Big Washington LLC v. Matthew Hintze et al
Plaintiff: Big Washington LLC
Defendant: Matthew Hintze, Iron Rock Ventures, LLC, Day To Day Imports, Inc a California Corporation doing business as Covershield, Virgin Scent Inc., Yehuda Nourollah, Akiva Nourollah, Yosef Nourollah, Yaakov Nourollah, Superdudes LLC and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2023cv06099
Filed: July 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Day To Day Imports, Inc. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Yaakov Nourollah. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Akiva Nourollah. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Yehuda Nourollah. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Virgin Scent Inc. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Superdudes LLC. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Iron Rock Ventures, LLC. (jp)
August 3, 2023 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Matthew Hintze. (jp)
August 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC, (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 15 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Jacobs, Richard)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
July 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-35750988 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Big Washington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Richard B Jacobs added to party Big Washington LLC(pty:pla))(Jacobs, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Washington LLC v. Matthew Hintze et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Washington LLC
Represented By: Richard B Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hintze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Rock Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day To Day Imports, Inc a California Corporation doing business as Covershield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Scent Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yehuda Nourollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akiva Nourollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yosef Nourollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaakov Nourollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superdudes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?