steven Madden Retail, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv04869
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on August 10, 2023. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 30 days. The Court sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for September 18, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on September 14, 2023. (aco)
August 10, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Request to Stay all Deadlines filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.. (Brookey, Brian)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Brian A Comack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steven Madden, LTD. and Steven Madden Retail, Inc., designating Brian K Brookey as local counsel. (bm)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A Miro APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden, LTD. and Steven Madden Retail, designating Brian K Brookey as local counsel. (bm)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Olivia A Harris APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Madden, LTD. and Steven Madden Retail, Inc., designating Brian K Brookey as local counsel. (bm)
July 3, 2023 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian A. Comack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35599624) filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.. (Brookey, Brian)
July 3, 2023 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A. Miro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 6/30/2023, Receipt No. BCACDC-35589046) filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.. (Brookey, Brian)
July 3, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Olivia A. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 6/30/2023, Receipt No. BCACDC-35589042) filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.. (Brookey, Brian)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER IN RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A. Miro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35589046) #17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Olivia A. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-35589042) #16 by Judge George H. Wu. Docket Numbers 16 and 17 are stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notices #18 #19 filed on June 30, 2023. Pursuant to L.R. 5-4.4.2, email the proposed order in either Word or WordPerfect to Judge Wu's email address at GW_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Forms can be found in the court's website. Failure to do so will result in your application being stricken for failure to comply with the Court's Local Rules.. (rolm)
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A. Miro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35589046) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Email was not listed under section I. (lt)
June 30, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Olivia A. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-35589042) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
June 30, 2023 Filing 17 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 6/30/23 SEE DOCKET NO. 20] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A. Miro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35589046) filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.. (Brookey, Brian) Modified on 6/30/2023 (rolm).
June 30, 2023 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 6/30/23 SEE DOCKET NO. 20] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Olivia A. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-35589042) filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.. (Brookey, Brian) Modified on 6/30/2023 (rolm).
June 30, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Steven Madden Retail, Inc. answer now due 8/13/2023; Steven Madden, LTD. answer now due 8/13/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Steven Madden Retail, Inc. ; Steven Madden, LTD..(Attorney Brian K. Brookey added to party Steven Madden Retail, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Brian K. Brookey added to party Steven Madden, LTD.(pty:dft))(Brookey, Brian)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
June 22, 2023 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Steven Madden Retail, Inc. (lh)
June 22, 2023 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Steven Madden, LTD. (lh)
June 22, 2023 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley Michael Berg counsel for Plaintiffs Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. Adding Bradley M. Berg as counsel of record for SKECHERS U.S.A., INC. SKECHERS U.S.A., INC. II for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff SKECHERS U.S.A, INC. SKECHERS U.S.A., INC. II. (Attorney Bradley Michael Berg added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Michael Berg added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II(pty:pla))(Berg, Bradley)
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey A Barker counsel for Plaintiffs Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. Adding Jeffrey A. Barker as counsel of record for Skechers U.S.A., Inc. and Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Skechers U.S.A., Inc. and Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. (Attorney Jeffrey A Barker added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey A Barker added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II(pty:pla))(Barker, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 filed by Plaintiff Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 filed by Plaintiff Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 20, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II, (Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 20, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35522401 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Skechers U.S.A., Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U) (Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II(pty:pla))(Petrocelli, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skechers U.S.A., Inc. et al v. Steven Madden, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skechers U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Barker
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Bradley Michael Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II
Represented By: Bradley Michael Berg
Represented By: Jeffrey A Barker
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Madden, LTD.
Represented By: Brian A. Comack
Represented By: Douglas A. Miro
Represented By: Olivia A. Harris
Represented By: Brian K. Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Madden Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Comack
Represented By: Douglas A. Miro
Represented By: Olivia A. Harris
Represented By: Brian K. Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?