Josephine Tehrani v. Amazon Studios LLC et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Tehrani
Defendant: Amazon Studios LLC and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv06385
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING COMPLETION OF PRIVATE MEDIATION #9 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Stipulation is APPROVED as follows: 1. This Action shall be stayed until after the completion of the Parties mediation; 2. Defendants time to file a Motion to Dismiss, answer, or other response, is tolled until thirty (30) days after the date of the Parties mediation; 3. Plaintiffs time to file a Motion to Remand is tolled until thirty (30) days after the date of the Parties mediation; 4. If the mediation is cancelled, the stay shall automatically be lifted on the date of cancellation without further order from the Court. Defendant shall have thirty (30) days after this cancellation date to file its Motion to Dismiss, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days after this cancellation date to file her Motion to Remand. 5. The Parties shall file a joint report advising the Court of the status of the mediation and the stay no later than October 13, 2023. 6. The Parties shall file a Joint Post-Mediation Report with this Court within seven (7) calendar days after the conclusion of mediation apprising the Court of the results of mediation and, if necessary, the Parties deadline to file a motion, answer, or other response.IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Private Mediation filed by Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Stay the Case Pending Completion of Private Mediation)(Franz, Stephen)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (See Order for details). (ys)
August 10, 2023 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon Studios LLC answer now due 9/8/2023, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Amazon Studios LLC.(Franz, Stephen)
August 9, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
August 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
August 7, 2023 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon Studios LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on August 7, 2023. (Franz, Stephen)
August 4, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Josephine Tehrani. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/3/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
August 4, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Josephine Tehrani. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/7/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
August 4, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Josephine Tehrani, upon Defendant Amazon Studios LLC served on 7/7/2023, answer due 7/28/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, c/o Nicole Stauss-Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. [FILED IN STATE COURT 7/14/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT E AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon Studios LLC, identifying Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Studios, LLC and Josephine Tehrani. (Franz, Stephen)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. (Franz, Stephen)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV09947 Receipt No: BCACDC-35801852 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Declaration of Stephen Franz, #8 Declaration of Kaspar-Williams, #9 Exhibit A to Kaspar-Williams Declaration, #10 Exhibit B to Kaspar-Williams Declaration, #11 Exhibit C to Kaspar-Williams Declaration) (Attorney Stephen Charles Franz added to party Amazon Studios LLC(pty:dft))(Franz, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josephine Tehrani v. Amazon Studios LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Tehrani
Represented By: Frank Hyung-Jin Kim
Represented By: Helen U Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios LLC
Represented By: Stephen Charles Franz
Represented By: Camilo Echavarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?