Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. et al v. Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. and Chien-Hao Chen
Defendant: Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd., Thermaltake Inc. and Thermaltake USA
Case Number: 2:2023cv07470
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: Hernan D Vera
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
November 2, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Thermaltake Inc..(Attorney Nicolas S Gikkas added to party Thermaltake Inc.(pty:dft))(Gikkas, Nicolas)
October 31, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, #19 , Declaration (Motion related), #20 , Notice of Lodging, #21 filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
October 31, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd., Chien-Hao Chen. upon Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/22/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Shen, Chang-Te, Legal Manager of Thermaltake Tech. Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
October 26, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory) Concerning: Thermaltake Technology Co., Ltd. re First REQUEST for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Service of Summons and Complaint in Taiwan and Authorization of Foreign Service by the Clerk #19 , Declaration (Motion related), #20 (Chen, Kyle)
October 26, 2023 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Samuel C. Means in support of First REQUEST for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Service of Summons and Complaint in Taiwan and Authorization of Foreign Service by the Clerk #19 filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chen, Kyle)
October 26, 2023 Filing 19 First REQUEST for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Service of Summons and Complaint in Taiwan and Authorization of Foreign Service by the Clerk filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chen, Kyle)
September 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stip - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
September 22, 2023 Filing 17 Stipulation filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Bloch, David)
September 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark R Weinstein on behalf of Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Weinstein, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (lom)
September 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) .
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samuel C Means on behalf of Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Means, Samuel)
September 13, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd., Chien-Hao Chen, upon Defendant Thermaltake Inc. served on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon HUIPING LEE - REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Chen, Kyle)
September 12, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Spencer Bloch on behalf of Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Bloch, David)
September 12, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Thermaltake Inc., Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.. (sh)
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certification and Notice of Interested Parites filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36004909 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd., Chien-Hao Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kyle Dakai Chen added to party Chien-Hao Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Kyle Dakai Chen added to party Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.(pty:pla))(Chen, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. et al v. Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Represented By: Mark R Weinstein
Represented By: Samuel C Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chien-Hao Chen
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Represented By: Samuel C Means
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Represented By: Mark R Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermaltake Technology, Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermaltake Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas S Gikkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermaltake USA
Represented By: Nicolas S Gikkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?