Garnik Hovhannisyan v. Estate of Colton Wexler et al
Plaintiff: GARNIK HOVHANNISYAN
Defendant: Estate of Colton Wexler, Beth Wexler, Michael Wexler, Does and Does 4 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv06654
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Arevalo, Michelle)
October 23, 2023 Filing 21 OPPOSITION re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Arevalo, Michelle)
October 19, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of address by Eric Arevalo attorney for Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler. Changing attorneys address to 30 Corporate Park, Suite 100, Irvine, CA 92606. Filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler. (Arevalo, Eric)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Due to the filing of a Notice of Dismissal by the Plaintiff #15 , the Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Beth Wexler #10 and the Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Michael Wexler #12 scheduled for October 16, 2023 at 10:00 AM are deemed moot and taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 6, 2023 Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The 10/16/2023 hearing on the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 #12 at 10:00 AM will be heard by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Garnik Hovhannisyan. Motion set for hearing on 11/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Vahe Abrahamian in support of Remand, #2 Proposed Order granting Remand to State Court) (Abrahamian, David)
September 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Garnik Hovhannisyan pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Michael Wexler and Beth Wexler as to Michael Wexler. (Abrahamian, David)
August 23, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 23, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Michael Wexler. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle L. Arevalo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Michael Wexler) (Attorney Michelle Lynn Arevalo added to party Michael Wexler(pty:dft)) (Arevalo, Michelle)
August 21, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Defendant Beth Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arevalo, Michelle)
August 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Beth Wexler. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle Arevalo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Beth Wexler) (Attorney Michelle Lynn Arevalo added to party Beth Wexler(pty:dft)) (Arevalo, Michelle)
August 21, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler.(Arevalo, Michelle)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Order to All Counsel filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arevalo, Michelle)
August 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
August 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 16, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
August 14, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 50, inclusive, Estate of Colton Wexler, Beth Wexler, Michael Wexler. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Garnik Hovhannisyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/28/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
August 14, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOES 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Estate of Colton Wexler., filed by plaintiff Garnik Hovhannisyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/21/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
August 14, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOES 2 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Beth Wexler., filed by plaintiff Garnik Hovhannisyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/20/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
August 14, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOES 3 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Michael Wexler., filed by plaintiff Garnik Hovhannisyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler, (Arevalo, Eric)
August 14, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV33023 Receipt No: ACACDC-35854123 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Estate of Colton Wexler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Eric Arevalo added to party Estate of Colton Wexler(pty:dft))(Arevalo, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garnik Hovhannisyan v. Estate of Colton Wexler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARNIK HOVHANNISYAN
Represented By: David Abrahamian
Represented By: Minas Nordanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Colton Wexler
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Wexler
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Arevalo
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wexler
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?