Valerie Montgomery v. Assembled Products Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Montgomery
Defendant: Walmart, Inc., Assembled Products Corporation doing business as Mart Cart, Walmart Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv06309
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 21 REFUND OF $49.00 made payable on 09/15/2023 to Cindy Siojo Mejia for payment made on 08/03/2023 Re: Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid (G-124) #20 . (rdj)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #8 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees (G-124). (dml)
August 23, 2023 Filing 19 Notice JOINING IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION filed by Defendant Assembled Products Corporation. (Warren, Linwood)
August 23, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Assembled Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES)(Attorney Linwood Warren, Jr added to party Assembled Products Corporation(pty:dft))(Warren, Linwood)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for October 23, 2023 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
August 18, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Demetrios Papanikolas counsel for Plaintiff Valerie Montgomery. Jubin J. Niamehr is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Valerie Montgomery. (Papanikolas, Demetrios)
August 17, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(McDonald, Christopher)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 17, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant-Walmart Inc. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Answer by the defendant(s). Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 16, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant-KFC. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence.Answer by the defendant(s). Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
August 9, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 8, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Korte Teiman counsel for Plaintiff Valerie Montgomery. Paul Dagostino is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael K. Teiman. (Teiman, Michael)
August 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Korte Teiman on behalf of Plaintiff Valerie Montgomery (Attorney Michael Korte Teiman added to party Valerie Montgomery(pty:pla))(Teiman, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Courts Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Courts Website and Judges procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
August 4, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Application set for hearing on 8/7/2023 at 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (McDonald, Christopher)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Notice of Receivership (28 USC 754) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): A claim initiating document was filed using an incorrect initiating event in CM/ECF. As a result, the case was not properly classified in the CM/ECF system. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
August 4, 2023 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-35796267 for $402 filing fee. (McDonald, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Assembled Products Corporation, Does, Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Valerie Montgomery. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/30/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., identifying Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed as NOTICE OF RECEIVERSHIP (Pursuant to 28 USC 754) Receipt No: ACACDC-35791495 - Fee: $49, filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher M McDonald added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(McDonald, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerie Montgomery v. Assembled Products Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Montgomery
Represented By: Demetrios Papanikolas
Represented By: Brian D Chase
Represented By: Genevieve Bourret-Roy
Represented By: Jubin Niamehr
Represented By: Paul Anthony Dagostino
Represented By: Michael Korte Teiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assembled Products Corporation doing business as Mart Cart
Represented By: Linwood Warren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Brown
Represented By: Christopher M McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?