Ocean S. et al v. Los Angeles County et al
Plaintiff: Ocean S., Jackson K., Rosie S., Erykah B., Junior R., Onyx G. and Monaie T.
Defendant: Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Director Brandon Nichols, LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH, Lisa Wong, California Department of Health Care Services, Mark Ghaly, California Department of Social Services, Kim Johnson, Michelle Baass and Brandon Nichols
Case Number: 2:2023cv06921
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Onyx G. in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Craig Schultz as Guardian ad Litem for O.G. #25 filed by Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S., Monaie T.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Schultz ISO Plaintiff Onyx G.'s Unopposed Motion for Appointment of Next Friend, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis-Denny, Grant)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF ONYX G.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF NEXT FRIEND AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES F. EICK by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the motion and refers the matter to Judge Charles F. Eick for his determination. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 12, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Craig Schultz as Guardian ad Litem for O.G. filed by Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S., Monaie T.. (Davis-Denny, Grant)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #23 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED, as follows: The deadline for the Defendants to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended to November 6, 2023. (rolm)
September 29, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #21 filed by Defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Los Angeles Department of Mental Health, Brandon Nichols, Lisa Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Defendants Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days)(Moridani, Farbod)
September 22, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Farbod Moridani counsel for Defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Los Angeles Department of Mental Health, Brandon Nichols, Lisa Wong. Adding Farbod S. Moridani as counsel of record for Los Angeles County, the Department of Children and Family Services, Brandon Nichols, the Department of Mental Health, Lisa Wong for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendants Los Angeles County, the Department of Children and Family Services, Brandon Nichols, the Department of Mental Health. (Attorney Farbod Moridani added to party Los Angeles County(pty:dft), Attorney Farbod Moridani added to party Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services(pty:dft), Attorney Farbod Moridani added to party Los Angeles Department of Mental Health(pty:dft), Attorney Farbod Moridani added to party Brandon Nichols(pty:dft), Attorney Farbod Moridani added to party Lisa Wong(pty:dft))(Moridani, Farbod)
September 21, 2023 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Jackson K., Ocean S., Onyx G., Rosie S., Erykah B., Junior R., Monaie T. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Redline of Original v. FAC)(Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Monaie T.(pty:pla))(Davis-Denny, Grant)
September 18, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Los Angeles Department of Mental Health, Brandon Nichols, Lisa Wongto Notice of Related Case(s) #4 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Farbod S. Moridani in Support of Response to Notice of Related Cases)(Moridani, Farbod)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #15 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Ocean S.; Jackson K.; Rosie S.; Erykah B.; Junior R.; and Onyx G., et al., designating Tara C. Ford as local counsel. Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Zou (rolm)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
August 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Zou to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35927644) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 8/24/23, Dkt. 6. (lt)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:02-cv-05662 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-06921 JAK(Ex). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
August 25, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Zou to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35927644) filed by Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs Ocean S., et al. Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ford, Tara)
August 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tara Chantelle Ford on behalf of Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S. (Ford, Tara)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying None. (Davis-Denny, Grant)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
August 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Zou on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
August 24, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Michelle Baass, California Department of Health Care Services, California Department of Social Services, Mark Ghaly, Kim Johnson, Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Los Angeles Department of Mental Health, Brandon Nichols, Lisa Wong. (et)
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S.. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Davis-Denny, Grant)
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S.. Related Case(s): 5:23-cv-00947-MEMF-BFMx; 02-cv-056662-JAK-SHx (Davis-Denny, Grant)
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S.. (Davis-Denny, Grant)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Erykah B., Onyx G., Jackson K., Junior R., Ocean S., Rosie S.. (Davis-Denny, Grant)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35905661 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Jackson K., Ocean S., Onyx G., Rosie S., Erykah B., Junior R.. (Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Erykah B.(pty:pla), Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Onyx G.(pty:pla), Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Jackson K.(pty:pla), Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Junior R.(pty:pla), Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Ocean S.(pty:pla), Attorney Grant A Davis-Denny added to party Rosie S.(pty:pla))(Davis-Denny, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocean S. et al v. Los Angeles County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean S.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Alero Egbe
Represented By: Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage
Represented By: Amelia Piazza
Represented By: James Patrick Biblarz
Represented By: Jessica Yeying Zou
Represented By: Leecia Welch
Represented By: Molly Elena Mauck
Represented By: Natalie Marie Garnica
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Represented By: Rachel L Stein
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Manimalethu
Represented By: Tara Chantelle Ford
Represented By: William D Temko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson K.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Represented By: Amelia Piazza
Represented By: James Patrick Biblarz
Represented By: Natalie Marie Garnica
Represented By: Rachel L Stein
Represented By: Alero Egbe
Represented By: Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage
Represented By: Jessica Yeying Zou
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Leecia Welch
Represented By: Molly Elena Mauck
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Manimalethu
Represented By: Tara Chantelle Ford
Represented By: William D Temko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie S.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Represented By: James Patrick Biblarz
Represented By: Alero Egbe
Represented By: Molly Elena Mauck
Represented By: Rachel L Stein
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Manimalethu
Represented By: Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage
Represented By: Amelia Piazza
Represented By: Jessica Yeying Zou
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Leecia Welch
Represented By: Natalie Marie Garnica
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Represented By: Tara Chantelle Ford
Represented By: William D Temko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erykah B.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Represented By: Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage
Represented By: Amelia Piazza
Represented By: James Patrick Biblarz
Represented By: Jessica Yeying Zou
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Leecia Welch
Represented By: Molly Elena Mauck
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Represented By: Rachel L Stein
Represented By: Alero Egbe
Represented By: Natalie Marie Garnica
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Manimalethu
Represented By: Tara Chantelle Ford
Represented By: William D Temko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior R.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Represented By: Natalie Marie Garnica
Represented By: Alero Egbe
Represented By: Amelia Piazza
Represented By: Jessica Yeying Zou
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Represented By: Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage
Represented By: James Patrick Biblarz
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Leecia Welch
Represented By: Molly Elena Mauck
Represented By: Rachel L Stein
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Manimalethu
Represented By: Tara Chantelle Ford
Represented By: William D Temko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx G.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Represented By: Amelia Piazza
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Leecia Welch
Represented By: Molly Elena Mauck
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Represented By: Rachel L Stein
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Manimalethu
Represented By: Tara Chantelle Ford
Represented By: William D Temko
Represented By: Alero Egbe
Represented By: Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage
Represented By: James Patrick Biblarz
Represented By: Jessica Yeying Zou
Represented By: Natalie Marie Garnica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monaie T.
Represented By: Grant A Davis-Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County
Represented By: Farbod Moridani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Farbod Moridani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Brandon Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH
Represented By: Farbod Moridani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wong
Represented By: Farbod Moridani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ghaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Baass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Nichols
Represented By: Farbod Moridani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?