John Tapang v. Jervis B. Webb Company et al
Plaintiff: John Tapang
Defendant: Jervis B. Webb Company, Spirit Airlines, Inc. and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv05564
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2023 Filing 22 Receipt of Acknowledgment of the documents received by Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case no. 22STCV02721. (lom)
August 10, 2023 Filing 21 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (lom)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT #15 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. By Stipulation #15 and order of the Court, the case of Tapang v Jervis B. Webb Company, et al shall be remanded forthwith to the State Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lom)
August 4, 2023 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10, filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Worksheet)(DeWarr, Jacqueline)
August 2, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LODGING filed in Response to the Court's Order of August 2, 2023 re Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 17 (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document re: Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court)(Sayre, Federico)
August 2, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE OF FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: In accordance with the Notice of Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents, regarding Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #15 , counsel are ordered to file a Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by 8/3/2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 1, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
August 1, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by plaintiffs John Tapang.(Sayre, Federico)
August 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Garth W. Aubert in place of attorney Joshua W. Praw #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): See court's website for [Prop] Order form. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 31, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Garth W. Aubert in place of attorney Joshua W. Praw filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company. (Attorney Garth Wolfe Aubert added to party Jervis B. Webb Company(pty:dft)) (Aubert, Garth)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE RE MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court, on its own motion, sets a Hearing for Plaintiffs Motion for August 25, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. The hearing will proceed in-person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. Counsel are directed to refer to the Motion Calendar under this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court. Any future motion will be stricken for failing to set it on a date the Court is hearing motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff John Tapang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Sayre, Federico)
July 13, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 7/11/2023. (Cutler, Michael)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Scheduling Conference set for Agust 18, 2023 at 01:00 PM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
July 11, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JERVIS B. WEBB COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Jervis B. Webb Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/29/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT E AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
July 11, 2023 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. #1 filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 .(et)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
July 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc., identifying Interested Party: Various underwriters in the international aviation insurance market. (Cutler, Michael)
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc. identifying no parent corporation as Corporate Parent. (Cutler, Michael)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Cutler, Michael)
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV02721 Receipt No: ACACDC-35649086 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - 2nd Amended Compl, #3 Exhibit C - Amendment to Compl, #4 Exhibit D - Spirit's Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Jervis B. Webb's Answer) (Attorney Michael Cutler added to party Spirit Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cutler, Michael)
July 11, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, Jervis B. Webb Company, Spirit Lines, Inc. amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff John Tapang. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/2/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
July 11, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT amending Amended Complaint the plaintiff, having designated a defendant in the complaint by the incorrect name of SPRING LINES, INC. and having discoverd the true name of the defendant to be SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC., filed by Plaintiff John Tapang. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/31/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Tapang v. Jervis B. Webb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tapang
Represented By: Federico Castelan Sayre
Represented By: Christopher Bates Adamson
Represented By: Alan A Ahdoot
Represented By: Haleh Shekarchian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jervis B. Webb Company
Represented By: Garth Wolfe Aubert
Represented By: Matthew Eric Voss
Represented By: Guy R Gruppie
Represented By: Mary Kay Glaspy
Represented By: Paul R Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Represented By: Jacqueline D DeWarr
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?